Littlefield v. Mashpee Wampanoag Indian Tribe
Appeal Court of Appeals for the First Circuit, Case No. 16-2484

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 6, 2018 at 8:15 AM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3899 - Other Statutes
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107356255 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER entered: Attorney Matthew J. Frankel has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record for Appellees Tracy Acord, Deborah Canary, Francis Canary, Jr., Veronica Casey, Patricia Colbert, Vivian Courcy, Will Courcy, Antonio DeFaria, Donna DeFaria, Kelly Dorsey, Kim Dorsey, Francis Lagace, Jill Lagace, David Lewry, Kathleen Lewry, Michelle Lewry, Richard Lewry, Robert Lincoln, David Littlefield, Michelle Littlefield, Christina McMahon, Carol Murphy, Dorothy Peirce, David Purdy and Louise Silvia . Upon consideration, the motion is allowed, and attorney Frankel is hereby withdrawn. Appellees will continue to be represented by their remaining counsel of record. [16-2484] (GRC) [Entered: 10/24/2018 11:44 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107349339 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    RESPONSE filed by Appellees Tracy Acord, Deborah Canary, Francis Canary, Jr., Veronica Casey, Patricia Colbert, Vivian Courcy, Will Courcy, Antonio DeFaria, Donna DeFaria, Louise Silvia, David Purdy, Dorothy Peirce, Carol Murphy, Christina McMahon, Michelle Littlefield, David Littlefield, Robert Lincoln, Richard Lewry, Michelle Lewry, Kathleen Lewry, David Lewry, Jill Lagace, Francis Lagace, Kim Dorsey and Kelly Dorsey to status report [6201695-2]. Certificate of service dated 10/09/2018. [16-2484] (RMB) [Entered: 10/09/2018 04:18 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107346742 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Tracy Acord, Deborah Canary, Francis Canary, Jr., Veronica Casey, Patricia Colbert, Vivian Courcy, Will Courcy, Antonio DeFaria, Donna DeFaria, Kelly Dorsey, Kim Dorsey, Francis Lagace, Jill Lagace, David Lewry, Michelle Lewry, Richard Lewry, Robert Lincoln, David Littlefield, Michelle Littlefield, Carol Murphy, Dorothy Peirce, David Purdy, Louise Silvia, Kathleen Lewry and Christina McMahon filed by Attorney Roberto M. Braceras. Certificate of service dated 10/02/2018. [16-2484] (RMB) [Entered: 10/02/2018 03:01 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107346736 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Tracy Acord, Deborah Canary, Francis Canary, Jr., Patricia Colbert, Vivian Courcy, Will Courcy, Antonio DeFaria, Donna DeFaria, Kelly Dorsey, Kim Dorsey, Francis Lagace, Jill Lagace, David Lewry, Kathleen Lewry, Louise Silvia, David Purdy, Dorothy Peirce, Carol Murphy, Christina McMahon, Veronica Casey, Michelle Lewry, Richard Lewry, David Littlefield, Michelle Littlefield and Robert Lincoln filed by Attorney David J. Apfel. Certificate of service dated 10/02/2018. [16-2484] (DJA) [Entered: 10/02/2018 02:56 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107346441 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION for Attorney Matthew J. Frankel to withdraw as counsel filed by Appellees Tracy Acord, Deborah Canary, Francis Canary, Jr., Veronica Casey, Patricia Colbert, Vivian Courcy, Will Courcy, Antonio DeFaria, Donna DeFaria, Kelly Dorsey, Kim Dorsey, Francis Lagace, Jill Lagace, David Lewry, Kathleen Lewry, Michelle Lewry, Richard Lewry, Robert Lincoln, David Littlefield, Michelle Littlefield, Christina McMahon, Carol Murphy, Dorothy Peirce, David Purdy and Louise Silvia in 16-2484. Certificate of service dated 10/02/2018. [16-2484] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. Document should not have been filed in additional case 16-2481. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required.. (MJF) [Entered: 10/02/2018 10:01 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107345059 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            STATUS report filed by Appellant Mashpee Wampanoag Indian Tribe. Certificate of service dated 09/27/2018. [16-2484] (BJW) [Entered: 09/27/2018 04:39 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107341407 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER entered by William J. Kayatta, Jr., Appellate Judge: Appellant's request for ten days to "propose to this Court a plan as to whether and how it intends to proceed" in this appeal is granted. [16-2484] (GRC) [Entered: 09/19/2018 04:41 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107340279 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                STATUS report filed by Appellant Mashpee Wampanoag Indian Tribe. Certificate of service dated 09/17/2018. [16-2484] (BJW) [Entered: 09/17/2018 04:53 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107227463 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER entered by Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge: The Mashpee Wampanoag Indian Tribe has filed a status report in which it requests that it be permitted to file a status report within ten days of the Department of the Interior's decision on the Tribe's application for certain lands to be taken into trust. No objections have been filed. The request is granted. [16-2484] (GRC) [Entered: 11/30/2017 02:51 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107220401 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    STATUS report filed by Appellant Mashpee Wampanoag Indian Tribe. Certificate of service dated 11/10/2017. [16-2484] (BJW) [Entered: 11/10/2017 03:20 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107186430 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER entered by Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge: The Mashpee Wampanoag Indian Tribe has filed a status report in which it requests, in light of the additional briefing requested by the Department of the Interior, that the Tribe provide a further status report within ten days after the completion of the parties' supplemental briefing, i.e., by October 30, 2017. No objections have been filed. The request is granted. [16-2484] (GRC) [Entered: 08/08/2017 10:24 AM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107179033 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ORDER granting motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Appellant Mashpee Wampanoag Indian Tribe. [16-2484] (GRC) [Entered: 07/19/2017 12:26 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107178282 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION for Attorney Arlinda Locklear to withdraw as counsel filed by Appellant Mashpee Wampanoag Indian Tribe. Certificate of service dated 07/17/2017. [16-2484] (AFL) [Entered: 07/17/2017 04:11 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107174461 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            STATUS report filed by Appellant Mashpee Wampanoag Indian Tribe. Certificate of service dated 07/06/2017. [16-2484] (BJW) [Entered: 07/06/2017 03:02 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107154804 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER entered by David J. Barron, Appellate Judge: Defendant-appellant's motion to stay the appeal is granted. Within ten days after issuance of the anticipated decision of the Department of the Interior, the parties shall so inform this court and propose a plan for further proceedings. [16-2484] (GRC) [Entered: 05/15/2017 03:55 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107148389 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ORDER vacating notice of default dated 05/01/2017. [16-2481, 16-2484] (GRC) [Entered: 05/01/2017 11:34 AM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107148291 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued directing appellant to file a brief and appendix or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 45.0(a). Brief and Appendix due 05/15/2017. [16-2481, 16-2484] (GRC) [Entered: 05/01/2017 10:02 AM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107145306 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION to stay Defendant-Appellant Mashpee Wampanoag Indian Tribe's Motion For Stay filed by Not Party Mashpee Wampanoag Indian Tribe in 16-2481, Appellant Mashpee Wampanoag Indian Tribe in 16-2484. [16-2481, 16-2484] (BJW) [Entered: 04/24/2017 10:15 AM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?