Iowna Portalatin v. Blatt, Hasenmiller, Leibsker
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit, Case No. 16-1578

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 6, 2018 at 8:15 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER re: Stipulated motion to submit case for decision on the briefs and waive oral argument. The motion to waive oral argument is GRANTED. Oral argument scheduled for March 29, 2018, is VACATED. The appeal will be submitted for decision on the briefs and record to the panel hearing argument on March 29, 2018. [46] SCR [6912454] [16-1578, 17-3335] (CD)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Filed Response by Appellant Blatt, Hasenmiller, Leibsker & Moore LLC in 16-1578, 17-3335 Attorney David L. Hartsell to Court Order Dated 2/28/18. [47][6911275] [16-1578, 17-3335] (Hartsell, David)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Motion filed by Appellant Blatt, Hasenmiller, Leibsker & Moore LLC in 16-1578, 17-3335 to waive oral argument. [46] [6909312] [16-1578, 17-3335] (Hartsell, David)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ORDER re: Response of non-party defendants to court's operating procedure 10(b) order and motion to maintain documents under seal. IT IS ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The clerk of this court shall maintain documents no. 91 and 106 under seal. The clerk of this court shall place the following documents in the public record: 96, 102, 103, 109, 111, and 145. Counsel for the appellant shall file by March 19, 2018, redacted versions of documents no. 91 and 106, removing the exhibits containing the settlement agreement (exhibit 3 in document 91 and exhibit 5 in document 106). The clerk shall file the redacted versions of documents 91 and 106 in the public record. [41] SCR [45] [6906963] [16-1578, 17-3335] (AP)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Order issued DENYING STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE ORAL ARGUMENT [43] in 16-1578 & 17-3335. CF [44] [6906566] [16-1578, 17-3335] (SK)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Motion filed by Appellant Blatt, Hasenmiller, Leibsker & Moore LLC in 16-1578, 17-3335 to reschedule oral argument. [43] [6906006] [16-1578, 17-3335] (Hartsell, David)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Argument set for Thursday, March 29, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. in the Main Courtroom, Room 2721. Each side limited to 15 minutes. [42] [6905267] [16-1578, 17-3335] (ME)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Filed Non-Party Response to Op. 10 order and motion to retain documents under seal by Midland Credit Management, Inc. and Midland Funding, LLC. [6904823] [16-1578, 17-3335] (Bertocchi, Joel)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Submitted appellant reply brief by David L. Hartsell for Appellant Blatt, Hasenmiller, Leibsker & Moore LLC in 17-3335. [40] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [6902724] [17-3335, 16-1578] (Hartsell, David)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ORDER: This Court has received 8 electronic files, documents 91, 96, 102, 103, 106, 109, 111 and 145 under seal from the district court. All documents filed in this Court, except those required to be sealed by statute or rule are considered public. Pursuant to 7th Circuit Operating Procedure 10(b), documents sealed in the district court will be maintained under seal in this Court for 14 days, to afford time to request the approval required by section (a) of this operating procedure. Absent a motion from a party these sealed documents will be placed in the public record on 02/20/2018. Motion shall be filed by 02/20/2018 [39] [6901662] [16-1578, 17-3335] (ME)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 1 time.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?