Giuffre v. Maxwell
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 16-3945

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 6, 2018 at 8:17 AM EST (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Maxwell, Ghislaine Maxwell, Ghislaine, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ghislaine Maxwell"
No Logo Jeffrey Epstein, Respondent
No Logo Sharon Churcher, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 212-489-8230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Retained Eric Joel Feder,., -
Dershowitz, Alan M. Dershowitz, Alan M., Intervenor - Appellant
Officially listed as "Alan M. Dershowitz"

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 212-763-5000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Retained David A. Lebowitz,., -
COR NTC Retained Andrew G. Celli, Jr., -
No Logo Cernovich, Michael, Intervenor - Appellant
Officially listed as "Michael Cernovich, DBA Cernovich Media"

Toggle Switch Represented by Randazza Legal Group PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Retained Jay Marshall Wolman +1 702 420 2001 +1 305 437 7662 jmw@randazza.com
No Logo American Society of News Editors, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-795-9300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Bruce D. Brown,., -
The Associated Press The Associated Press, Amicus Curiae
Officially listed as "Associated Press"

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-795-9300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Bruce D. Brown,., -
No Logo Association of Alternative Newsmedia, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-795-9300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Bruce D. Brown,., -
No Logo Association of Magazine Media, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-795-9300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Bruce D. Brown,., -
No Logo Bay Area News Group, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-795-9300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Bruce D. Brown,., -
No Logo Daily News, L.P., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-795-9300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Bruce D. Brown,., -
No Logo First Amendment Coalition, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-795-9300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Bruce D. Brown,., -
No Logo First Look Media Works, Inc., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-795-9300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Bruce D. Brown,., -
No Logo Gannett Company, Inc., Amicus Curiae
Officially listed as "Gannett Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-795-9300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Bruce D. Brown,., -
No Logo Investigative Reporting Workshop at American University, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-795-9300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Bruce D. Brown,., -
No Logo National Press Photographers Association, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-795-9300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Bruce D. Brown,., -
No Logo New England First Admendment Coalition, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-795-9300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Bruce D. Brown,., -
No Logo Online News Association, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-795-9300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Bruce D. Brown,., -
No Logo Radio Television Digital News Association, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-795-9300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Bruce D. Brown,., -
No Logo Society of Professional Journalists, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-795-9300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Bruce D. Brown,., -
No Logo The E.W. Scripps Company, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-795-9300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Bruce D. Brown,., -
No Logo The International Documentary Association, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-795-9300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Bruce D. Brown,., -
No Logo The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-795-9300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Bruce D. Brown,., -
No Logo Tully Center for Free Speech, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-795-9300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Bruce D. Brown,., -
No Logo Virginia L. Giuffre, Plaintiff - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 801-585-5202

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Retained Paul Cassell,., Professor

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 954-356-0011

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Retained Sigrid S. McCawley,., Partner
Nature of Suit 4320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (105) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 04/12/2018, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich, RECEIVED. Service date 04/12/2018 by CM/ECF.[2277947] [16-3945] [Entered: 04/12/2018 02:10 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 04/10/2018, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre, RECEIVED. Service date 04/10/2018 by CM/ECF.[2275785] [16-3945] [Entered: 04/10/2018 01:29 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 04/02/2018 by CM/ECF, email.[2270011] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 04/02/2018 05:19 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 04/02/2018 by CM/ECF.[2269963] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 04/02/2018 04:52 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 04/02/2018 by CM/ECF.[2269670] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 04/02/2018 02:26 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ORDER, dated 03/02/2018, instructing parties to file supplemental briefs regarding the question of appellate jurisdiction in this case; the supplemental briefs must be submitted by 04/02/2018, FILED.[2248556] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 03/02/2018 03:17 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 182 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              SEALED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. [2247604] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 03/01/2018 04:28 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 180 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Certificate of Service of Confidential Appellee Brief (Sealed per DE 178-179], on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 02/22/2018 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[2241786] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 02/22/2018 04:34 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 02/20/2018, to SDNY (New York City), ISSUED.[2239144] [16-3945] [Entered: 02/20/2018 01:27 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION ORDER, granting motion to seal Appellee's brief; to the extent that they have not yet done so, the parties are also hereby instructed to brief for the merits panel the question of appellate jurisdiction [127] filed by Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre, by ALK, DAL, MEYER, D.J., FILED. [2239140][178] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 02/20/2018 01:25 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2230392] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 02/06/2018 03:17 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        CURED DEFECTIVE Letter [164], [165], on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre, FILED.[2209221] [16-3945] [Entered: 01/09/2018 12:08 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre, informing Court that it takes no position on whether oral argument should be held, but would like to participate if oral argument is held, RECEIVED. Service date 01/09/2018 by CM/ECF.[2209195] [16-3945] [Entered: 01/09/2018 12:01 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Letter, [163], on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre, FILED.[2208742] [16-3945] [Entered: 01/09/2018 08:47 AM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Paul Cassell, Esq. for Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 01/08/2018 by CM/ECF. [2208161] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 01/08/2018 01:47 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 160 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                SEALED REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, FILED. [2207857] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 01/08/2018 11:28 AM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file reply brief under seal [141] filed by Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, by PWH, FILED. [2204012][159] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 01/02/2018 10:52 AM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Jay Marshall Wolman, Esq. for Appellant Michael Cernovich in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 12/27/2017 by CM/ECF. [2202400] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 12/27/2017 09:25 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Reply Brief of Michael Cernovich d/b/a Cernovich Media, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 12/27/2017 by CM/ECF.[2202399] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 12/27/2017 09:23 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 12/27/2017 by CM/ECF. [2202398] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 12/27/2017 09:22 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Andrew G. Celli, Jr. for Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 12/27/2017 by CM/ECF. [2202196] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 12/27/2017 04:10 PM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION [141], on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz, FILED. Service date 12/27/2017 by CM/ECF.[2202120][147] [16-3945] [Entered: 12/27/2017 03:40 PM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Confidential Reply Brief for Intervenor-Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 12/27/2017 by CM/ECF.[2202049] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 12/27/2017 03:12 PM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                REDACTED REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 12/27/2017 by CM/ECF. [2202046] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 12/27/2017 03:09 PM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MOTION, to file document, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz, FILED. Service date 12/26/2017 by CM/ECF. [2201303] [16-3945] [Entered: 12/26/2017 12:40 PM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION ORDER, referring motion to seal document [127] filed by Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre, by CFD, FILED. [2195478][139] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 12/15/2017 12:43 PM]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      REPLY TO OPPOSITION [130], on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 12/14/2017 by CM/ECF.[2194300][133] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 12/14/2017 10:40 AM]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        REDACTED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 12/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2193926] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 12/13/2017 04:33 PM]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [127], on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 12/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2193128] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 12/13/2017 10:15 AM]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MOTION, to seal document, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 12/12/2017 by CM/ECF. [2192908] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 12/12/2017 06:55 PM]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file an oversized brief of 15,000 words [122] filed by Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre, by RAK, FILED. [2177022][126] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 11/21/2017 11:00 AM]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MOTION, to file oversized brief, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 11/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2175520] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 11/17/2017 04:48 PM]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  FRAP 26.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Daily News, L.P., FILED. Service date 10/06/2017 by CM/ECF.[2142791] [16-3945] [Entered: 10/06/2017 06:11 PM]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: BRIEF, APPENDIX, [109], [108], [107], on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich, FILED.[2133430] [16-3945] [Entered: 09/26/2017 12:12 PM]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, American Society of News Editors, Associated Press, Association of Alternative Newsmedia, Bay Area News Group, Daily News, L.P., The E.W. Scripps Company, First Amendment Coalition, First Look Media Works, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., International Documentary Assn., Investigative Reporting Workshop at American University, Association of Magazine Media, National Press Photographers Association, New England First Admendment Coalition, Online News Association, Radio Television Digital News Association, Society of Professional Journalists and Tully Center for Free Speech, ADDED.[2133191] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 09/26/2017 10:00 AM]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich, regarding why there are redactions in Appellant's Appendix without accompanying sealed versions, RECEIVED. Service date 09/25/2017 by CM/ECF.[2133030] [16-3945] [Entered: 09/25/2017 06:35 PM]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-198), on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 09/25/2017 by CM/ECF.[2133027] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 09/25/2017 06:33 PM]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 09/25/2017 by CM/ECF.[2133025] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 09/25/2017 06:30 PM]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              DEFECTIVE DOCUMENTS, Brief and Appendix, [103], [104], on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 16-3945, FILED.[2130287] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 09/21/2017 10:45 AM]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, American Society of News Editors, Associated Press, Association of Alternative Newsmedia, Bay Area News Group, Daily News, L.P., The E.W. Scripps Company, First Amendment Coalition, First Look Media Works, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., International Documentary Assn., Investigative Reporting Workshop at American University, Association of Magazine Media, National Press Photographers Association, New England First Admendment Coalition, Online News Association, Radio Television Digital News Association, Society of Professional Journalists and Tully Center for Free Speech, FILED. Service date 09/20/2017 by CM/ECF. [2129786] [16-3945]--[Edited 09/26/2017 by AM] [Entered: 09/20/2017 04:00 PM]
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, American Society of News Editors, Associated Press, Association of Alternative Newsmedia, Bay Area News Group, Daily News, L.P., The E.W. Scripps Company, First Amendment Coalition, First Look Media Works, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., International Documentary Assn., Investigative Reporting Workshop at American University, Association of Magazine Media, National Press Photographers Association, New England First Admendment Coalition, Online News Association, Radio Television Digital News Association, Society of Professional Journalists and Tully Center for Free Speech, FILED. Service date 09/20/2017 by CM/ECF. [2129772] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722]--[Edited 09/26/2017 by AM] [Entered: 09/20/2017 03:54 PM]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    CORRECTED APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 09/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2128740] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 09/19/2017 08:32 PM]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      CORRECTED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 09/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2128739] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 09/19/2017 08:30 PM]
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich, FILED. Service date 09/19/2017 by CM/ECF.[2128738] [16-3945] [Entered: 09/19/2017 08:30 PM]
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          DEFECTIVE DOCUMENTS, Brief & Appendix, [92], [93], on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich, FILED.[2126138] [16-3945] [Entered: 09/15/2017 04:25 PM]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945 Brief due date as 12/13/2017, FILED.[2125949] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 09/15/2017 03:19 PM]
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, informing Court of proposed due date 12/13/2017, RECEIVED. Service date 09/15/2017 by CM/ECF.[2125587] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 09/15/2017 12:03 PM]
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Brief for Intervenor-Appellant Michael Cernovich d/b/a Cernovich Media and Appendix of Intervenor-Appellant Michael Cernovich d/b/a Cernovich Media, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 17-1722, 16-3945, 17-1625, FILED. Service date 09/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2123342] [17-1722, 16-3945, 17-1625] [Entered: 09/13/2017 11:34 AM]
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-198), on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 17-1722, 16-3945, 17-1625, FILED. Service date 09/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2123330] [17-1722, 16-3945, 17-1625] [Entered: 09/13/2017 11:30 AM]
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Michael Cernovich in 17-1722, 16-3945, 17-1625, FILED. Service date 09/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2123324] [17-1722, 16-3945, 17-1625] [Entered: 09/13/2017 11:27 AM]
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      DISTRICT COURT SEALING ORDER, dated 08/09/2016, RECEIVED.[2113385] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 08/30/2017 10:50 AM]
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 82 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 6 of 6, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by US mail.[2112594] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 08/29/2017 12:42 PM]
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 81 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 5 of 6, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by US mail.[2112592] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 08/29/2017 12:40 PM]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 80 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 6, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by US mail.[2112577] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 08/29/2017 12:28 PM]
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 79 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              SEALED SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. [2112575] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 08/29/2017 12:27 PM]
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 78 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                SEALED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. [2112572] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 08/29/2017 12:27 PM]
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file sealed brief [63] [2107579-2], filed by Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz, by RSP, FILED. [2110995][77] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 08/28/2017 10:29 AM]
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Confidential Brief for Intervenor-Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz, Confidential Special Appendix, and Confidential Joint Appendix Volumes IV - VI, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF.[2109810] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 08/24/2017 05:45 PM]
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      REDACTED SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF.[2109809] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 08/24/2017 05:41 PM]
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        REDACTED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 6 of 6, (pp. 1177-1436), on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF.[2109804] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 08/24/2017 05:37 PM]
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          REDACTED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 5 of 6, (pp. 915-1176), on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF.[2109797] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 08/24/2017 05:30 PM]
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            REDACTED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 6, (pp. 654-914), on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF.[2109787] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 08/24/2017 05:25 PM]
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 6, (pp. 437-653), on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF.[2109784] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 08/24/2017 05:20 PM]
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 6, (pp. 219-436), on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF.[2109778] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 08/24/2017 05:12 PM]
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 6, (pp. 1-218), on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF.[2109776] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 08/24/2017 05:01 PM]
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    REDACTED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722, FILED. Service date 08/24/2017 by CM/ECF.[2109763] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 08/24/2017 04:50 PM]
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      MOTION, to seal document, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz, FILED. Service date 08/22/2017 by CM/ECF. [2107572] [16-3945] [Entered: 08/22/2017 03:26 PM]
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        CAPTION, to reflect consolidation of appeal 16-3945 with appeals 17-1625 and 17-1722, AMENDED.[2081409] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 07/18/2017 04:42 PM]
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          MOTION ORDER, granting motion to consolidate appeals 16-3945 with appeals 17-1625 and 17-1722; Appellant's brief is due 08/24/2017 [50][2081255-2] filed by Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz in 16-3945, 17-1625, FILED. [2081388][60] [16-3945, 17-1625, 17-1722] [Entered: 07/18/2017 04:30 PM]
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[2081160] [16-3945] [Entered: 07/18/2017 02:38 PM]
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              ORDER, reinstating appeal, FILED.[2080619] [16-3945] [Entered: 07/18/2017 09:47 AM]
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz, RECEIVED. Service date 07/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2080446] [16-3945] [Entered: 07/17/2017 05:17 PM]
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz, FILED. Service date 07/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2080216] [16-3945] [Entered: 07/17/2017 02:44 PM]
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 04/18/2017, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[2014018] [16-3945] [Entered: 04/18/2017 05:10 PM]
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      LOCAL RULE 42.1 STIPULATION, without prejudice to reinstatement by 07/28/2017, FILED.[2014012] [16-3945] [Entered: 04/18/2017 05:08 PM]
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        NEW CASE MANAGER, Atasha Joseph, ASSIGNED.[2014010] [16-3945] [Entered: 04/18/2017 05:06 PM]
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          LOCAL RULE 42.1 STIPULATION, Without Prejudice to Reinstatement, RECEIVED. Service date 04/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2013069] [16-3945] [Entered: 04/17/2017 05:04 PM]
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, dated 02/08/2017, granting an extension until 04/28/2017 to file Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz's brief and appendix; the appeal is dismissed effective 04/28/2017 unless a brief is filed by that date, by RKW, FILED.[1964861] [16-3945] [Entered: 02/08/2017 03:04 PM]
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to MOTION to hold appeal in abeyance, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre, RECEIVED. Service date 02/07/2017 by CM/ECF, email.[1964002] [16-3945] [Entered: 02/07/2017 04:04 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION, to hold appeal in abeyance, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz, FILED. Service date 02/03/2017 by CM/ECF. [1961381] [16-3945] [Entered: 02/03/2017 11:02 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  CAPTION, changing Jeffrey Epstein's party designation from "Respondent-Appellee" to "Respondent" only per letters dated 01/04/2017, AMENDED.[1949507] [16-3945] [Entered: 01/18/2017 10:55 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre, FILED. Service date 01/05/2017 by CM/ECF.[1940472] [16-3945] [Entered: 01/05/2017 11:38 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY, Gregory L. Poe, for Appellee Jeffrey Epstein, TERMINATED.[1939918] [16-3945] [Entered: 01/04/2017 04:15 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER, dated 01/04/2017, informing Court that attorney Gregory L. Poe does not represent Appellee Jeffrey Epstein, RECEIVED. Service date 01/04/2017 by CM/ECF.[1939913] [16-3945] [Entered: 01/04/2017 04:12 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER, dated 01/04/2017, stating that party Jeffrey Epstein has no interest in this appeal and should be removed as a party, on behalf of Appellee Jeffrey Epstein, RECEIVED. Service date 01/04/2017 by CM/ECF.[1939816] [16-3945] [Entered: 01/04/2017 03:29 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE, to Appellee Jeffrey Epstein, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[1930398] [16-3945] [Entered: 12/19/2016 09:56 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY, Paul Cassell for Virginia L. Giuffre, in case 16-3945, [26], ADDED.[1928280] [16-3945] [Entered: 12/15/2016 08:28 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre, FILED. Service date 12/14/2016 by CM/ECF. [1928128] [16-3945] [Entered: 12/14/2016 04:28 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz Brief due date as 02/16/2017. Joint Appendix due date as 02/16/2017, FILED.[1928064] [16-3945] [Entered: 12/14/2016 03:57 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz, informing Court of proposed due date 02/16/2017, RECEIVED. Service date 12/14/2016 by CM/ECF.[1927863] [16-3945] [Entered: 12/14/2016 02:30 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY, Sigrid S. McCawley, [20], in place of attorney Bradley J. Edwards, SUBSTITUTED.[1927577] [16-3945] [Entered: 12/14/2016 11:19 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre, FILED. Service date 12/14/2016 by CM/ECF. [1927545] [16-3945] [Entered: 12/14/2016 11:09 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Bradley James Edwards for Appellee Virginia L. Giuffre, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[1920308] [16-3945] [Entered: 12/05/2016 03:04 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz, FILED. Service date 12/05/2016 by CM/ECF.[1920294] [16-3945] [Entered: 12/05/2016 02:57 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY, David A. Lebowitz for Alan M. Dershowitz, in case 16-3945, [14], ADDED.[1920286] [16-3945] [Entered: 12/05/2016 02:49 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[1920281] [16-3945] [Entered: 12/05/2016 02:47 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz, FILED. Service date 12/05/2016 by CM/ECF. [1920206] [16-3945] [Entered: 12/05/2016 01:46 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz, FILED. Service date 12/02/2016 by CM/ECF.[1919524] [16-3945] [Entered: 12/02/2016 04:35 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY, Andrew G. Celli Jr. for Alan M. Dershowitz, in case 16-3945, [7], ADDED.[1919523] [16-3945] [Entered: 12/02/2016 04:35 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz, FILED. Service date 12/02/2016 by CM/ECF.[1919520] [16-3945] [Entered: 12/02/2016 04:34 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz, FILED. Service date 12/02/2016 by CM/ECF. [1919517] [16-3945] [Entered: 12/02/2016 04:33 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1917934] [16-3945] [Entered: 12/01/2016 12:39 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz, district court receipt # 0208-12994142, FILED.[1917933] [16-3945] [Entered: 12/01/2016 12:38 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                DISTRICT COURT SEALED DOCUMENT, entered in the district court as docket entry #498, dated 11/10/2016, RECEIVED.[1917925] [16-3945] [Entered: 12/01/2016 12:37 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Alan M. Dershowitz, FILED. [1917910] [16-3945] [Entered: 12/01/2016 12:30 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 29 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?