Swift Beef Company v. Alex Lee, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 17-2339

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 6, 2018 at 8:20 AM EST (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4150 - Contract: Overpayment Recovery
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Receipt of paper copy of response brief filed at [18] by Swift Beef Company. Number of pages: [64]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 02/20/2018. [1000244807] [17-2339] MR [Entered: 02/21/2018 08:58 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    BRIEF by Appellee Swift Beef Company in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 02/16/2018. [1000243088] [17-2339] Clayton Bailey [Entered: 02/16/2018 11:36 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Benjamin L. Stewart for Swift Beef Company.[1000232281] [17-2339] Benjamin Stewart [Entered: 01/30/2018 01:06 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        APPENDIX (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Alex Lee, Incorporated. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): 1. Total number of pages in all volumes: 416. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of Copies: 1. Entered on Docket Date: 01/19/2018. Received by clerk date: 01/19/2018. [1000226691] [17-2339] ALC [Entered: 01/19/2018 04:15 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          OPENING BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Alex Lee, Incorporated. Number of pages: [45]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [1]. Entered on Docket Date: 01/19/2018. Received by clerk date: 01/19/2018. [1000226689] [17-2339] ALC [Entered: 01/19/2018 04:14 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Alex Lee, Incorporated. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 01/19/2018. [1000226498] [17-2339] Mark Kinghorn [Entered: 01/19/2018 01:59 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              BRIEF by Appellant Alex Lee, Incorporated in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 01/19/2018. [1000226490] [17-2339] Mark Kinghorn [Entered: 01/19/2018 01:51 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ORDER filed [1000214501] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 1/19/18, updating briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 01/19/2018. Response brief due 02/16/2018. Copies to all parties. [17-2339] TW [Entered: 12/27/2017 01:02 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Initial mediation conference scheduled. [17-2339] LP [Entered: 12/13/2017 11:52 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Thomas G. Hooper for Swift Beef Company.[1000202932] [17-2339] Thomas Hooper [Entered: 12/04/2017 05:06 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 7 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?