Mays et al v. Husted
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01376-MHW-CMV
District Judge Michael H. Watson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 5, 2020 at 8:37 AM EST (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Quinton Nelson, Sr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by campaignlegal.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Diaz +1 202 736 2200 +1 202 736 2222 jdiaz@campaignlegal.org
Space Mark P. Gaber +1 202 736 2200 mgaber@campaignlegal.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Dēmos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Naila S. Awan +1 212 485 6065 +1 212 633 2015 nawan@demos.org
Space Chiraag Bains +1 202 864 2746 +1 202 514 8336 cbains@demos.org
No Logo Tommy Ray Mays, II, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by campaignlegal.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Diaz +1 202 736 2200 +1 202 736 2222 jdiaz@campaignlegal.org
Space Mark P. Gaber +1 202 736 2200 mgaber@campaignlegal.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Dēmos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Naila S. Awan +1 212 485 6065 +1 212 633 2015 nawan@demos.org
Space Chiraag Bains +1 202 864 2746 +1 202 514 8336 cbains@demos.org
v.
No Logo Jon Husted, Defendant
Office Columbus
Filed 11/6/2018
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 441 - Civil Rights: Voting
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County FRANKLIN
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (70) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None USCA Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: None USCA Case Number
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None Stay
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Reply (non motion)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Reply (non motion)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to File Document Under Seal
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Exclude
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Deposition
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Deposition
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Deposition
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None File Document Under Seal (Joint Motion)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/19/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Certify Class
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Rule 26(f) Report
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/6/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            NOTATION ORDER granting [5], [6], and [7] Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Chiraag Bains, Mark P. Gaber, and Jonathan Diaz conditional upon counsel registering for electronic filing or seeking leave to be excused from doing so within fourteen (14) days. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/6/2018. (ew)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/6/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Plaintiffs Tommy Ray Mays, II, Quinton Nelson, Sr re [6] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6668941) of Mark P. Gaber (Corrected Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark P. Gaber) (Awan, Naila)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/6/2018, Terminated: 11/6/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6668946) of Jonathan Diaz by Plaintiffs Tommy Ray Mays, II, Quinton Nelson, Sr. (Awan, Naila)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/6/2018, Terminated: 11/6/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6668941) of Mark P. Gaber by Plaintiffs Tommy Ray Mays, II, Quinton Nelson, Sr. (Awan, Naila)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/6/2018, Terminated: 11/6/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6668922) of Chiraag Bains by Plaintiffs Tommy Ray Mays, II, Quinton Nelson, Sr. (Awan, Naila)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/6/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Jon Husted. (er)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/6/2018 Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                        Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Tommy Ray Mays, II, Quinton Nelson, Sr. [ELECTION ISSUE(S) CITED] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Mays Declaration), # (2) Exhibit B (Nelson Declaration), # (3) Exhibit C (Diaz Declaration), # (4) Text of Proposed Order) (Awan, Naila)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/6/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Class Certification by Plaintiffs Tommy Ray Mays, II, Quinton Nelson, Sr. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order (Leave to File), # (2) Exhibit Proposed Class Certification Motion and Memorandum of Law, # (3) Exhibit A: Salling Report, # (4) Exhibit B: Gaber Declaration, # (5) Exhibit C: Bains Declaration, # (6) Exhibit D: Bishop Declaration, # (7) Text of Proposed Order (Class Certification)) (Awan, Naila)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/6/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Jon Husted ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6668772), filed by Tommy Ray Mays, II, Quinton Nelson, Sr. [ELECTION ISSUE(S) CITED] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: Letter to Sec'y Husted, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet, # (3) Summons Form) (Awan, Naila)
                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 36 times.

                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?