United States v. Gladden, individual and as of Paul W. Dwyer's Estate
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-30173

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 5, 2021 at 6:44 PM DT (1.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Wallace D. Dennis +1 202 616 1460 w.damon.dennis@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo City of Easthampton, Massachusetts, Defendant
No Logo Robert Gladden, individual and as Executor of Paul W. Dwyer's Estate,, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 6502
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Continue
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: US Government), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Form)(Dennis, Wallace) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 9 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?