United States v. Approximately $13,739.00 In U.S. Currency
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-01223-OWW-SMS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 6, 2018 at 10:52 AM EST (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 881
Nature of Suit Drug Related Seizure of Property
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/17/06. (Carter-Ford, R)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER re dispositional documents and vacating scheduling conference set for 10/5/2006 signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/3/2006. (Lucas, G)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      APPLICATION and ORDER for PUBLICATION signed by Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/19/2006. (Herman, H)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 0 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?