Think Computer Corporation v. Google, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2009-2-SC-005907

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 6, 2018 at 12:17 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Think Computer Corporation Think Computer Corporation, Plaintiff
v.
Google, Inc. Google, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Corporation Service Company, Serve On Party for Defendant
Case Type Small Claims Appeals
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None Clerks Notice
SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter; Decision = M; Closed = 06/04/2009
    Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None judgment
    plt to recover from def in costs for a total judgment of $0 - signed by judge cain; Legacy Name = CV Judgment; Decision = G; Closed = 06/04/2009
      Blank 8 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None Order: Submitted Matter
      plt to recover from def in costs for a total judgment of $0 - signed by judge cain; Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter; Decision = G; Closed = 06/04/2009
        Blank 7 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None Clerks Notice
        SCA-Ntc of Resched SC Trial; Decision = M; Closed = 04/21/2009
          Blank 6 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None Clerks Notice
          SCA-Ntc of SC Appeal Trial; Decision = M; Closed = 03/30/2009
            Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None Notice: Appeal (Small Claims)
            SC Ntc of Appeal
              Blank 4 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None Change of Address
              SC Change/Correct Address; Decision = M; Closed = 03/27/2009
                Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                SC Judgment
                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None Proof of Service
                  SC Proof of Svc
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less
                    SC Plaintiff Claim $0-$1500; Decision = M; Closed = 03/03/2009

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 105 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?