Think Computer Corporation v. The Brenner Group, Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2012-2-SC-008692

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 6, 2018 at 1:10 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Think Computer Corporation Think Computer Corporation, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo The Brenner Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brenner, Richard M, Serve On Party for Defendant
Case Type Small Claims $0 - $1500
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 3 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Writ: Execution (Filed)
Alameda deficit:$1,450.22; Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec/Rtn Unsatis
    Blank 2 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None Proof of Service
    SC Proof of Svc
      Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less
      SC Plaintiff Claim $0-$1500; Decision = M; Closed = 05/07/2012

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 94 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?