May v. Utah Department of Corrections
Federal Civil Lawsuit Utah District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00854

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 1, 2021 at 4:30 PM ST (3.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Curtis Ellis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by R. SHANE JOHNSON, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY R. Shane Johnson +1 801 671 3446 shane@utahdefense.com
No Logo Ronald May, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by R. SHANE JOHNSON, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY R. Shane Johnson +1 801 671 3446 shane@utahdefense.com
No Logo Toby Garcia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by R. SHANE JOHNSON, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY R. Shane Johnson +1 801 671 3446 shane@utahdefense.com
No Logo Todd Mulder, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by R. SHANE JOHNSON, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY R. Shane Johnson +1 801 671 3446 shane@utahdefense.com
v.
No Logo Mike Haddon, Defendant
No Logo Tony Washington, Defendant
No Logo Utah Department of Corrections, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Settlement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Settlement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: None Order Lifting Stay
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None Stay
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Certify Class
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None ~Util - Terminate Motions
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                After review of the case, case reassigned to District Judge per 4 Docket Text Order. Case randomly assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (las) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Because this case is a proposed class action, it is not feasible to obtain consent from all parties to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be reassigned to a District Judge through random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 11/01/2018. (docket text order; no attached document) (jcd) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney WILLIAM L. SCHMIDT, for Plaintiffs Curtis Ellis, Toby Garcia, Ronald May and Todd Mulder. (tlh) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      COMPLAINT against Mike Haddon, Utah Department of Corrections, Tony Washington (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3136461) filed by Ronald May, Toby Garcia, Curtis Ellis, Todd Mulder. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Ronald May v. UDOC Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Johnson, R.) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiffs Curtis Ellis, Toby Garcia, Ronald May and Todd Mulder are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?