Inter-Local Pension Fund GCC/IBT v. Tesla, Inc., et al.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 18CV337109

Tags
Last Updated May 17, 2021 at 11:35 PM DT (1 month ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Inter-Local Pension Fund GCC/IBT Inter-Local Pension Fund GCC/IBT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Arroyo LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen J. Oddo +1 619 525 3990 +1 619 525 3991 soddo@robbinsllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Umeda LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian James Robbins +1 619 525 3990 +1 619 525 3991 brobbins@robbinsumeda.com
v.
Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays Capital Inc., Defendant
Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Defendant
Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Defendant
Goldman Sachs & Company, LLC Goldman Sachs & Company, LLC, Defendant
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Cumulus Media Inc.
Unknown Role, Lodgian, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mlgpe Ltd
Merrill Lynch GP Inc. Unknown Role, Merrill Lynch GP Inc.
Unknown Role, Infospace.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, New BlackRock, Inc.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Bank of America, NA Unknown Role, Bank of America, NA
Unknown Role, Gabelli Utility Fund
Unknown Role, Muniholdings Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munivest Fund II Inc
Morgan Stanley & Company LLC Morgan Stanley & Company LLC, Defendant
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Musk, Elon"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation
RBC Capital Markets, LLC RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Superior Court of California, Notice

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara +1 831 454 2400
Case Type Securities Litigation Unlimited (28)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Removal to Federal Court
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Exhibit List (Party)
    Exhibit 1
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
      Proof of Service
        Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Order: Deeming Case Complex
        Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline signed/BCW
          Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
          COMPLEX
            Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 100 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?