BURGOS v. OPTION ONE MORTGAGE CORPORATION INC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Middle District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-00223

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 23, 2019 at 12:15 AM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PEDRO J BURGOS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick Stud Jones +1 678 583 8551 Black_Dragon_Talon@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo OPTION ONE MORTGAGE COMPANY INC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adams and Reese LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Lucy Hanna +1 404 221 6507 +1 404 221 6501 AmyHanna.Keeney@arlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Laura H. Mirmelli +1 470 427 3716 +1 404 238 9627 laura.mirmelli@arlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen Andrew Walsh +1 205 250 5091 +1 205 250 5034 stephen.walsh@arlaw.com
Wells Fargo Bank, NA Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Movant
Unknown Role, NORWEST CORP
Unknown Role, Day Runner, Inc.
Unknown Role, Yucca Uranium Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of SARAH L COOK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY SARAH L COOK +1 404 365 9506 scook@mmatllaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tania Tuttle Trumble +1 404 365 4575 +1 678 280 1923 ttrumble@mmatllaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by South Terraces

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Howell A. Hall +1 770 392 0303 hhall@penderlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Intervene
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION for Sanctions, MOTION to Remand by PEDRO J BURGOS filed by FREDERICK STUD JONES. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Pedro J. Burgos, # 2 Exhibit Federal OPINION AND ORDER)(JONES, FREDERICK) (Entered: 01/14/2019)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        A deficiency notice was entered for this entry with instructions to filer it must be re-filed. MOTION for Sanctions by PEDRO J BURGOS filed by FREDERICK STUD JONES. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Pedro J. Burgos, # 2 Exhibit Federal OPINION AND ORDER)(JONES, FREDERICK) Modified on 1/14/2019 (tlf). (Entered: 01/14/2019)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          RESPONSE filed by OPTION ONE MORTGAGE COMPANY INC re 18 MOTION to Remand Superior Court of Muscogee County (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Motion to Dismiss and Remand Case and Brief in Support filed by plaintiff Tony Ware in Ware v. FleetBoston Fin. Corp. in the Northern District of Georgia, case no. 05-cv-0426-MHS, # 2 Exhibit B - Order Granting Defendants Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Set Aside Default entered in Ware v. FleetBoston Financial Corporation, Northern District of Georgia, case no. 05-cv-0426-MHS)(KEENEY, AMY) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by STEPHEN A WALSH (nop) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MEMORANDUM in Support of 18 MOTION to Remand Superior Court of Muscogee County (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Final Order, # 3 Exhibit Order and Judgment, # 4 Exhibit Motion to Intervene, # 5 Exhibit Order and Notice of Hearing, # 6 Exhibit Notice of Appeal, # 7 Exhibit Wells Fargo's Certificate of Service)(JONES, FREDERICK) (Entered: 12/05/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to Remand Superior Court of Muscogee County by PEDRO J BURGOS filed by FREDERICK STUD JONES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order)(JONES, FREDERICK) (Entered: 12/05/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Notice of deficiency entered for this entry with instructions to filer that is must be re-filed. MEMORANDUM in Support of 16 MOTION to Remand Superior Court of Muscogee County Superior Court of Muscogee County (JONES, FREDERICK) Modified on 12/5/2018 (tlf). (Entered: 12/05/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Notice of deficiency entered for this entry with instructions to filer that is must be re-filed. MOTION to Remand Superior Court of Muscogee County by PEDRO J BURGOS filed by FREDERICK STUD JONES.(JONES, FREDERICK) Modified on 12/5/2018 (tlf). (Entered: 12/05/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Notice of deficiency entered for this entry with instructions to filer that is must be re-filed. FIRST MOTION to Remand Superior Court of Muscogee County by PEDRO J BURGOS filed by FREDERICK STUD JONES.(JONES, FREDERICK) Modified on 12/5/2018 (tlf). (Entered: 12/05/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        RESPONSE to Court Order filed by OPTION ONE MORTGAGE COMPANY INC re 9 Order,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Table of contents for Doc. 1-1, # 2 Exhibit State court docket sheet as of November 26, 2018)(KEENEY, AMY) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MEMORANDUM in Support filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR OPTION ONE MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2003-1, ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2003-1 re: 12 MOTION to Intervene (TRUMBLE, TANIA) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION to Intervene by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR OPTION ONE MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2003-1, ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2003-1 filed by TANIA T TRUMBLE.(TRUMBLE, TANIA) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting 10 Motion to Stay. Discovery and the deadlines set forth in the Rules 16/26 Order are stayed pending the Court's ruling on the motion to set aside the judgment. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 11/15/2018 (CCL) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION to Stay Pre-Trial Deadlines and Discovery by OPTION ONE MORTGAGE COMPANY INC filed by AMY HANNA KEENEY. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Stay Pre-Trial Deadlines and Discovery)(KEENEY, AMY) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  This is a text only entry; no document issued.ORDER Within fourteen days, Defendant shall provide a table of contents for Exhibit 1 to its Notice of Removal, the 489-page "All documents in state court case," ECF No. 1-1. The table of contents should be a chart that includes the following columns: 1) document name, 2) document date, 3) starting page # in ECF No. 1-1, 4) ending page # in ECF No. 1-1. In addition, Defendant should provide the Court with a copy of the state court docket sheet if it is not included in the 489 pages that were already submitted to the Court. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 11/14/2018. (CCL) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION to Set Aside Judgment by OPTION ONE MORTGAGE COMPANY INC filed by AMY HANNA KEENEY. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit True and Correct Copy of Sand Canyon's 2008 Annual Registration)(KEENEY, AMY) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      ANSWER to Complaint by OPTION ONE MORTGAGE COMPANY INC.(KEENEY, AMY) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by OPTION ONE MORTGAGE COMPANY INC identifying Corporate Parent NEW CASTLE HOLDCO LLC, Corporate Parent BLOCK FINANCIAL LLC, Corporate Parent H&R BLOCK GROUP INC., Corporate Parent H&R BLOCK INC for OPTION ONE MORTGAGE COMPANY INC. (KEENEY, AMY) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Jurisdictional Statement by OPTION ONE MORTGAGE COMPANY INC (KEENEY, AMY) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE NOTICE OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by PEDRO J BURGOS (JONES, FREDERICK) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: 11/7/2018 Order - Rules 16/26
                                              RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 12/19/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 11/7/2018 (tlf).
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: 11/7/2018 Order - Rules 16/26
                                                Please ignore. Wrong document attached. RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 12/19/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 11/7/2018 (tlf). Modified on 11/7/2018 (tlf).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL against PEDRO J BURGOS Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-3014805, $400 filed by Option One Mortgage Corporation Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit All documents in state court case, # 2 Exhibit Affidavits, # 3 Exhibit State Court Removal Notice, # 4 Exhibit Assignment, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEENEY, AMY) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Notice of Deficiency; Document must be re-filed; Related document: 22 Motion for Sanctions filed by PEDRO J. BURGOS; Motion requested multiple reliefs yet only one was selected. The CM/ECF procedures manual provides as follows: "Motions with Multiple Reliefs Requested. When a motion requests multiple or alternative reliefs, it is especially important to select multiple reliefs when filing. For instance, with a combined motion to dismiss and motion to strike, you must select both reliefs to dismiss' and 'to strike. You do this by clicking on each motion relief from the drop down menu. You cannot select only the motion to dismiss and then type in the text box and motion to strike. It is imperative that all relief categories are specifically selected. The Case Management/Electronic Case Filing system will then track each relief as a separate request for action. This helps the court ensure that all matters are properly addressed. Failure to comply with this requirement may result in a request for relief that is not tracked on the pending motion reports used in case management. " Motion must be re-filed (tlf).
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Notice of Deficiency; Document must be re-filed; Related document(s): 15 Motion to Remand filed by PEDRO J BURGOS; The memorandum in support and exhibits were not properly attached to the motion. The CM/EC procedures manual provides as follows: "Motions and Related Documents. A motion and any supporting documents filed concurrently with that motion (e.g., memorandum in support, statement of material facts, exhibits, affidavits) should be filed in a single docket entry. Likewise, a response or reply brief and any concurrently filed supporting documents should be filed as a single docket entry. The motion, response, or reply should be the main document, and the supporting documents should be filed as attachments. For example, a summary judgment motion docket entry should look as follows: [#] Motion for Summary Judgment; Attachment 1 - Memorandum In Support; Attachment 2 - Declaration of John Smith, Exhibit List; Attachment 3; Exhibit A Letter from E. Bennet to C. Lucas" Each exhibit must be attached and identified as a separate attachment and must be labeled in the appropriate boxes within the ECF document upload screen with the available category type and a brief description. Document must be re-filed (tlf).
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Notice of Deficiency; Document must be re-filed as one entry as explained in the e-mail concomitantly sent with this deficiency.; Related document(s): 17 Memorandum in Support, 16 Motion to Remand filed by PEDRO J BURGOS (tlf).
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Notice of Deficiency; No Need to re-file; Related documents: 13 Memorandum in Support filed by WELLS FARGO BANK NA and 12 Motion to Intervene filed by WELLS FARGO BANK NA; Motions and memoranda in support should be filed as a single entry. The CM/ECF procedures provides as follows: "Motions and Related Documents. A motion and any supporting documents filed concurrently with that motion (e.g., memorandum in support, statement of material facts, exhibits, affidavits) should be filed in a single docket entry. Likewise, a response or reply brief and any concurrently filed supporting documents should be filed as a single docket entry. The motion, response, or reply should be the main document, and the supporting documents should be filed as attachments. For example, a summary judgment motion docket entry should look as follows: [#] Motion for Summary Judgment; Attachment 1 Memorandum In Support". Additionally, the motion was not dated. Lastly, the moving party was entered using punctuation. All parties must be added without punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia (tlf).
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Georgia Attorney Admission Fee Met by LAURA MIRMELLI (nop)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Notice of Deficiency; Related document: 1 Notice of Removal filed by SAND CANYON CORP; Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately (tlf).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Notice of Deficiency; Notice to Counsel - Frederick Jones. Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please login as soon as possible and update your user account via Utilities - Your Account (tlf).
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Notice of Deficiency; Related document: 1 Notice of Removal, filed by SAND CANYON CORP; Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed (tlf).
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE TO COUNSEL LAURA MIRMELLI - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing may be scheduled (tlf),
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?