Raymond v. Franzzini
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-02566

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 1, 2019 at 12:38 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Nathaniel Raymond, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nathaniel Raymond
v.
No Logo Doctor, Defendant
No Logo Gary Mohr, Defendant
No Logo Governor John Kasic, Defendant
No Logo L.T. Rhosatta, Defendant
No Logo Mike DeWine, Defendant
No Logo Mrs. Franzzini, Defendant
No Logo Mrs. Vantelly, Defendant
No Logo Nurse Cox, Defendant
No Logo Roger Wilson, Defendant
No Logo Warden Chris LaRose, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: 11/7/2018 Complaint
        Complaint against Nurse Cox, Mike DeWine, Doctor, Mrs. Franzzini, John Kasic, Chris LaRose, Gary Mohr, L.T. Rhosatta, Mrs. Vantelly, Roger Wilson. Filing fee not paid. Filed by Nathaniel Raymond. (Attachments: # 1 Cover letter with envelope) (M,L)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (M,L)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,L)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 3 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?