County of Orange, Treasurer-Tax Collector v. Tesla Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Orange, Case No. 30-2017-00909290-SC-SC-CJC

Tags

Reality Check: Tesla, Inc.

This docket is featured in the January 7, 2020 article Reality Check: Tesla, Inc..

Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo County of Orange, Treasurer-Tax Collector, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: 6/21/2018
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY COUNTY OF ORANGE TREASURER - TAX COLLECTOR FOR 03 - SMALL CLAIMS $1,500 OR LESS IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12371607 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12195377.
    Blank 8 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: 6/14/2017
    AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY COUNTY OF ORANGE, TREASURER-TAX COLLECTOR ON 06/14/2017
      Blank 7 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: 6/14/2017
      CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
        Blank 6 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: 6/14/2017
        MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 06/14/2017 08:30:00 AM.
          Blank 5 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: 6/14/2017
          COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.
            Blank 4 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: 6/14/2017
            PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.
              Blank 3 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017
              PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY COUNTY OF ORANGE, TREASURER-TAX COLLECTOR ON 03/30/2017
                Blank 2 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017
                SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/14/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: 3/10/2017
                  PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY COUNTY OF ORANGE, TREASURER-TAX COLLECTOR ON 03/10/2017

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 196 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?