Mintz v. Vitalink Pharmacy
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-00508-WMN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Martin B. Mintz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Azrael, Gann & Franz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Albert Azrael +1 410 821 6800 +1 410 821 1265 JAzrael@agflaw.com
v.
No Logo Vitalink Pharmacy Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Kevin Kobbe +1 410 580 3000 +1 410 580 3189 kevin.kobbe@dlapiper.com
Space Richard Marc Kremen +1 410 580 4191 +1 410 580 3191 Richard.Kremen@dlapiper.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 2/20/1998
Jury Demand Both
Demand $450000
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Baltimore County
Terminated 11/20/1998
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 97357009CC9011[CC Balto. City]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 11/20/1998, Entered: 11/23/1998 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice and "APPROVAL" (Signed William M. Nickerson, 11/19/98)(c/m 11/19/98 chambers)(microfilmed 11/23/98 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/20/1998, Entered: 11/24/1998 Terminated Case
    Case closed (cag, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 6/15/1998, Entered: 6/17/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
      MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 6/15/98; c/m chambers ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 6/12/1998, Entered: 6/15/1998 Motion to Amend/Correct
        JOINT MOTION by Martin B. Mintz, Vitalink Pharmacy to Modify/Amend [7-1] Scheduling order . (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 4/1/1998, Entered: 4/8/1998 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER "GRANTING" [9-1] motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 3/31/98; c/m 4/1/98 chambers ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: 3/16/1998, Terminated: 4/1/1998 Motion for Leave to File
            MOTION by Martin B. Mintz for Leave to File Amended Complaint and proposed amended complaint. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 3/3/1998, Entered: 3/10/1998 Response
              RESPONSE by Vitalink Pharmacy to [6-1] order (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 3/4/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 2/27/98; c/m chambers ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 2/24/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                  STANDING ORDER ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson ) (c/m 2/24/98-ss) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 2/24/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998 Remark
                    Notice of Removal Mailed to Counsel (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998 Answer
                      ANSWER to Complaint by Vitalink Pharmacy; jury demand (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998 ~Notice (other)
                        NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal by Vitalink Pharmacy (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998 Summons Issued
                          SUMMONS(ES) (30) days issued for Vitalink Pharmacy (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT AND ELECTION FOR JURY TRIAL and Exhibits 1 thru 3 filed (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998 Notice of Removal
                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL; FILING FEE $150.00 RECEIPT #B147500 (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998 Remark
                                ABOVE PLEADINGS ARE ALL COPIES OF PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 43 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?