Allstate Insurance Company v. Derek L Bittner D.C., P.C. d/b/a Bittner Chiropractic Center
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-13484

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 10, 2019 at 3:35 PM DT (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Appear*
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: None Appear*
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: None Referring Other Matters to Magistrate Judge*
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Appear*
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None Referring Other Matters to Magistrate Judge*
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Appear*
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Amended Answer to Complaint
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Show Cause
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Answer to Third Party Complaint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/21/2019, Entered: None Appearance
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/21/2019, Entered: None Appearance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/21/2019, Entered: None Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/21/2019, Entered: None Civil Case - Complaint, Third Party
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/21/2019, Entered: None Answer
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to file Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiffs' 1 Complaint. (Response due by 2/4/2019) Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018 Reassignment/DisqualificationCourt Filing
                                            ORDER Re: Disqualification of Judge. REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds in Detroit to District Judge Judith E. Levy in Ann Arbor. (NAhm)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Reassignment/Disqualification
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                Order Re: Disqualification of Judge. (NAhm) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Nicole Bittner, D.C. waiver sent on 11/8/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Mark Radom waiver sent on 11/8/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Derek Bittner, D.C. waiver sent on 11/8/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. D & M Management, LLC waiver sent on 11/8/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Superior Diagnostics, Inc. d/b/a Superior Imaging waiver sent on 11/8/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Midwest Medical Associates, Inc. waiver sent on 11/8/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Elite Rehabilitation, Inc. waiver sent on 11/8/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Elite Chiropractic, P.C. waiver sent on 11/8/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Elite Health Centers, Inc. waiver sent on 11/8/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Derek L Bittner D.C., P.C. d/b/a Bittner Chiropractic Center waiver sent on 11/8/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Magistrate Reassignment/DisqualificationCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER of RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub to Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (NAhm)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018 Appearance
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Adam G. Gutbezahl on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Gutbezahl, Adam)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018 Appearance
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Tertan on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Tertan, John)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018 Appearance
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Tilden on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Tilden, Nathan)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018 Appearance
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. King, Jr on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (King, Richard)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                  NOTICE by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Certificate of No Liability Insurance (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018 Civil Case - Complaint
                                                                                      COMPLAINT filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company against Derek Bittner, D.C., Nicole Bittner, D.C., D & M Management, LLC, Derek L Bittner D.C., P.C. d/b/a Bittner Chiropractic Center, Elite Chiropractic, P.C., Elite Health Centers, Inc., Elite Rehabilitation, Inc., Midwest Medical Associates, Inc., Mark Radom, Superior Diagnostics, Inc. d/b/a Superior Imaging with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6981914 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Cook County, IL - County Where Action Arose: Macomb County, MI - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb County, MI. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit 37, # 39 Exhibit 38, # 40 Exhibit 39, # 41 Exhibit 40, # 42 Exhibit 41, # 43 Exhibit 42, # 44 Exhibit 43, # 45 Exhibit 44, # 46 Exhibit 45, # 47 Exhibit 46, # 48 Exhibit 47, # 49 Exhibit 48, # 50 Exhibit 49, # 51 Exhibit 50, # 52 Exhibit 51, # 53 Exhibit 52, # 54 Exhibit 53, # 55 Exhibit 54, # 56 Exhibit 55, # 57 Exhibit 56, # 58 Exhibit 57, # 59 Exhibit 58, # 60 Civil Action Cover Sheet, # 61 Combined Summonses) (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?