USA v. Hunter et al
Criminal Case California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cr-03677-W

Tags
Last Updated November 8, 2018 at 10:46 PM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emily W. Allen +1 202 307 0946 emily.allen@usdoj.gov
Space Phillip L B Halpern +1 619 557 5610 +1 619 557 7055 Phillip.Halpern@usdoj.gov
Space W Mark Conover +1 619 557 5200 +1 619 557 2757 mark.conover@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Duncan D. Hunter, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Seltzer Caplan McMahon & Vitek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip Baker Adams +61968 530 03x3035 +1 619 685 3100 padams@scmv.com
Space Ricardo Arias Gutierrez +1 619 685 3172 +1 619 702 6841 arias@scmv.com
Space Gregory Vega +1 619 685 3040 +1 619 702 6814 vega@scmv.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Duncan D. Hunter (1)
Office San Diego
Filed 8/21/2018
County San Diego
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371 - Conspiracy to Commit Offenses
Count 2-44
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343; 182 - Wire Fraud; Aiding and Abetting
Count 45-57
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1519.F
Offense Level 4
181519; 182 - Falsification of Records; Aiding and Abetting
Count 58-60
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 13-9999.F
Offense Level 4
5230109(d), 30114(b)(1); 182 - Prohibited Use of Campaign Contributions; Aiding and Abetting
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flags PROTO
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Order on Motion to continue
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: 9/25/2018, Terminated: 9/26/2018 Motion to Continue
    Joint MOTION to Continue the Status Hearing and Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Duncan D. Hunter, Margaret E. Hunter. (Allen, Emily) (jao).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 24 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/25/2018 Status HearingCourt Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas J. Whelan: Status Hearing as to Duncan D. Hunter, Margaret E. Hunter held on 9/24/2018. Defendants' oral request to continue-Granted. Status Hearing set for 12/3/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. Time is excluded: XT1 - Continuance granted, failure to continue would stop further proceedings or result in miscarriage of justice 9/24/18 to 12/03/18. (Court Reporter James Pence). (AUSAs Emily Allen, Phillip Halpern, Mark Conover). (Defense Attorneys Gregory Vega, Ricardo Arias Gutierrez(1), Thomas McNamara(2)). (no document attached) (bjb)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
        ORDER Excluding Time Under Speedy Trial Act re [21] Motion to Continue as to Duncan D. Hunter (1), Margaret E. Hunter (2). Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 9/6/2018.(jao)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 bondCourt Filing
          P/S Bond Filed as to Margaret E. Hunter in amount of $ 10,000. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. (Document applicable to USA, Margaret E. Hunter.) (jao)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018, Terminated: 9/6/2018 Motion to Continue
            Joint MOTION to Continue and Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Duncan D. Hunter, Margaret E. Hunter. (Allen, Emily) (jao).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 20 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Motion SettingCourt Filing
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas J. Whelan: Motion Setting as to Duncan D. Hunter, Margaret E. Hunter held on 9/4/2018. Status Hearing set for 9/24/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. Excludable(s) started as to Duncan D. Hunter, Margaret E. Hunter: XT1 - Continuance granted, failure to continue would stop further proceedings or result in miscarriage of justice 9/4/18 - 9/24/18. (Court Reporter James Pence). (AUSAs Phillip Halpern, Emily Allen, and Mark Conover). (Defendant's Attorneys Gregory Vega(1), Thomas McNamara (2)). (no document attached) (bjb)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Notice - other
                Stipulation For Order Authorizing Disclosure of Grand Jury Matter and Sealed Documents and For Protective Order. (jao)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 protective orderCourt Filing
                  Order Authorizing Disclosure and Protective Order Regarding Discovery as to Duncan D. Hunter, Margaret E. Hunter. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/28/2018. (jao)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 warrant returned unexecuted
                    Warrant Returned Unexecuted, in case as to Margaret E. Hunter (jao)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 warrant returned unexecuted
                      Warrant Returned Unexecuted, in case as to Duncan D. Hunter (jao)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Philip Baker Adams appearing for Duncan D. Hunter (Adams, Philip)Attorney Philip Baker Adams added to party Duncan D. Hunter(pty:dft) (jao).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 bondCourt Filing
                          Appearance Bond Filed as to Duncan D. Hunter in amount of $ $15,000 P/S, Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/23/2018. (Document applicable to USA, Duncan D. Hunter.) (anh)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 Abstract of Order
                            ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Margaret E. Hunter. Defendant appeared in Court, fingerprint and release. (jao).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 Abstract of Order
                              ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Duncan D. Hunter. Defendant appeared in Court, fingerprint and release. (jao)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 order setting conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Margaret E. Hunter (2) $10,000 P/S. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/23/2018. (jao)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 order setting conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                  ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Duncan D. Hunter (1) $15,000 P/S. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/23/2018. (jao)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 9 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018 English
                                    ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Duncan D. Hunter, Margaret E. Hunter (no document attached) (aje)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 8 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Arraignment on Indictment and Initial Appearance as to Duncan D. Hunter (1) Count 1,2-44,45-57,58-60 and Margaret E. Hunter (2) Count 1,2-44,45-57,58-60 held on 8/23/2018. Not Guilty plea entered. Attorney Gregory A Vega and Ricardo Arias Gutierrez present and retained as counsel for Duncan D. Hunter. Attorney Thomas W McNamara and Logan Daniel Smith present and retained as counsel for Margaret E. Hunter. Bond set as to Duncan D. Hunter (1) $15,000 PS secured by 1 FRA and Margaret E. Hunter (2) $10,000 PS secured by 1 FRA. Bond must be submitted by close of business 8/28/18. ( Motion Setting set for 9/4/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Thomas J. Whelan) (CD# 8/23/2018 WVG 18-1:10:31-10:40). (Plaintiff Attorney Phillip Halpern AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Gregory Vega RET, Ricardo Arias RET; Dft2 Thomas McNamara RET, Logan Smith RET). (aje)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Emily Allen appearing for USA. (Allen, Emily)Attorney Emily Allen added to party USA(pty:pla) (jao).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: 8/22/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Phillip L B Halpern appearing for USA. (Halpern, Phillip)Attorney Phillip L B Halpern added to party USA(pty:pla) (jao).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: 8/22/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE W Mark Conover appearing for USA. (Conover, W)Attorney W Mark Conover added to party USA(pty:pla) (jao).
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 warrant issuedCourt Filing
                                              ARREST WARRANT ISSUED by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo in case as to Margaret E. Hunter. (jrm)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 warrant issuedCourt Filing
                                                ARREST WARRANT ISSUED by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo in case as to Duncan D. Hunter. (jrm)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 Set/Reset Duty HearingsCourt Filing
                                                  Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Duncan D. Hunter, Margaret E. Hunter: Arraignment on Indictment set for 8/23/2018 before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. (no document attached) (lao)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 indictment
                                                    INDICTMENT as to Duncan D. Hunter (1) count(s) 1, 2-44, 45-57, 58-60, Margaret E. Hunter (2) count(s) 1, 2-44, 45-57, 58-60. (jrm)(jrd)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 35 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?