United States v. Sayoc
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cr-00820

Tags
Last Updated August 7, 2019 at 4:47 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel S Adelsberg +1 347 501 0979 samuel.adelsberg@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Emil Joseph Bove, III +1 212 637 2444 +1 212 637 2443 Emil.Bove@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jane Kim +1 212 637 2038 jane.kim@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jason Andrew Richman +1 212 637 2589 +1 212 637 2527 jason.richman@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Cesar Altieri Sayoc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL DEFENDERS OF THE MD GA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sarah Jane Baumgartel +1 212 417 8772 +1 212 571 0392 sarah_baumgartel@fd.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Gallicchio +1 718 812 6164 Amy_Gallicchio@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Reply (non-motion)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: None Remark
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None Letter - Sentencing
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 38 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Remark
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Remark
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Order
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Remark
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Order
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Order
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Order
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Reply (non-motion)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Remark
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Waiver of Indictment
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Information - Felony
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Cesar Altieri Sayoc. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Arraignment proceeding held on 11/15/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Cesar Altieri Sayoc re: Arraignment held on 11/15/18 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jerry Harrison, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/18/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2019. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: 11/15/2018 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                        PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Cesar Altieri Sayoc. WHEREAS, defendant CESAR ALTIERI SAYOC, a/k/a "Cesar Randazzo," a/k/a "Cesar Altieri," a/k/a "Cesar Altieri Randazzo," has certain rights under the United States Constitution, federal statutes, and the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, to pretrial discovery; WHEREAS, the Government recognizes its obligation to provide such discovery materials to the defendant, consistent with national security concerns, the need to protect public safety, the confidentiality of ongoing investigations, and the confidentiality interests of others; WHEREAS, the discovery materials that the Government intends to provide to the defendant contain materials that, if disseminated to third parties, could, among other things, pose a threat to public safety, implicate national security concerns, impede ongoing investigations, and implicate the safety, privacy, and confidentiality interests of others; WHEREAS, the Government has demonstrated good cause for the relief set forth herein; WHEREAS, the defendant, by his attorneys, Sarah Baumgartel and Amy Gallicchio, consents to the entry of this Order; NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 16(d): 1. Discovery materials designated as "Protected Materials" by the Government shall be used by the defendant, his counsel, and his counsel's agents only for purposes of defending the charges, in connection with sentencing, and pursuing any appeals in this criminal action. To the extent the Protected Materials are shown to additional persons consistent with the terms set forth below, those additional persons may use the Protected Materials only in connection with this criminal action. 2. The Protected Materials and the information contained or disclosed therein: a. Shall be used by the defendant or his counsel only for purposes of this criminal action; b. Shall not be disclosed in any form or way by the defendant or his counsel to any third party except as set forth in paragraphs 2(c) and 3 below; c. May be disclosed only by the defendant's counsel and only to the following persons (hereinafter "Designated Persons"):...[See this Protective Order]... 4. The defendant and his counsel shall provide a copy of this Order to Designated Persons to whom materials subject to the protections of this Order are disclosed pursuant to paragraphs 2(c) or 3. Designated Persons shall be subject to the terms of this Order. 5. Discovery materials designated as "Sensitive Materials" by the Government shall be subject to all of the protections and terms set forth in paragraphs I through 4. In addition, the defendant is precluded from possessing any Sensitive Materials (or any copies of such materials) in any jail facility, either before, during, or after trial, except that the defendant may review Sensitive Materials in the possession of defense counsel or other staff employed by the defense, when in the presence of defense counsel or other staff employed by the defense. 6. The Government shall designate all materials subject to this protective order in a manner indicating their status as Protected Materials and/or Sensitive Materials. The defendant reserves the right to oppose the Government's designation of specific materials as either Protected Materials or Sensitive Materials. If the defendant opposes the Government's designation of materials pursuant to this paragraph, the parties shall meet and confer in an effort to resolve the dispute. If the dispute is not resolved, the Government shall be required to show good cause as to why those specific materials must be designated as either Protected Materials or Sensitive Materials. The defendant shall treat the challenged materials as Protected Materials and/or Sensitive Materials pending the Court's order regarding whether the Government has made the requisite showing of good cause with respect to those materials. 7. The provisions of this Order shall not be construed as preventing the disclosure of any information in any motion, hearing, trial, or sentencing proceeding held in this action or to any judge or magistrate of this Court in connection with the above-captioned matter. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/15/2018)(bw)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Amy Gallicchio appearing for Cesar Altieri Sayoc. Appearance Type: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment. (Gallicchio, Amy)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 indictment
                                                                            INDICTMENT FILED as to Cesar Altieri Sayoc (1) count(s) 1-5, 6-10, 11-15, 16-20, 21-25, 26-30. (jm)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger: Initial Appearance as to Cesar Altieri Sayoc held on 11/6/2018., Deft Appears with Federal Defender Sarah Baumgartel and AUSA Emil Bove, III for the government. Detention on Consent w/o Prejudice; ( Preliminary Hearing set for 11/13/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Unassigned.) (dif) Modified on 11/7/2018 (dif). [1:18-mj-09159-UA] (Entered: 11/06/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Order Appointing Public DefenderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Cesar Altieri Sayoc. Sarah Jane Baumgartel for Cesar Altieri Sayoc appointed.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 11/6/2018)(dif) [1:18-mj-09159-UA] (Entered: 11/06/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Financial Affidavit-CJA 23Court Filing
                                                                                  CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Cesar Altieri Sayoc. (Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger) (Federal Defender Sarah Baumgartel Appointed) (dif) [1:18-mj-09159-UA] (Entered: 11/06/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
                                                                                    Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Cesar Altieri Sayoc from the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (dif) [1:18-mj-09159-UA] (Entered: 11/05/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                      FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - LETTER by USA as to Cesar Altieri Sayoc addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Emil Bove dated November 5, 2018 re: Presentment Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Enclosures)(Bove, Emil) Modified on 11/5/2018 (ka). [1:18-mj-09159-UA] (Entered: 11/05/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                        FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - LETTER by USA as to Cesar Altieri Sayoc addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Emil Bove dated October 30, 2018 re: SDFL Bail and Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. SDNY Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B. Miami-Dade Court Documents)(Bove, Emil) Modified on 10/31/2018 (ka). [1:18-mj-09159-UA] (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Federal Defender Sarah Jane Baumgartel appearing for Cesar Altieri Sayoc. (dif) [1:18-mj-09159-UA] (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                            COMPLAINT as to Cesar Altieri Sayoc (1). In Violation of 18 U.S.C. 1716, 879, 844 (d), (e), 875, 111, and 2 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker) (dif) [1:18-mj-09159-UA] (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Arraignment as to Cesar Altieri Sayoc (1) Count 1-5,6-10,11-15,16-20,21-25,26-30 held on 11/15/2018. Plea entered by Cesar Altieri Sayoc Not Guilty. Deft pres w/attys Sarah Baumgartel and Amy Gallicchio, Govt pres by Emil Bove, AUSA, Jane Kim, AUSA. Jason Richman, AUSA, Samuel Adelsberg, AUSA, Court Reporter pres. DEFT WAIVES PUBLIC READING AND PLEADS NOT GUILTY. NEXT APPEARANCE FEBRUARY 7, 2019 AT 3:30PM. DEFT CONT'D REMANDED. JURY TRIAL DATE SET July 15, 2109 at 9;30 a.m. TIME EXCLUDED in the interest of justice pursuant to section 3161 of Title 18. (Jury Trial set for 7/15/2019 at 09:30 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 03:30 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.) (jbo)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Case Designated ECF as to Cesar Altieri Sayoc. (jm)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None arrest
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Arrest of Cesar Altieri Sayoc. (dif) [1:18-mj-09159-UA]
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Non-ECF Case Error
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF CASE ERROR. Note to Attorney Bove, Emil as to Cesar Altieri Sayoc: to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document Letter Motion, Document No. Motions. This case is not ECF. (ka) [1:18-mj-09159-UA]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF CASE ERROR. Note to Attorney Bove, Emil as to Cesar Altieri Sayoc: to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document Letter, Document No. 3. This case is not ECF. (ka) [1:18-mj-09159-UA]
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Non-ECF Case Error
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Non-ECF Case Error
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Arrest - Other District
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Attorney update in case as to Cesar Altieri Sayoc. Attorney Sarah Jane Baumgartel for Cesar Altieri Sayoc added.. (dif) [1:18-mj-09159-UA]
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Arrest of Cesar Altieri Sayoc in the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (dif) [1:18-mj-09159-UA]
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 56 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?