GAINES v. JONES
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-01332

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 10, 2021 at 12:04 PM DT (1.2 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LORINE GAINES, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Human Rights Defense Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Masimba Maxwell Mutamba +1 561 360 2523 +1 866 735 7136 mmutamba@humanrightsdefensecenter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Sabarish P. Neelakanta

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MASIMBA M MUTAMBA +1 561 360 2523 +1 866 735 7136 mmutamba@hrdc-law.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sabarish Neelakanta +1 561 360 2523 sneelakanta@hrdc-law.org

Toggle Switch Represented by THE FERGUSON FIRM - RIVIERA BEACH FL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED EDWIN FERGUSON +1 561 840 1846 eferguson@thefergusonfirm.net
v.
No Logo Corizon Health, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by THE OLD ROBB & STUCKY BLDG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregg Alan Toomey +1 239 337 1630 +1 239 337 0307 gat@thetoomeylawfirm.com
No Logo Julie Jones, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by HENRY BUCHANAN HUDSON ETC - TALLAHASSEE FL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOEL STEVEN CARTER +1 850 222 2920 +1 850 224 0034 scarter@henryblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MIRIAM REBEKKAH COLES +1 850 222 2920 +1 850 224 0034 mcoles@henryblaw.com
No Logo Kevin D. Jordan, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by HENRY BUCHANAN HUDSON ETC - TALLAHASSEE FL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOEL STEVEN CARTER +1 850 222 2920 +1 850 224 0034 scarter@henryblaw.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (171) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Order Directing Compliance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Order Directing Compliance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Notice of Settlement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None Exhibit List
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Trial Brief
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Exhibit List
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Proposed verdict form filed
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Trial Brief
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Trial Brief
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Proposed verdict form filed
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Proposed Voir Dire
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Statement of the case for trial
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Order on motion to allow electronic equipment
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None Final pretrial conference
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Witness List
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Allow electronic equipment
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None Order directing response to motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Case management and scheduling order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Amicus Brief / Document
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response / Reply
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Notice of Unavailability
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Notice of Unavailability
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response / Reply
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None *Order pdf
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/29/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/29/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: None *Order pdf
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None Mediation report
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: None Case management and scheduling order
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None Notice of mediation conference/hearing
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/29/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response / Reply
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Case management and scheduling order
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Case management and scheduling order
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/23/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Case management and scheduling order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to Amend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to Amend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Case management and scheduling order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 35 MOTION to Dismiss 24 Amended Complaint filed by Corizon Health Inc. (Toomey, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 44 Corizon's unopposed motion for leave to reply; reply of no longer than 5 pages may be filed by 1/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 12/21/2018. (CAW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by LORINE GAINES identifying Other Affiliate LORINE GAINES for LORINE GAINES.. (Mutamba, Masimba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: 12/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Julie Jones, Kevin D. Jordan. (Carter, Joel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: 12/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for leave to file a Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by Corizon Health Inc. (Toomey, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Mutamba, Masimba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED RESPONSE in Opposition re 35 MOTION to Dismiss 24 Amended Complaint filed by LORINE GAINES. (Mutamba, Masimba) Modified text on 12/19/2018. (AEJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 34 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by LORINE GAINES. (Mutamba, Masimba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 35 MOTION to Dismiss 24 Amended Complaint filed by LORINE GAINES. (Mutamba, Masimba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/4/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Case Management Report Form, # 2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 36 plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time; plaintiff's responses to 34, 35 motions to dismiss due by 12/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 11/30/2018. (CAW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 33 the parties' Joint Motion to Re-Designate as a Track Two Case with directions to the Clerk; directing the parties to hold a scheduling conference within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 11/29/2018. (KLC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 34 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, 35 MOTION to Dismiss 24 Amended Complaint by LORINE GAINES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mutamba, Masimba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss 24 Amended Complaint by Corizon Health Inc. (Toomey, Gregg) Modified on 11/21/2018 to create a docket entry relationship. (AEJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: 11/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Julie Jones, Kevin D. Jordan. (Carter, Joel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: 11/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Redesignate as a Track Two Case by Corizon Health Inc. (Toomey, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/14/2018. (CKS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to counsel of new case number and judge assignment 3:18-cv-1332-J-39PDB. (AEJ) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-00367. File received electronically
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - The parties' joint motion to transfer, ECF No. 26, is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to take all necessary steps to effectuate the transfer of this case to the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division. The Clerk is directed to close this case in the Northern District of Florida, Tallahassee Division. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/31/2018. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT RE: DISCOVERY by LORINE GAINES. (NEELAKANTA, SABARISH) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 10/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REQUIRING FURTHER BRIEFING - re: 26 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida. The parties failed to identify a division in the Middle District to which they seek transfer. On or before 11/1/2018, the parties shall inform this Court to which division of the Middle District of Florida the matter should be transferred. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/31/2018. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 10/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida by LORINE GAINES. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/13/2018). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (MUTAMBA, MASIMBA) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT - re: 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Inasmuch as Plaintiff has filed an amended complaint, ECF No. 24, the motion to dismiss, ECF No. 16, is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/20/2018. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 10/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by LORINE GAINES. (MUTAMBA, MASIMBA) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS - Plaintiff's Consented Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Corizon's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 21, is GRANTED. Plaintiff may respond to Corizon's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 16 ) on or before 10/22/2018. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/15/2018. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 10/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CORIZON HEALTH INC identifying Corporate Parent Valitas Holdings, Inc. for CORIZON HEALTH INC.. (TOOMEY, GREGG) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 10/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by LORINE GAINES. (NEELAKANTA, SABARISH) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 10/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S CONSENTED MOTION FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT - The consented motion for an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint, ECF No. 19, is GRANTED. Defendant shall respond on or before 10/22/2018. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/13/2018. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 10/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT by JULIE JONES, KEVIN D JORDAN. (CARTER, JOEL) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S CONSENTED MOTION FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT - Defendant Julie Jones's consented motion for an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint, ECF No. 14, is GRANTED. Defendant shall respond on or before 10/15/2018. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/2/2018. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 10/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 10/15/2018. Discovery Status Report due by 11/2/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/14/2018. Discovery due by 1/29/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/1/2018. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 10/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CORIZON HEALTH INC. (TOOMEY, GREGG) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 10/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by GREGG A TOOMEY on behalf of CORIZON HEALTH INC (TOOMEY, GREGG) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 10/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by JULIE JONES. (CARTER, JOEL) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 10/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by JOEL STEVEN CARTER on behalf of KEVIN D JORDAN (CARTER, JOEL) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 10/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by LORINE GAINES. KEVIN D JORDAN served on 9/22/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (MUTAMBA, MASIMBA) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 09/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by LORINE GAINES. CORIZON HEALTH INC served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (MUTAMBA, MASIMBA) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 09/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by LORINE GAINES. JULIE JONES served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Supplemental Service on Fla. Dep't of Financial Servs.) (MUTAMBA, MASIMBA) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 09/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by JOEL STEVEN CARTER on behalf of JULIE JONES (CARTER, JOEL) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by MASIMBA M MUTAMBA on behalf of LORINE GAINES (MUTAMBA, MASIMBA) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 08/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CIVIL COVER SHEET. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to JIMMY PATRONIS. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to JULIE JONES. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to KEVIN D JORDAN. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to CORIZON HEALTH INC. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: To Attorney NEELAKANTA re: 1 Complaint. A reminder that party names (including aliases) are to be added using all caps and no punctuation. (See "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing," available on Clerk's website.) The party names will be corrected by the clerk. Further, counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4246368.), filed by Lorine Gaines. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Summons - Jones, # 3 Exhibit Summons - Jordan, # 4 Exhibit Summons - Corizon, # 5 Exhibit Summons - Fla. Dept. Fin. Servs.) (NEELAKANTA, SABARISH) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.] (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Response Deadline - re: 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 10/16/2018. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 11/9/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?