Ricardo Ernesto Delgado v. Tesla Motors Inc
State Civil Lawsuit County Court in and for Broward County, Florida, Case No. CACE15007862

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Delgado, Ricardo Ernesto, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors Inc"
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: 10/14/2015
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 9 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: 7/9/2015
    Notice
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 8 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015
      Motion for Extension of Time
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 7 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015
        Motion for Enlargement of Time
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 6 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: 5/7/2015
          Filing Fee
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 5 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: 5/7/2015
            Summons Issued Fee
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 4 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: 5/4/2015
              Civil Cover Sheet
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 3 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: 5/4/2015
                Complaint (eFiled)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 2 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: 5/4/2015
                  eSummons Issuance
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 1 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: 5/4/2015
                    Exhibits
                      Request RequestSpace

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 13 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?