Estrellita Inc v. Tesla Motors Inc
State Civil Lawsuit County Court in and for Broward County, Florida, Case No. CACE15012952

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Estrellita Inc, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors Inc"
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: 1/8/2016
Satisfaction of Judgment
    Blank 13 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: 11/17/2015
    Default Final Judgment
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 12 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015
      Affidavit of Proof of Claim: AND NON-MILITARY SERViCE
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 11 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015
        Affidavit: IN PROOF OF COSTS
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 10 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015
          Affidavit: AS TO CALCULATION OF INTEREST
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 9 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015
            Motion for Default Final Judgment
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 8 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: 9/24/2015
              Motion for Default & Default
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 7 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: 8/18/2015
                Summons Returned Served
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 6 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: 7/28/2015
                  Filing Fee
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 5 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: 7/28/2015
                    Summons Issued Fee
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 4 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015
                      Civil Cover Sheet
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 3 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015
                        Civil Cover Sheet
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015
                          Complaint (eFiled)
                            Blank 1 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015
                            eSummons Issuance
                              Request RequestSpace

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 58 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?