DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA et al v. DETZNER
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Northern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-00520-MW-MJF
District Judge MARK E WALKER, presiding

Tags
Last Updated November 11, 2018 at 5:24 PM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bill Nelson For U.s. Senate, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer, Brooks, Demma and Blohm, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JENNIFER SUZANNE BLOHM +1 850 878 5212 +1 850 656 6750 jblohm@meyerbrookslaw.com
Space Ronald G. Meyer +1 850 878 5212 +1 850 656 6750 rmeyer@meyerbrookslaw.com
No Logo Democratic Executive Committee of Florida, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer, Brooks, Demma and Blohm, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JENNIFER SUZANNE BLOHM +1 850 878 5212 +1 850 656 6750 jblohm@meyerbrookslaw.com
Space Ronald G. Meyer +1 850 878 5212 +1 850 656 6750 rmeyer@meyerbrookslaw.com
v.
No Logo ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL - GAINES ST

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EDWARD M WENGER +1 850 414 3683 +1 850 410 2672 edward.wenger@myfloridalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space BLAINE H WINSHIP +1 850 414 3657 +1 850 488 4872 blaine.winship@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo KENNETH W DETZNER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Agency for Health Care Administration

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ASHLEY E DAVIS +1 850 245 6536 +1 850 245 6127 ashley.davis@dos.myflorida.com
Space BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY +1 352 219 5195 brad.mcvay@dos.myflorida.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hopping, Green & Sams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL +1 850 222 7500 +1 850 521 2733 MJazil@HGSLaw.com
Space Malcolm Noble Means +1 850 425 2352 +1 850 224 8551 Malcolmm@hgslaw.com
Space GARY VERGIL PERKO +1 850 222 7500 +1 850 224 8551 gperko@hgslaw.com
No Logo NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gray Robinson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ANDY V BARDOS +1 850 577 9090 +1 850 577 3311 andy.bardos@gray-robinson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holtzman Vogel Josefiak, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Brett Torchinsky +1 540 341 8808 +1 540 341 8809 jtorchinsky@hvjlaw.com
Office Tallahassee
Filed 11/8/2018
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 441 - Civil Rights: Voting
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Leon
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/11/2018, Entered: 11/11/2018 Order
ORDER SETTING PROCEDURES FOR HEARING AND ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/11/2018. (kjw)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/10/2018, Entered: 11/10/2018 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
    SCHEDULING ORDER. Judge Hinkle disqualified himself from this case. ECF No. [21]. I have considered the previous scheduling order, ECF No. [20], entered yesterday, November 9, 2018. I fully adopt that order. Accordingly, the parties are to strictly comply with the deadlines as set forth in ECF No. [20]. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/10/2018. (kjw)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 24 Filed: 11/10/2018, Entered: 11/10/2018 Notice of hearing on motion
      NOTICE of Hearing on [3] Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Temporary Injunction, Temporary Restraining Order, and Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2018 01:00 PM before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. United States Courthouse, 111 North Adams St., Tallahassee, Florida 32301. NOTE: If you or any party, witness, or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodation, such as a hearing impairment that requires a sign language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact Victoria Milton McGee at 850-521-3501 in the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ Kimberly WestphalDeputy Clerk (kjw)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/10/2018, Entered: 11/10/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
        ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. This Court has considered, without hearing, the following motions to appear pro hac vice, ECF Nos. [12], [13], [14], and [17]. The motions are GRANTED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/10/2018. (kjw) *Attoroneys Helgi C. Walker, Thomas H. Dupree, Jr., and Uzoma Nkwonta to be admitted to FLND and added to the case. Attorney Jason Torchinsky is already admitted in FLND.
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/10/2018, Entered: 11/10/2018 response in opposition to motion
          RESPONSE in Opposition re [3] Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Injection and Temporary Restraining Order filed by KENNETH W DETZNER. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/10/2018, Entered: 11/10/2018 Order
            ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/10/18. (sms)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Add and Terminate Judges
              CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER added. JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE no longer assigned to case. (sms)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Order on motion to intervene
                SCHEDULING ORDER (granting [11] Motion to Intervene; granting [15] Motion to Intervene). Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/9/18. (RH)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Status Conference
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 11/9/2018. Parties discuss the pending motions and the schedule for responding to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Ruling by Court: The Motions to Intervene are GRANTED. The deadline for response or further submissions on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction is Monday, November 12, 2018, at 12:00 p.m. Oral Argument will be set for Wednesday, November 14, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. An order is forthcoming. (Court Reporter Judy Gagnon) (ckm)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Notice - other
                    NOTICE OF FILING MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE re [4] Memorandum in Support of Motion, [3] Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Injection and Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Temporary Injunction, Temporary Restraining Order, and Preliminary Injunction) (BARDOS, ANDY)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018, Terminated: 11/10/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                      Emergency MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Uzoma Nkwonta.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4331695.) by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (BLOHM, JENNIFER)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Notice of appearance
                        NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD M WENGER on behalf of ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA (WENGER, EDWARD)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018, Terminated: 11/9/2018 Motion to intervene
                          Emergency MOTION to Intervene by ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA. (WENGER, EDWARD)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018, Terminated: 11/10/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                            First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4331668.) by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (TORCHINSKY, JASON)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018, Terminated: 11/10/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                              Emergency MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas H. Dupree, Jr..( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4331623.) by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit) (BARDOS, ANDY)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018, Terminated: 11/10/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                Emergency MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Helgi C. Walker.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4331588.) by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit) (BARDOS, ANDY)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018, Terminated: 11/9/2018 Motion to intervene
                                  Emergency MOTION to Intervene by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (BARDOS, ANDY)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Notice of hearing
                                    NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2018 04:00 PM before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Call in number: 888-684-8852Access code: 3243416#Security code: 1114# For better sound quality, please mute your phone when you are not speaking. s/ Cindy MarkleyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (ckm)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Notice of appearance
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEY E DAVIS on behalf of KENNETH W DETZNER (DAVIS, ASHLEY)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Summons issued
                                        Summons Issued as to KENNETH W DETZNER. (cle)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank  set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings
                                          Set Deadlines re: [20] SCHEDULING ORDER. Response to [3] Emergency MOTION for preliminary Injunction due by noon on Monday, 11/12/2018. That deadline will not roll over to the next day even though November 12 is a federal holiday. A hearing on the motion for temporary restraining order or preliminary injunction is set for Wednesday, 11/14/2018 01:00 PM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. (kjw)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018 Notice of appearance
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL on behalf of KENNETH W DETZNER (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018 Notice of appearance
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD G MEYER on behalf of BILL NELSON FOR U.S. SENATE, DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA (MEYER, RONALD)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BILL NELSON FOR U.S. SENATE, DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA. (BLOHM, JENNIFER)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018 memorandum in support of motion
                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [3] Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Injection and Temporary Restraining Order filed by BILL NELSON FOR U.S. SENATE, DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B) (BLOHM, JENNIFER)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018, Terminated: 11/10/2018 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                    Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Injection and Temporary Restraining Order by BILL NELSON FOR U.S. SENATE, DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA. (BLOHM, JENNIFER)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                      CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BLOHM, JENNIFER)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018 Complaint
                                                        COMPLAINT against KENNETH W DETZNER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4331117.), filed by DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA, BILL NELSON FOR U.S. SENATE. (Attachments: # (1) Summons) (BLOHM, JENNIFER)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Space Space

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 58 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?