Whittaker v. Internal Revenue Service
Federal Civil Lawsuit West Virginia Southern District Court, Case No. 5:17-cv-01926
District Judge Irene C. Berger, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 2, 2018 at 2:38 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Andrew J. Whittaker, Jr., Plaintiff
v.
United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "Internal Revenue Service"
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7422
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrew J. Whittaker, Jr for Response to Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents. (Dunlap, Robert)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrew J. Whittaker, Jr for Response To Second Set of Interrogatories. (Dunlap, Robert)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrew J. Whittaker, Jr for Supplemental Response to First Set of Interrogatories. (Dunlap, Robert)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Internal Revenue Service for Second Set of Interrogatories. (Bishop, Kyle)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Internal Revenue Service for Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents. (Bishop, Kyle)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrew J. Whittaker, Jr. for Response to the United States' First Set of Interrogatories. (Dunlap, Robert)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrew J. Whittaker, Jr. for Response to the United States' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents. (Dunlap, Robert)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrew J. Whittaker, Jr. for Initial Disclosure Under Rule 26(a). (Dunlap, Robert)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Internal Revenue Service for Initial Disclosures Under Rule 26(a) (Bishop, Kyle)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Internal Revenue Service for First Set of Interrogatories to Andrew J. Whittaker, Jr. (Bishop, Kyle)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Internal Revenue Service for First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents from Andrew J. Whittaker, Jr. (Bishop, Kyle)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Cancelling the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 6/28/2017; directing that this case proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 7/12/2017. Discovery requests to be completed by 2/16/2018 and all depositions by 4/13/2018. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 12/1/2017, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 1/5/2018, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 1/31/2018. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 4/6/2018. Motions in Limine to be filed by 4/23/2018, with responses due by 4/30/2018. Plaintiff's portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 6/22/2018. Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 6/29/2018. Proposed Charges to the Jury due 7/9/2018. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference set for 7/11/2018 at 1:30 PM in Beckley before Judge Irene C. Berger. Jury Trial set for 7/23/2018 at 9:00 AM in Beckley before Judge Irene C. Berger. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 6/12/2017. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Internal Revenue Service, Andrew J. Whittaker, Jr. (Bishop, Kyle) (Modified on 6/12/2017 to add party filer) (dvb).
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            REPLY by Andrew J. Whittaker, Jr. to 4 Answer to Complaint. (Dunlap, Robert)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary L. Call on behalf of Internal Revenue Service. (Call, Gary)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 5/31/2017. Rule 26(f) Meeting 6/7/2017. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 6/14/2017. Scheduling Conference at 03:00 PM on 6/28/2017 in Beckley. Entry of Scheduling Order 7/6/2017. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 7/13/2017. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 05/17/2017. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  ANSWER TO 1 Complaint by Internal Revenue Service.(Bishop, Kyle)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Andrew J. Whittaker, Jr for Internal Revenue Service, re: 1 Complaint, returnable 60 days. Original Summons and 4 copies returned to counsel for Plaintiff for service. (slr)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 5BECK003708. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Receipt for Filing Fee) (slr)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?