Hansen v. NCO Financial Systems, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:06-cv-00230-MJD-SRN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 2:45 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1692
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Michael J Davis on 09/05/2006. (SMS)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING CASE. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Michael J Davis on July 31, 2006. (dch)
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 0 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?