Whalen v. Dean, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-01470-CCB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Teresa Whalen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brickfield, Burchette, Ritts and Stone

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher G. Mackaronis +1 202 342 0800 +1 202 342 0807
v.
No Logo Ivan Matthew Campbell, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by BUC & BEARDSLEY, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carmen Mercedes Shepard +1 202 736 3620 +1 202 736 3608 cshepard@bucbeardsley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by griffinleahylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea M Leahy Fucheck +1 301 572 9292 +1 301 572 9220 andrea@griffinleahylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Joseph Curran, Jr. +1 410 576 6300 +1 410 576 6880
No Logo Montgomery County, Maryland, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Montgomery County Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharon V Burrell +1 240 777 6700 +1 240 777 6705 sharon.burrell@montgomerycountymd.gov
Space Joann Robertson +1 240 777 6700 +1 240 777 6706 joann.robertson@montgomerycountymd.gov
No Logo Robert L. Dean, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by BUC & BEARDSLEY, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carmen Mercedes Shepard +1 202 736 3620 +1 202 736 3608 cshepard@bucbeardsley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by griffinleahylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea M Leahy Fucheck +1 301 572 9292 +1 301 572 9220 andrea@griffinleahylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Joseph Curran, Jr. +1 410 576 6300 +1 410 576 6880
Office Baltimore
Filed 5/8/1998
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Frederick
Terminated 8/19/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MAG
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 39 Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING this action and each party is to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed. The entry of this order is without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause within 60 days to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 8/18/99) (c/m 8/19/99 bc) (MICROFILMED 8/19/99) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999 Terminated Case
    Case closed (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 38 Filed: 4/22/1999, Entered: 4/22/1999 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William G. Connelly for settlement or other ADR conference ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 4/19/99) (c/m 4/22/99 hsg) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/22/1999, Entered: 3/23/1999, Terminated: 3/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [37-1] motion of plaintiff to Extend Time for discovery deadlines to 4/30/99 ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 3/22/99) (c/m 3/23/99 jl) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document 37 Filed: 3/22/1999, Entered: 3/23/1999, Terminated: 3/22/1999 Motion for Extension of Time to File
          CONSENT MOTION by Teresa Whalen to Extend Time for discovery deadlines (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 36 Filed: 12/22/1998, Entered: 12/23/1998 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [35-1] assented to motion to Extend Time; AMENDING scheduling order as therein set forth ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 12/22/98) (c/m 12/23/98 jl) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 35 Filed: 12/22/1998, Entered: 12/23/1998, Terminated: 12/22/1998 Motion for Extension of Time to File
              ASSENTED TO MOTION by Robert L. Dean, Ivan Matthew Campbell Jr. to Extend Time (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 34 Filed: 12/22/1998, Entered: 12/23/1998 Notice of Appearance/Court Filing
                NOTICE of attorney appearance for Robert L. Dean, Ivan Matthew Campbell Jr. by Andrea Leahy-Fucheck and Carmen Shepard; withdrawing the appearance of Kathleen Hoke Dachille and APPROVAL (signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 12/22/98) (c/m 12/23/98 jl) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 33 Filed: 10/21/1998, Entered: 10/21/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                  MARGINAL ORDER "APPROVING" joint report on deposition hours ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 10/20/98) (c/m 10/21/98 jl)(jnl, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/21/1998
                    LREF
                    Blank 32 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998 Status Report
                    JOINT REPORT ON DEPOSITION HOURS by Teresa Whalen, Robert L. Dean, Ivan Matthew Campbell Jr., Montgomery County (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 31 Filed: 10/15/1998, Entered: 10/15/1998, Terminated: 8/19/1999 Answer
                      ANSWER to Complaint by Montgomery County (Attorney Sharon V. Burrell, Joann Robertson) (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 30 Filed: 10/13/1998, Entered: 10/14/1998 Answer
                        ANSWER to Complaint by Robert L. Dean (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 29 Filed: 10/13/1998, Entered: 10/14/1998 Answer
                          ANSWER to Complaint by Ivan Matthew Campbell Jr. (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 28 Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: 10/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [11-1] motion of defendant Thompson to Dismiss, denying [4-1] motion of defendants Dean and Campbell to Dismiss, denying [5-1] motion of defendant Montgomery County to Dismiss, denying as moot [18-1] motion of plaintiff to require service of answer to Count 1 by R. Dean, denying as moot [16-1] motion of plaintiff to Initiate Discovery, denying as moot [16-2] motion of plaintiff for the Entry of a Scheduling Order ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 10/1/98) (c/m 10/1/98 gs) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 27 Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: 10/2/1998 MemorandumCourt Filing
                              MEMORANDUM ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 10/1/98) (c/m 10/1/98 gs) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 26 Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: 10/2/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 10/1/98) (c/m 10/1/98 gs) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 25 Filed: 7/31/1998, Entered: 8/4/1998 Reply to Response
                                  REPLY in support by Teresa Whalen to her [16-1] motion to Initiate Discovery (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 24 Filed: 7/23/1998, Entered: 7/27/1998 Response in Opposition
                                    RESPONSE by Robert L. Dean in opposition to [18-1] motion to require service of answer to Count 1 by R. Dean by Teresa Whalen (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 23 Filed: 7/23/1998, Entered: 7/27/1998 Response in Opposition
                                      RESPONSE by Robert L. Dean, Ivan Matthew Campbell Jr. in opposition to [16-1] motion to Initiate Discovery by Teresa Whalen (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 22 Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: 7/21/1998 Response in Opposition
                                        RESPONSE by Charles W. Thompson, Montgomery County in opposition to [16-1] motion to Initiate Discovery or alternatively [16-2] motion for the Entry of a Scheduling Order by Teresa Whalen (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 21 Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: 7/21/1998 Response in Support of Motion
                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM by Montgomery County in support of its [5-1] motion to Dismiss and Exhibits 1-2 (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 20 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: 7/14/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                            REPLY by Robert L. Dean, Ivan Matthew Campbell Jr. to plaintiff's opposition to their [4-1] motion to Dismiss and Request for Hearing (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 19 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: 7/14/1998 Response in Support of Motion
                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM by Charles W. Thompson in support of his [11-1] motion to Dismiss (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 18 Filed: 7/8/1998, Entered: 7/9/1998 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                MOTION with memorandum in support by Teresa Whalen to require service of answer to Count 1 by R. Dean (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 7/7/1998, Entered: 7/8/1998 Notice of Voluntary DismissalCourt Filing
                                                  NOTICE of voluntary dismissal of Counts V and VI of the Complaint without prejudice and "APPROVAL" ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 7/7/98 ) (c/m 7/8/98-jan) (MICROFILMED 7/8/98) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 7/7/1998, Entered: 7/7/1998, Terminated: 10/1/1998 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                    MOTION by Teresa Whalen to Initiate Discovery , or Alternatively, for the Entry of a Scheduling Order and Exhibits A-C. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 7/7/1998, Entered: 7/7/1998, Terminated: 8/19/1999 Response in Opposition
                                                      RESPONSE by Teresa Whalen in opposition to [5-1] motion to Dismiss by Montgomery County; Exhibits A-D and Declaration. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 7/2/1998, Entered: 7/6/1998 Response in Opposition
                                                        RESPONSE by Teresa Whalen in opposition to [11-1] motion to Dismiss by Charles W. Thompson. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 6/30/1998, Entered: 6/30/1998, Terminated: 8/19/1999 Response in Opposition
                                                          RESPONSE by Teresa Whalen in opposition to [4-1] motion to Dismiss by Ivan Matthew Campbell Jr., Robert L. Dean and Exhibits A-C (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 6/23/1998, Entered: 6/23/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [7-1] motion of plaintiff to Extend Time to respond to motions to dismiss until 7/8/98 ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 6/23/98) (c/m 6/23/98 bc) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 6/23/1998, Entered: 6/23/1998, Terminated: 10/1/1998 Motion to Dismiss
                                                              MOTION with memorandum in support by Charles W. Thompson to Dismiss (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 06/23/1998
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: 6/23/1998 Local Rule
                                                                Local Rule 103.3 Certification by Ivan Matthew Campbell Jr. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: 6/23/1998 Local Rule
                                                                  Local Rule 103.3 Certification by Robert L. Dean (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: 6/23/1998 Correspondence
                                                                    CORRESPONDENCE by Robert L. Dean, Ivan Matthew Campbell Jr. RE: Do not oppose motion for extension of time filed by plaintiff on 6/19/98 (c/s0 (jnl, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 06/23/1998
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: 6/23/1998, Terminated: 6/23/1998 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                      MOTION by Teresa Whalen to Extend Time to respond to motions to dismiss (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 6/17/1998, Entered: 6/17/1998 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Robert L. Dean, Ivan Matthew Campbell Jr., Charles W. Thompson, Montgomery County 6/8/98 Answer due on 6/28/98 for Montgomery County, for Charles W. Thompson, for Ivan Matthew Campbell Jr., for Robert L. Dean (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/8/1998, Terminated: 10/1/1998 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                          MOTION with memorandum in support by Montgomery County to Dismiss (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 6/4/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                            MOTION with memorandum in support by Robert L. Dean, Ivan Matthew Campbell Jr. to Dismiss . (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 5/18/1998, Entered: 5/19/1998 Local Rule
                                                                              Local Rule 103.3 Certification by Teresa Whalen (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 5/8/1998, Entered: 5/8/1998 Summons Issued
                                                                                SUMMONS(ES) (20 days) issued for Robert L. Dean, Ivan Matthew Campbell Jr., Charles W. Thompson and Montgomery County (ajh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 5/8/1998, Entered: 5/8/1998 Jury Demand
                                                                                  DEMAND for jury trial by Teresa Whalen (ajh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 5/8/1998, Entered: 5/8/1998 Complaint
                                                                                    COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 127777 (ajh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 80 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?