Sebroski v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-01565-MJG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 12:55 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gary Sebroski, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Deborah E. Dwyer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah Elaine Dwyer +1 410 730 7887 +1 410 997 4351
No Logo Theodora Sebroski, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Space Nadira Clarke +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 nadira.clarke@usdoj.gov
Space Donna C Sanger +1 301 344 4433
Office Baltimore
Filed 5/15/1998
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Court Trial
County Howard
Terminated 11/9/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MAG-A
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/30/1999, Entered: 12/30/1999 Clerk's Order Taxing Cost
Clerk's Order taxing costs for bill of costs, in favor of Gary Sebroski, Theodora Sebroski against United States in the sum of $ 618.03. (c/i 12/30/99) (das, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 29 Filed: 12/20/1999, Entered: 12/21/1999 Response
    RESPONSE by United States to [26-1] Bill of costs by Theodora Sebroski. (c/s staff atty.) (das, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 28 Filed: 12/9/1999, Entered: 12/10/1999 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [27-1] motion of Defendant to Extend Time to fie response to Bill of Costs on or before 12/20/99. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 12/7/99) (c/m 12/9/99-jw) (das, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 27 Filed: 12/9/1999, Entered: 12/10/1999, Terminated: 12/9/1999 Motion for Extension of Time to File
        MOTION by United States to Extend Time to fie response to Bill of Costs . (c/s) (das, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 26 Filed: 11/22/1999, Entered: 11/22/1999 Bill of Costs
          Bill of costs by Theodora Sebroski and Attachments. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 25 Filed: 11/9/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER OF JUDGMENT ENTERING Judgment for Plaintiff in the total amount of $38,657.13 ($10,000.00 for pain and suffering, $1,016.92 for lost wages, $6,232.21 for past medical expenses and $21,408.00 for future medical expenses); CLOSING Case. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner 11/5/99) (c/m 11/8/99-mag.chambers) (microfilmed 11/10/99) (jb) (interest rate 5.411%) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 24 Filed: 11/9/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999 Description not availableCourt Filing
              FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW ( signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey 11/5/99) (c/m 11/8/99-mag.chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 11/9/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999 Terminated Case
                Case closed (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 9/29/1999, Entered: 9/30/1999 Trial Brief
                  POST TRIAL BRIEF by United States. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 9/22/1999, Entered: 9/22/1999 Exhibit
                    Exhibit lists by United States, Theodora Sebroski (jas, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: 9/22/1999 Bench Trial - Held
                      BENCH TRIAL - Day Two held before Gauvey, M.J. Closing Arguments. Court held decision SUB CURIA. er: Smith (jas, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 9/15/1999, Entered: 9/16/1999 Bench Trial - Held
                        BENCH TRIAL - Day One held before Gauvey, M.J. er: Smith Trial to be continued until a later date. (jas, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 21 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/15/1999 Motion in Limine
                          MOTION by United States in Limine RE: Plaintiff's exhibits Nos. 9,12 and 13 and Exhibit 1 (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 9/7/1999, Entered: 9/8/1999 Pretrial Conference - Final
                            Pre-trial conference held Gauvey, USMJ. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 20 Filed: 9/2/1999, Entered: 9/2/1999 Supplemental
                              SUPPLEMENT to joint memorandum and pretrial order by United States and Exhibits 1-2 (c/s USMJ Gauvey) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 09/02/1999
                                LREF
                                Blank 19 Filed: 5/5/1999, Entered: 5/6/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 5/5/99) (c/m 5/5/99-dc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 18 Filed: 4/21/1999, Entered: 4/22/1999, Terminated: 4/21/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [18-1] motion of USA to Substitute Attorney; terminated Charles J. Peters; Added Nadira Clarke. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey 4/20/99) (c/m 4/21/99-dc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 18 Filed: 4/21/1999, Entered: 4/22/1999, Terminated: 4/21/1999 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                    MOTION by United States to Substitute Attorney . (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 17 Filed: 4/16/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER SETTING date for scheudling conference. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey 4/16/99) (c/m 4/16/99) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 16 Filed: 3/17/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey for all proceedings and the entry of final judgment. (signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 3/11/99) (c/m 3/17/99-hsg)) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 15 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/22/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                          SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 2/19/99) (c/m 2/19/99- jw) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 14 Filed: 11/10/1998, Entered: 11/12/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER SETTING date for settlement conference. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Klein Jr. 11/9/98) (c/m 11/10/98-ncd) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 13 Filed: 10/14/1998, Entered: 10/16/1998 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Klein Jr. for settlement. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 10/1/98) (c/m 10/14/98-hsg) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 12 Filed: 8/28/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Strike [1-1] demand jury of Gary Sebroski, Theodora Sebroski. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 8/28/98 ) (c/m 8/28/98-jw) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 8/10/1998, Entered: 8/11/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [10-1] motion of Gina Davis, Dept. of Justice and FBI to Dismiss; granting [8-1] motion of Defendant to Dismiss Counts I, III and IV; "DISMISSING" defendants Gina Davis, the Department of Justice and the Federal Bureau of Investigation; "DIRECTING" this case will proceed on Count II only, as to the sole remaining defendant United States. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 8/10/98 ) (c/m 8/10/98-jw) (microfilmed 8/11/98) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 7/22/1998, Entered: 7/24/1998, Terminated: 8/10/1998 Motion to Dismiss
                                                    MOTION with memorandum in support by Federal Bureau, Gina Davis, U.S. Dept. Justice to Dismiss and Certification. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 7/22/1998, Entered: 7/24/1998, Terminated: 8/28/1998 Motion to Strike
                                                      MOTION with memorandum in support by United States to Strike [1-1] demand jury of Gary Sebroski, Theodora Sebroski . (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 7/22/1998, Entered: 7/24/1998 Motion to Dismiss
                                                        MOTION with memorandum in support by United States to Dismiss Counts III and IV and exhibits A thru C. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 6/16/1998, Entered: 6/16/1998 Summons Returned Executed
                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Federal Bureau 6/15/98. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 6/10/1998, Entered: 6/10/1998 Summons Returned Executed
                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to United States, Federal Bureau, U.S. Dept. Justice (U.S. Attorney) 5/26/98; Answer due on 7/26/98 for U.S. Dept. Justice, for Federal Bureau, for United States. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 6/10/1998, Entered: 6/10/1998 Summons Returned Executed
                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to United States, U.S. Dept. Justice (Attorney General) 5/27/98. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 6/10/1998, Entered: 6/10/1998 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Federal Bureau 5/26/98. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 5/18/1998, Entered: 5/18/1998 Summons Issued
                                                                  SUMMONS(ES)(60 days) issued for United States, United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau, Gina Davis (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/18/1998 Local Rule
                                                                    Local Rule 103.3 certification by Theodora Sebroski, Gary Sebroski (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/19/1998
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/18/1998 Complaint
                                                                      COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # B149520 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 462 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?