Klamath Tribes of Oregon v. PacifiCorp
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-00644-CO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 13, 2018 at 11:33 PM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1362
Nature of Suit Other Personal Property Damage
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Judgment: This action is dismissed. Signed July 14, 2005 by Deputy Clerk, Leslie Engdall. (cp, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER: Magistrate Judge Cooney's Recommendation 52 is Adopted, although I decline to adopt the findings supporting the recommendation. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 36 is granted and Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 57 is Denied as moot. Signed on July 13, 2005 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (cp, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Findings & Recommendation: Signed on 4/14/05 by Judge John P. Cooney. Motion for Summary Judgment 36 should be granted. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation due by 5/3/2005. Signed on 4/14/05 by Judge John P. Cooney. (dn, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 2 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?