Ward, et al v. The Men's Warehouse
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-01291-AH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo William P. Ward, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo The Men's Warehouse, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodell, DeVries, Leech & Dann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sidney G. Leech +1 410 783 4017 +1 410 783 4040 sgl@gdldlaw.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 4/24/1998
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Frederick
Terminated 9/14/1999
Origin 4
Reopened 5/24/1999
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 98-2590[], 99-2397(CaseMgr.Margaret[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 35 Filed: 4/7/2000, Entered: 4/10/2000 USCA Mandate
JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) "AFFIRMING" the judgment of the District Court, copy of opinion attached hereto. Re: [32-1] appeal by William P. Ward (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2000, Entered: 4/10/2000 Appeal Record Returned
    Record on appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals: [32-1] appeal by William P. Ward (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 34 Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: 10/25/1999 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [33-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ( signed by Sr Judge Alexander Harvey II )(dated 10/25/99) (c/m 10/25/99 akc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: 10/25/1999 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
        Certified and transmitted record on appeal to U.S. Court of Appeals: [32-1] appeal by William P. Ward (Volume 1) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: 10/25/1999 USCA Case Number
          USCA Case Number Re: [32-1] appeal by William P. Ward USCA NUMBER: 99-2397 (Case Mgr. Margaret Thomas) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 10/15/1999, Entered: 10/15/1999 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
            Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [32-1] appeal by William P. Ward (sls, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 33 Filed: 10/12/1999, Entered: 10/15/1999, Terminated: 10/25/1999 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
              MOTION with Affidavit in support by William P. Ward to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (c/s) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 32 Filed: 10/12/1999, Entered: 10/15/1999 Notice of Appeal
                NOTICE OF APPEAL by William P. Ward. Fee Status: (Filing Fee Not Paid) Appeal record due on 11/11/99 (c/s) (sls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 04/10/2000
                  LREF
                  Blank 31 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/14/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER denying [20-1] motion of plaintiff for mediation denying [23-1] motion of plaintiff to suppress deposition denying [25-1] motion of plaintiff to order the defendant to answer plaintiff's interrogatories granting [26-1] motion of defendant for Summary Judgment, and that judgment is hereby entered in favor of defendant The Men's Wearhouse, Inc. ( signed by Sr Judge Alexander Harvey II 9/13/99) (c/m chambers) (microfilmed 9/14/99) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 30 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/14/1999 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                    MEMORANDUM OPINION ( signed by Sr Judge Alexander Harvey II 9/13/99) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/14/1999 Terminated Case
                      Case closed (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 29 Filed: 8/24/1999, Entered: 8/24/1999, Terminated: 9/14/1999 Response in Opposition
                        RESPONSE by The Men's Warehouse in opposition to [25-1] motion to order the defendant to answer plaintiff's interrogatories by William P. Ward (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 28 Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999, Terminated: 9/14/1999 Response in Opposition
                          RESPONSE by William P. Ward in opposition to [26-1] motion for Summary Judgment by The Men's Warehouse and Exhibits A-G (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 27 Filed: 8/16/1999, Entered: 8/16/1999 Rule
                            Rule 12/56 letter sent to plaintiff (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 26 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/16/1999 Motion for Summary Judgment
                              MOTION with memorandum in support by The Men's Warehouse for Summary Judgment ; Exhibits A-E and Affidavits (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 25 Filed: 8/12/1999, Entered: 8/12/1999, Terminated: 9/14/1999 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                MOTION by William P. Ward to order the defendant to answer plaintiff's interrogatories (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 24 Filed: 8/11/1999, Entered: 8/12/1999 Response in Opposition
                                  RESPONSE by The Men's Warehouse in opposition to [23-1] motion to suppress deposition by William P. Ward and Exhibits A-D (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 23 Filed: 8/11/1999, Entered: 8/11/1999, Terminated: 9/14/1999 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                    MOTION by William P. Ward to suppress deposition (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 22 Filed: 6/22/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER, protecting Confidentiality of Information, that any document or information designated as "Confidential" shall be treated as CONFIDENTIAL. ( signed by Sr Judge Alexander Harvey II 6/22/99) (c/m 6/22/99) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 21 Filed: 6/15/1999, Entered: 6/15/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                        SECOND REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Sr Judge Alexander Harvey II 6/15/99) (c/m chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/15/1999, Entered: 6/29/1999 Status Conference
                                          Status conference held before Sr. Judge Harvey. (pat, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 20 Filed: 6/4/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999, Terminated: 9/14/1999 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                            MOTION by William P. Ward for mediation (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/24/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999 Case Reopened
                                              Case reopened (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/18/1999, Entered: 5/18/1999, Terminated: 9/14/1999 Appeal Record Returned
                                                Record on appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals: [18-1] appeal by William P. Ward (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: 5/18/1999 USCA Mandate
                                                  JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) "VACATING" the judgment of the District Court and "Remanding" case for further proceedings consistent with the opinion attached hereto. Re: [18-1] appeal by William P. Ward (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/6/1999, Entered: 6/2/1999 Scheduling Conference
                                                    Scheduling conference held before Sr. Judge Harvey. (pat, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/2/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998, Terminated: 9/14/1999 USCA Case Number
                                                      USCA Case Number Re: [18-1] appeal by William P. Ward USCA NUMBER: 98-2590 (Case Manager:Cynthia W. Carter) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/22/1998, Entered: 10/22/1998, Terminated: 9/14/1999 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                                        Certified and transmitted record on appeal to U.S. Court of Appeals: [18-1] appeal by William P. Ward (Entire file consisting of Volume 1) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/22/1998, Entered: 10/22/1998, Terminated: 9/14/1999 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
                                                          Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [18-1] appeal by William P. Ward (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 10/20/1998, Entered: 10/22/1998 Notice of Appeal
                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL by William P. Ward . Fee Status: (IFP) Appeal record due on 11/19/98 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 9/22/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [13-1] motion of defendant to Dismiss with prejudice; and that this Civil Action is DISMISSED with prejudice.( signed by Sr Judge Alexander Harvey II 9/21/98) (c/m & microfilmed 9/22/98) (slf, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 09/22/1998
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 9/22/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                LETTER ORDER granting [13-1] motion of defendant to Dismiss with prejudice, no costs will be assessed plaintiff. ( signed by Sr Judge Alexander Harvey II 9/21/98) (c/m chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 09/22/1998
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 9/22/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998, Terminated: 9/22/1998 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                  MOTION by William P. Ward to Dismiss (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/22/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 Terminated Case
                                                                    Case closed (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 9/2/1998, Entered: 9/2/1998 Rule
                                                                      Rule 12/56 letter mailed to plaintiff. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 9/1/1998, Entered: 9/2/1998, Terminated: 9/22/1998 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                        MOTION with memorandum in support by The Men's Warehouse to Dismiss and attachments. (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 8/3/1998, Entered: 8/4/1998 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                          ANSWER by The Men's Warehouse to amended complaint(c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 7/24/1998, Entered: 7/24/1998 Amended Complaint
                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT by William P. Ward , (Answer due 8/3/98 for The Men's Warehouse ) amending [1-1] complaint (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 7/24/1998, Entered: 7/24/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              Marginal ORDER granting [8-1] motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint ( signed by Sr Judge Alexander Harvey II 7/23/98 ) (c/m cl) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 7/23/1998, Entered: 7/23/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Sr Judge Alexander Harvey II 7/23/98) (c/m 7/23/98) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: 6/24/1998, Terminated: 7/24/1998 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                  Letter MOTION by William P. Ward for Leave to File Amended Complaint and proposed amended complaint (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 6/16/1998, Entered: 6/16/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Sr Judge Alexander Harvey II 6/16/98) (c/m chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 6/15/1998, Entered: 6/15/1998, Terminated: 9/22/1998 Answer
                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by The Men's Warehouse (Attorney Sidney G. Leech, Jennifer Lilore Huesman), (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 5/21/1998, Entered: 5/21/1998 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to The Men's Warehouse 5/18/98 Answer due on 6/7/98 for The Men's Warehouse (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 5/6/1998, Entered: 5/6/1998 Summons Issued
                                                                                          SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for William P. Ward (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 4/30/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [2-1] motion of plaintiff to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; and that plaintiff is Granted (20) days from the date of this order to complete the 285 U.S. Marshal form and return to the Clerk of Court as therein set forth. ( signed by Sr Judge Alexander Harvey II 4/29/98) (c/m 4/30/98) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 4/24/1998, Entered: 4/27/1998, Terminated: 4/30/1998 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                                                              MOTION and Affidavit by William P. Ward to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 4/24/1998, Entered: 4/27/1998 Jury Demand
                                                                                                DEMAND for jury trial by William P. Ward (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 4/24/1998, Entered: 4/27/1998 Complaint
                                                                                                  COMPLAINT and Attachment filed (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 49 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?