Aleshire v. Bank of America
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:10-cv-03375-MJD-LIB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 15, 2018 at 11:10 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
AMENDED ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 9 . IT IS ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs' applications to proceed in forma pauperis 2 and 3 be DENIED. 2. This action be summarily dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ยง 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/18/11. (GRR)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 9 Report and Recommendation, (Written Opinion). Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis 2 3 is DENIED. This action is summarily dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/18/11. (KMW)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 1. Plaintiffs' applications to proceed in forma pauperis [Docket Nos. 2 and 3 ] be DENIED; and 2. This action be summarily dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). Objections to R&R due by 3/4/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 02/18/2011. (jz)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 0 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?