Wilkins Buick, Inc. v. General Motors
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-02795-BEL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Wilkins Buick, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walter E. Forehand +1 904 878 6404 +1 850 942 4869

Toggle Switch Represented by Azrael, Gann & Franz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Albert Azrael +1 410 821 6800 +1 410 821 1265 JAzrael@agflaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MYERS & FULLER PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A. Bass +1 850 878 6404 +9424 942 942 4869
Space Loula M. Fuller +1 850 878 6404 +9424 942 942 4869
v.
General Motors Corporation General Motors Corporation, Defendant
Officer/Director, General Motors Co
Officer/Director, Panamsat Corp
Officer/Director, Lennox International Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alicia L. Downey +1 617 951 8187 +1 617 951 8736 alicia.downey@bingham.com
Space Daniel L. Goldberg +1 617 951 8000 +1 617 951 8736 daniel.goldberg@bingham.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 8/14/1998
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $75000
Nature of Suit 380 - Personal Property: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Anne Arundel
Terminated 9/7/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 99-2317(CaseMgr.[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 5/30/2000, Entered: 5/30/2000 USCA Mandate
JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) "AFFIRMING" the judgment of the District Court, copy of opinion attached hereto. Re: [29-1] appeal by Wilkins Buick, Inc. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/8/1999, Entered: 10/8/1999 USCA Case Number
    USCA Case Number Re: [29-1] appeal by Wilkins Buick, Inc. USCA NUMBER: 99-2317 (Case Mgr. Cynthia Carter) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 30 Filed: 9/29/1999, Entered: 9/29/1999 Certificate of Clerk
      Copy of Certificate of Clerk certifying record as complete for appeal purposes for [29-1] appeal by Wilkins Buick, Inc. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 9/29/1999, Entered: 9/29/1999 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
        Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [29-1] appeal by Wilkins Buick, Inc. (Appeal forms mailed to counsel) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 29 Filed: 9/27/1999, Entered: 9/29/1999 Notice of Appeal
          NOTICE OF APPEAL by Wilkins Buick, Inc. . Fee Status: (Filing fee paid) Appeal record due on 10/27/99 (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 28 Filed: 9/7/1999, Entered: 9/8/1999 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [20-1] motion of General Motors to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; denying as moot [11-1] initial motion of Defendants to Dismiss; CLOSING Case. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 9/3/99) (c/m 9/7/99-chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 27 Filed: 9/7/1999, Entered: 9/8/1999 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
              MEMORANDUM ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 9/3/99) (c/m 9/7/99-chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 26 Filed: 9/7/1999, Entered: 9/7/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                REPLY by Wilkins Buick, Inc. to response of Defendant to its [24-1] motion for Leave to Commence Disocvery and Entry of a Scheduling Order. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 9/7/1999, Entered: 9/8/1999 Terminated Case
                  Case closed (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 25 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: 8/25/1999, Terminated: 9/7/1999 Response in Opposition
                    RESPONSE by General Motors in opposition to [24-1] motion for Leave to Commence Disocvery and Entry of a Scheduling Order by Wilkins Buick, Inc. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 24 Filed: 8/23/1999, Entered: 8/23/1999, Terminated: 9/7/1999 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                      MOTION by Wilkins Buick, Inc. for Leave to Commence Disocvery and Entry of a Scheduling Order and Supplemental Request for Hearing. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 23 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 Supplemental
                        Notice of SUPPLEMENTAL Athority by Wilkins Buick, Inc. in support of its [21-1] opposition response to the motion of Defendants to dismiss. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 22 Filed: 3/3/1999, Entered: 3/4/1999 Response in Support of Motion
                          MEMORANDUM by General Motors in support of its [20-1] motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 21 Filed: 2/18/1999, Entered: 2/22/1999 Response in Opposition
                            RESPONSE by Wilkins Buick, Inc. in opposition to [20-1] motion of General Motors to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and exhibit 1. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 20 Filed: 2/1/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999, Terminated: 9/7/1999 Motion to Dismiss
                              MOTION with memorandum in support by General Motors to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and exhibits A and B. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 19 Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: 1/14/1999 Amended Complaint
                                AMENDED COMPLAINT by Wilkins Buick, Inc. , (Answer due 2/3/99 for General Motors ) amending [1-1] complaint. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 18 Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: 1/14/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [14-1] motion of plaintiffs to Amend [1-1] complaint; DIRECTING defendant to answer the amended complaint within 20 days. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 1/12/99) (c/m 1/13/99-chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 04/30/1999
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 17 Filed: 1/12/1999, Entered: 1/12/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                    REPLY by Wilkins Buick, Inc. to response of defendant to [14-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 16 Filed: 1/8/1999, Entered: 1/11/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING time for Wilkins Buick, Inc. to reply to General Motor Corporation's opposition to its motion for leave to amend complaint to 1/7/99. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 1/6/99) (c/m 1/8/99-chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 15 Filed: 12/21/1998, Entered: 12/23/1998 Response in Opposition
                                        RESPONSE by General Motors in opposition to [14-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint by Wilkins Buick, Inc. (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 14 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/4/1998, Terminated: 1/14/1999 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                          MOTION by Wilkins Buick, Inc. to Amend [1-1] complaint and proposed first amended complaint. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 13 Filed: 10/30/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998 Response in Support of Motion
                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM by General Motors in further support of its [11-1] motion to Dismiss. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 12 Filed: 10/19/1998, Entered: 10/21/1998 Response in Opposition
                                              RESPONSE by Wilkins Buick, Inc. in opposition to [11-1] motion of General Motores to Dismiss. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 11 Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: 9/30/1998 Motion to Dismiss
                                                MOTION with memorandum in support by General Motors to Dismiss and exhbits A and B. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998, Terminated: 9/21/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [10-1] motion of Defendant for Daniel L. Goldberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 9/21/98) (c/m 9/21/98-dl ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998, Terminated: 9/21/1998 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                    MOTION by General Motors for Daniel L. Goldberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (c/s) (fee paid receipt no. B152371) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998, Terminated: 9/21/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [9-1] motion for Alicia L. Downey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 9/21/98) (c/m 9/22/98-dl) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998, Terminated: 9/21/1998 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                        MOTION by General Motors for Alicia L. Downey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (c/s) (fee paid receipt no. B152372) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: 9/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER "EXTENDING" time for General Motors to respond to the complaint to 9/28/98. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 9/3/98) (c/m 9/9/98-dl) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: 9/9/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                            Deadline updated; reset Answer deadline to 9/28/98 for General Motors . (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 9/1/1998, Entered: 9/3/1998, Terminated: 9/1/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [7-1] motion of plaintiff for Walter E. Forehand to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 9/1/98) (c/m 9/3/98-dl) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 9/1/1998, Entered: 9/3/1998, Terminated: 9/1/1998 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                MOTION by Wilkins Buick, Inc. for Walter E. Forehand to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 9/1/1998, Entered: 9/3/1998, Terminated: 9/1/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [6-1] motion of Plaintiff for Robert A. Bass to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 9/1/98) (c/m 9/3/98-dl) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 9/1/1998, Entered: 9/3/1998, Terminated: 9/1/1998 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                    MOTION by Wilkins Buick, Inc. for Robert A. Bass to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 9/1/1998, Entered: 9/3/1998, Terminated: 9/1/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [5-1] motion of Plaintiff for Loula M. Fuller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 9/1/98) (c/m 9/3/98-dl) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 9/1/1998, Entered: 9/3/1998, Terminated: 9/1/1998 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                        MOTION by Wilkins Buick, Inc. for Loula M. Fuller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: 8/21/1998 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to General Motors 8/17/98; Answer due on 9/6/98 for General Motors. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/14/1998 Summons Issued
                                                                            SUMMONS(ES)(20 days) issued for General Motors (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/14/1998 Jury Demand
                                                                              DEMAND for jury trial by Wilkins Buick, Inc. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/14/1998 Complaint
                                                                                COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # B151726 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 35 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?