Quinn v. Retort
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-02615

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 28, 2020 at 7:21 PM DT (7.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jeremy J. Quinn, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy J. Quinn
v.
No Logo B. Kilmer, Defendant
No Logo Justin Griffiths, Defendant
No Logo Mr. F. Retort, Defendant
No Logo Mr. Franklin, Defendant
No Logo Mr. Wolfe, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/29/2019, Entered: None Extension (of deadlines)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: None Appointment of Counsel
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: None Strike
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None Leave
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None Sanctions
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Case Management Conference Plan/Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Stipulation & Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Strike
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default Judgment
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Default Judgment (Motion for)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Appointment of Counsel
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                          Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Jeremy J. Quinn. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Prisoner, # 2 Inmate Statement)(B,R)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Complaint
                                                                            Complaint with jury demand against Mr. Franklin, Justin Griffiths, B. Kilmer, F. Retort, Mr. Wolfe. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Jeremy J. Quinn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E2 Grievance, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 USM-285, # 4 Summons) (B,R)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case, (B,R)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (B,R)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?