State of Maryland v. United States of America
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02849-ELH
District Judge Ellen L. Hollander, presiding

Tags
Last Updated November 15, 2018 at 1:42 AM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo State of Maryland, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein & Russell PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tejinder Singh +1 202 362 0636 tsingh@goldsteinrussell.com
Space Daniel Woofter +1 202 362 0636 dhwoofter@goldsteinrussell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julia Doyle Bernhardt +1 410 767 7726 +1 410 333 0026 jbernhar@dhr.state.md.us
Space Kimberly Stanton Cammarata +1 410 767 1889 +1 410 333 5831 kcammarata@dhmh.state.md.us
Space Brian E Frosh +1 410 576 6311 +1 410 576 7036 bfrosh@oag.state.md.us
Space Sarah Whynne Rice +1 410 576 7847 +1 410 576 6955 srice@oag.state.md.us
Space Steven M Sullivan +1 410 576 6300 +1 410 576 6955 ssullivan@oag.state.md.us
v.
Azar, II, Alex Michael Azar, II, Alex Michael, Defendant
Officially listed as "Alex M. Azar"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tamra Tyree Moore +1 202 514 8095 +1 202 616 8460 tamra.moore@usdoj.gov
No Logo Charles P. Rettig, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tamra Tyree Moore +1 202 514 8095 +1 202 616 8460 tamra.moore@usdoj.gov
Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III, Defendant
Officially listed as "Jefferson B. Sessions, III"
United States Department of Justice Attorney General, United States Department of Justice, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
United States of America Attorney General, United States of America, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tamra Tyree Moore +1 202 514 8095 +1 202 616 8460 tamra.moore@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tamra Tyree Moore +1 202 514 8095 +1 202 616 8460 tamra.moore@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tamra Tyree Moore +1 202 514 8095 +1 202 616 8460 tamra.moore@usdoj.gov
United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States Internal Revenue Service"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tamra Tyree Moore +1 202 514 8095 +1 202 616 8460 tamra.moore@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tamra Tyree Moore +1 202 514 8095 +1 202 616 8460 tamra.moore@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 9/13/2018
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County Baltimore City
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Motion for preliminary injunction
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and to Substitute Defendant by State of Maryland (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Bernhardt, Julia)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Notice of appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Doyle Bernhardt on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bernhardt, Julia)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Notice of appearance
    NOTICE of Appearance by Tamra Tyree Moore on behalf of All Defendants (Moore, Tamra)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
      Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by State of Maryland (Rice, Sarah)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018 Summons Issued as to USA
        Summons Issued 60 days as to Alex M. Azar, Charles P. Rettig, Jefferson B. Sessions, III, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Justice, United States Internal Revenue Service, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(km4s, Deputy Clerk)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018 Complaint
          COMPLAINT against Alex M. Azar, Charles P. Rettig, Jefferson B. Sessions, III, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Justice, and United States Internal Revenue Service ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 84637033038.), filed by STATE OF MARYLAND. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons)(km4s, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 111 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?