USA v. Gilbert et al
Criminal Case Alabama Northern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cr-00419-AKK-TMP

Tags
Last Updated November 14, 2018 at 1:56 AM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space US Probation +1 713 250 5266 pocrecm@ianp.uscourts.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Praveen Krishna +1 205 244 2168 +1 205 244 2174 praveen.krishna@usdoj.gov
Space Robin Beardsley Mark +1 205 244 2001 +1 205 244 2182 Robin.Mark@usdoj.gov
Space US Marshal +1 205 731 1712 usms-aln-courts@usdoj.gov
Space Owen Peter Martikan +1 415 436 7241 +1 415 436 6748 CaseView.ECF@usdoj.gov
Space George A Martin, Jr. George.Martin@usdoj.gov
Space John B Ward +1 205 244 2208 John.B.Ward@usdoj.gov
No Logo Balch and Bingham, Miscellaneous

Toggle Switch Represented by REDDEN MILLS & CLARK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William N Clark +3228 322 322 8481 WNC@rmclaw.com
Space Stephen Wesley Shaw +1 205 322 0457 +1 205 322 8481 sws@rmclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geoffrey R Garinther +1 410 244 7400 +1 410 244 7742 grgarinther@venable.com
No Logo Oliver Robinson, Miscellaneous

Toggle Switch Represented by JAFFE STRICKLAND DRENNAN & DODD PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Stephen Jaffe +1 205 930 9800 +1 205 930 9809 richard@rjaffelaw.com
Space Michael W Whisonant, Jr. +1 205 930 9800 +1 205 930 9809 mwhisonant@rjaffelaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Joel Iverson Gilbert (1)
Office Southern
Filed 9/27/2017
County Jefferson
Terminated 11/1/2018
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371 CONSPIRACY TO DEFRAUD THE UNITED STATES
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 666A.F
Offense Level 4
18666(a)(2) and 2 CONVERTS TO OWN USE PROPERTY OF ANOTHER
Count 3-5
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343, 1346, and 2 FRAUD BY WIRE, RADIO, OR TELEVISION
Count 6
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-7100.F
Offense Level 4
181956(h) MONEY LAUNDERING - Conspiracy
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flags CLOSED,APPEAL,PROTECTIVE ORDER
  Entries (359) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: 11/7/2018 Notice - other
NOTICE of Appeal Transmittal Letter as to Joel Iverson Gilbert re [314] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (SMH2, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/6/2018 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
    NOTICE OF APPEAL by Joel Iverson Gilbert Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 1126-3212899. (Doss, Jeffrey)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: 11/5/2018 transmission of notice of appeal and docket sheet to USCA
      Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet as to dft David Lynn Roberson to US Court of Appeals re [311] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (KBB)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: 11/5/2018 Notice - other
        NOTICE of Transmittal Letter to 11th Circuit Court of Appeals as to dft David Lynn Roberson re [311] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (KBB)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: 11/5/2018 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
          NOTICE OF APPEAL by David Lynn Roberson Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 1126-3211149. (Bloomston, Brett)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank  Notice of hearing
            NOTICE RESETTING HEARING as to Joel Iverson Gilbert Telephone Conference previously set for 11/5/2018 is hereby RESET for 11/6/2018 at 05:30 PM before Judge Abdul K Kallon. The parties shall dial 888-557-8511 and enter access code 4541204, five minutes prior to the designated call time. (KSS)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 Response In Opposition
              RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert re [301] MOTION for Bond Pending Appeal (Martin, George)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 309 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 Sealed document
                Sealed Document- SOR as to dft David Lynn Roberson (KBB)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 judgmentCourt Filing
                  JUDGMENT as to dft David Lynn Roberson (3), CBP 30 mos as to Counts 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, and 6 spe and concur w/each other w/Recomm to BOP; SRT 12 mos w/Spec Cond; Fine $25,000; AF $600; Dft to remain out on bond pending appeal. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 11/1/2018. (KBB)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 307 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 Sentencing Recommendations
                    Sentencing Recommendations (Sealed) as to dft David Lynn Roberson (KBB) (KBB, ).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 306 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 presentence investigation report
                      PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT (Sealed) as to dft David Lynn Roberson (KBB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2018: # (1) Addendum) (KBB, ).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 305 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 Sealed document
                        Sealed Document-SOR as to dft Joel Iverson Gilbert (KBB)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 judgmentCourt Filing
                          JUDGMENT as to dft Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), CBP 60 mos as to Counts 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, and 6 sep and concur w/each other w/Recomm to BOP; SRT 24 mos w/Spec Cond; Fine $25, 000; AF $600; Dft to remain out on Bond subject to his Appeal. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 11/1/2018. (KBB)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 303 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 Sentencing Recommendations
                            Sentencing Recommendations (Sealed) as to dft Joel Iverson Gilbert (KBB) (KBB, ).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 302 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 presentence investigation report
                              PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT (Sealed) as to dft Joel Iverson Gilbert (KBB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2018: # (1) Addendum) (KBB, ).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: 10/24/2018 Motion for Bond
                                MOTION for Bond Pending Appeal by Joel Iverson Gilbert. (Sharman, Jackson)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank  sentencing
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon:Sentencing held on 10/23/2018 for David Lynn Roberson. SENTENCE: CBP 30 months as to counts 1,2,3,4,5, and 6, separately to be served concurrently with each other w/recomm to BOP. SRT 1 year w/spec conds. ASMT fee $600.00 due immed. Fine in the amount of $25,000 w/o interest due immed. Dft's Oral Motion for Variance filed-orally Granted as stated on the record. Govt's Oral Motion for Defendant to Remain Out on Bond Pending Appeal filed-orally Granted as stated on the record. Dft released on same bond conditions. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (KSS)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Notice of hearing
                                    NOTICE OF HEARING as to Joel Iverson Gilbert Telephone Conference set for 11/5/2018 at 05:30 PM before Judge Abdul K Kallon. The parties shall dial 888-557-8511 and enter access code 4541204, five minutes prior to the designated call time. (KSS)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  sentencing
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon:Sentencing held on 10/23/2018 for Joel Iverson Gilbert. SENTENCE: CBP 60 months as to counts 1, 2,3,4, 5, and 6, separately to be served concurrently with each other, w/recomm to BOP. SRT 2 years w/spec conds. Fine in the amount of $25,000 w/o interest. ASMT fee $600.00 due immed. Govt's exhibit 1 offered and received. Court will carry bond issue-Defendant Motion to Remain Out on Bond pending Appeal to be filed by end of day on 10/24/2018, Govt's response due by end of day 11/1/2018, Briefs are limited to 10 pages per side. Telephone Conference set for 11/5/2018 at 5:30 and will be set by subsequent notice. Dft released on same bond conditions pending ruling on motion/report date. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (KSS)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 300 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, David Lynn Roberson: Robersons Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Law, doc. 270, and Gilberts Motion to Join Robersons motion, doc. 271, are GRANTED. And, for the reasons discussed, the Defendants Motions for an Acquittal or for a New Trial, docs. 266 and 267, are DENIED. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 10/22/18. (SMH2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 299 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 sentencing memorandum
                                          SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Joel Iverson Gilbert (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8)(Sharman, Jackson)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018 sentencing memorandum
                                          SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by David Lynn Roberson (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 1, Sentencing Letters, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 2, Sentencing Letters, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit B, David Roberson Resume, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit C, Dr. Mills Resume, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit D, Article)(Asbill, Henry)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018 sentencing memorandum
                                            SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to David Lynn Roberson (Martin, George)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018 sentencing memorandum
                                              SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Martin, George)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: 10/8/2018 Notice - other
                                                NOTICE of Errata by David Lynn Roberson re [270] MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Judgment of Acquittal under Rule 29(c) or for a New Trial under Rule 33(a) (Asbill, Henry)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: 10/8/2018 Notice - other
                                                  NOTICE of Errata by David Lynn Roberson re [266] MOTION for Acquittal Under Rule 29(c), or MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 33(A) (Asbill, Henry)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: 10/2/2018 Notice - other
                                                    NOTICE of Objections to Pre-Sentence Investigation Report filed by Joel Iverson Gilbert (Sharman, Jackson)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: 10/2/2018 Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
                                                      OBJECTION TO PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT by David Lynn Roberson (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Objections to Presentence Investigative Report)(Asbill, Henry)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: 10/2/2018 response
                                                        RESPONSE filed by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert Presentence Investigation Report (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Martin, George)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                          Transcript of Proceedings (Jury Trial-Vol 19 of 19) as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/20/18, before Judge Abdul K. Kallon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript%20Redaction%20Policy.pdf See Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 10/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2018. (Pgs. 4605-4627, 23 total pgs.)(SMH2, )
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                            Transcript of Proceedings (Jury Trial-Vol. 18 of 19) as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/19/18, before Judge Abdul K. Kallon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript%20Redaction%20Policy.pdf See Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 10/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2018. (Pgs. 4506-4604, 99 total pgs. )(SMH2, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                              Transcript of Proceedings (Jury Trial-Vol. 17-of 19) as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/18/18, before Judge Abdul K. Kallon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript%20Redaction%20Policy.pdf See Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 10/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2018. (Pgs. 4319-4505, 187 total pgs.)(SMH2, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                Transcript of Proceedings (Jury Trial-Vol. 16 of 19) as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/17/18, before Judge Abdul K. Kallon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript%20Redaction%20Policy.pdf See Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 10/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2018. (Pgs. 4095-4318, 224 total pgs.)(SMH2, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings (Jury Trial-Vol. 15 of 19) as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/16/18, before Judge Abdul K. Kallon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript%20Redaction%20Policy.pdf See Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 10/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2018. (Pgs. 3811-4094, 224 total pgs.)(SMH2, ) (SMH2, ).
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings (Jury Trial-Vol. 14 of 19) as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/13/18, before Judge Abdul K. Kallon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript%20Redaction%20Policy.pdf See Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 10/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2018. (Pgs. 3710-3810, 284 total pgs.)(SMH2, ) (SMH2, ).
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings (Jury Trial-Vol. 13 of 19) as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/12/18, before Judge Abdul K. Kallon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript%20Redaction%20Policy.pdf See Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 10/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2018. (Pgs. 3460-3709, 250 total pgs.) (SMH2, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings (Jury Trial-Vol. 12 of 19) as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/11/18, before Judge Abdul K. Kallon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript%20Redaction%20Policy.pdf See Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 10/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2018. (Pgs. 3127-3459, 333 total pgs.)(SMH2, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings (Jury Trial-Vol. 11 of 19) as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/10/18, before Judge Abdul K. Kallon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript%20Redaction%20Policy.pdf See Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 10/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2018. (Pgs. 2793-3126, 334 total pgs.)(SMH2, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                            Transcript of Jury Trial Vol 10 of 19 as to dft's Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/9/2018, before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis, Telephone number 205-278-2065. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript%20Redaction%20Policy.pdf See Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 10/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2018. (291 pgs) (KBB)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                              Transcript of Jury Trial VOl 9 of 10 as to dft's Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/6/2018, before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis, Telephone number 205-278-2065. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript%20Redaction%20Policy.pdf See Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 10/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2018. (267 pgs) (KBB)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                Transcript of Jury Trial Vol 8 of 19 as to dft's Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/5/2018, before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis, Telephone number 205-278-2065. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript%20Redaction%20Policy.pdf See Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 10/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2018. (335 pgs) (KBB)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                  Transcript of Jury Trial Vol 7 of 19 as to dft's Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/3/2018, before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis, Telephone number 205-278-2065. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript%20Redaction%20Policy.pdf See Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 10/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2018. (257 pgs) (KBB)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                    Transcript of Jury Trial Vol 6 of 19 as to dft's Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/2/2018, before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis, Telephone number 205-278-2065. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript%20Redaction%20Policy.pdf See Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 10/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2018. (321 pgs) (KBB)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                      Transcript of Jury Trial- Vol 5 of 19 as to dft's Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 6/29/2018, before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis, Telephone number 205-278-2065. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript%20Redaction%20Policy.pdf See Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 10/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2018. (321 pgs) (KBB)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                        Transcript of Jury Trial-Vol 4 of 19 as to dft's Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 6/28/2018, before Judge Sabrina Lewis. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis, Telephone number 205-278-2065. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript%20Redaction%20Policy.pdf See Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 10/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2018. (271 pgs)(KBB)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                          Transcript of Jury Trial-Vol 3 of 19 as to dft's Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 6/27/2018, before Judge Sabrina Lewis. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis, Telephone number 205-278-2065. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript%20Redaction%20Policy.pdf See Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 10/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2018. (243 pgs) (KBB)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                            Transcript of Jury Trial-Vol. 2 of 19 as to dft's Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 9/26/2018, before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis, Telephone number 205-278-2065. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript%20Redaction%20Policy.pdf See Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 10/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2018. (255 pgs)(KBB)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                              Transcript of Jury Trial- Vol. 1 of 19 as to dft's Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 6/25/2018, before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis, Telephone number 205-278-2065. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript%20Redaction%20Policy.pdf See Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 10/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2018. (231 pgs)(KBB)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018, Terminated: 10/22/2018 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                MOTION for Joinder as to Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Law, and to Join and Adopt Certain Arguments Contained therein, filed by Joel Iverson Gilbert. (Sharman, Jackson)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018, Terminated: 10/22/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Judgment of Acquittal under Rule 29(c) or for a New Trial under Rule 33(a) by David Lynn Roberson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. A - Reply Memorandum of Law in support of Motion for Judgment of Acquittal or New Trial)(Asbill, Henry)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, David Lynn Roberson re [266] MOTION for Acquittal Under Rule 29(c), or MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 33(A), [267] MOTION for Acquittal MOTION for New Trial (Martin, George) Modified on 9/11/2018 (KBB).
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting [265] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. David Penn Burns withdrawn from case. as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1). Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 8/21/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: 8/20/2018, Terminated: 10/22/2018 Motion for Acquittal
                                                                                                        MOTION for Acquittal , MOTION for New Trial by Joel Iverson Gilbert. (Sharman, Jackson)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: 8/20/2018, Terminated: 10/22/2018 Motion for Acquittal
                                                                                                          MOTION for Acquittal Under Rule 29(c), or, MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 33(A) by David Lynn Roberson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. A, # (2) Exhibit Ex. B)(Asbill, Henry)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: 8/7/2018, Terminated: 8/21/2018 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by David P. Burns. by Joel Iverson Gilbert. (Burns, David)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Receipt for Passport
                                                                                                              Receipt for Return of US Passport #XXXXX9239 as to dft Steven George McKinney; received by D Mosley, USPO this date (DWC, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 264 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 Order on Motion for Return of Property - Post TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER granting [262] Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial as to dft Steven George McKinney (2). Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/27/2018. (DWC, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER with instructions and deadlines set out as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, David Lynn Roberson re [255] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for New Trial filed by David Lynn Roberson, [261] Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions for New Trial and for Judgment of Acquittal filed by David Lynn Roberson; The unopposed motions are GRANTED IN PART. The deadline is extended to 8/20/2018. The govt's response is due 9/10/2018. The court will take the matter under submission thereafter and will issue its ruling before the 10/23/2018 sentencing date.. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/27/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018, Terminated: 7/27/2018 Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Return of Property/PostTrial (Passport) by Steven George McKinney. (McKnight, Stewart)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018, Terminated: 7/27/2018 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                      Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions for New Trial and for Judgment of Acquittal by David Lynn Roberson as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, David Lynn Roberson. (Asbill, Henry)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                        EXHIBIT LIST by Joel Iverson Gilbert (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 512, # (2) Exhibit 513, # (3) Exhibit 538, # (4) Exhibit 658, # (5) Exhibit 659, # (6) Exhibit 660, # (7) Exhibit 661, # (8) Exhibit 662, # (9) Exhibit 663, # (10) Exhibit 665, # (11) Exhibit 667, # (12) Exhibit 668), # (13) Exhibit 668, # (14) Exhibit 680, # (15) Exhibit 681, # (16) Exhibit 706, # (17) Exhibit 803, # (18) Exhibit 840, # (19) Exhibit 1048, # (20) Exhibit 1161, # (21) Exhibit 1178, # (22) Exhibit 1221, # (23) Exhibit 1223, # (24) Exhibit 1226), # (25) Exhibit 627) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2018: # (26) Errata 1236, # (27) Exhibit 1240, # (28) Exhibit 1241, # (29) Exhibit 1242, # (30) Exhibit 1243, # (31) Exhibit 1246, # (32) Exhibit 1247, # (33) Exhibit 1262, # (34) Exhibit 1270, # (35) Exhibit 1287, # (36) Exhibit 1288, # (37) Exhibit 1289, # (38) Exhibit 1290, # (39) Exhibit 1298, # (40) Exhibit 1299, # (41) Exhibit 1300) (KSS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2018: # (42) Exhibit 2083, # (43) Exhibit 2102) (KSS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2018: # (44) Exhibit 538, # (45) Exhibit 619 part 1, # (46) Exhibit 619 part 2, # (47) Exhibit 629 part 1, # (48) Exhibit 629 part 2, # (49) Exhibit 629 part 3, # (50) Exhibit 629 part 4, # (51) Exhibit 629 part 5, # (52) Exhibit 629 part 6, # (53) Exhibit 629 part 7, # (54) Exhibit 629 part 8, # (55) Exhibit 629 part 9, # (56) Exhibit 629 part 10, # (57) Exhibit 629 part 11, # (58) Exhibit 629 part 12, # (59) Exhibit 629 part 14) (KSS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2018: # (60) Exhibit 631 part 1, # (61) Exhibit 631 part 2, # (62) Exhibit 655, # (63) Exhibit 713, # (64) Exhibit 714 part 1, # (65) Exhibit 714 part 2, # (66) Exhibit 741, # (67) Exhibit 977, # (68) Exhibit 1138, # (69) Exhibit 1222, # (70) Exhibit 1224) (KSS, ).
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT LIST by David Lynn Roberson (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 3207 part 1, # (2) Exhibit 3207 part 2, # (3) Exhibit 3207 part 3, # (4) Exhibit 3207 part 4, # (5) Exhibit 3207 part 5, # (6) Exhibit 3207 part 6, # (7) Exhibit 3207 part 7, # (8) Exhibit 3217)(KSS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2018: # (9) Exhibit 3319 (see original file), # (10) Exhibit 3469 part 1, # (11) Exhibit part 2, # (12) Exhibit 3472) (KSS, ).
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT LIST by Joel Iverson Gilbert, David Lynn Roberson, Steve McKinney (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 3, # (2) Exhibit 10 video (see orginal file), # (3) Exhibit 12 audio (see orginal file))(KSS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2018: # (4) Exhibit 20 part 1, # (5) Exhibit 20 part 2, # (6) Exhibit 21 part 1, # (7) Exhibit 21 part 2, # (8) Exhibit 21 part 3, # (9) Exhibit 21 part 4, # (10) Exhibit 21 part 5, # (11) Exhibit 21 part 6, # (12) Exhibit 21 part 7, # (13) Exhibit 21 part 8) (KSS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2018: # (14) Exhibit 26, # (15) Exhibit 27, # (16) Exhibit 30 redacted, # (17) Exhibit 31, # (18) Exhibit 32 part 1, # (19) Exhibit 32 part 2, # (20) Exhibit 32 part 3, # (21) Exhibit 32 part 4, # (22) Exhibit 33 part 1, # (23) Exhibit 33 part 2, # (24) Exhibit 33 part 3, # (25) Exhibit 33 part 4, # (26) Exhibit 34, # (27) Exhibit 35 part 1, # (28) Exhibit 35 part 2, # (29) Exhibit 35 part 3, # (30) Exhibit 35 part 4) (KSS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2018: # (31) Exhibit 36, # (32) Exhibit 37, # (33) Exhibit 38, # (34) Exhibit 39, # (35) Exhibit 40, # (36) Exhibit 41 part 1, # (37) Exhibit 41 part 2, # (38) Exhibit 41 part 3, # (39) Exhibit 41 part 4, # (40) Exhibit 41 part 5, # (41) Exhibit 42, # (42) Exhibit 43, # (43) Exhibit 44, # (44) Exhibit 45, # (45) Exhibit 46, # (46) Exhibit 47, # (47) Exhibit 48) (KSS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2018: # (48) Exhibit 67 part 1, # (49) Exhibit 67 part 2, # (50) Exhibit 67 part 3, # (51) Exhibit 67 part 4) (KSS, ).
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER as to David Lynn Roberson with instructions as set out: Sentencing set for 10/23/2018 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 4A of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/23/2018. (KSS)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Joel Iverson Gilbert with instructions as set out: Sentencing set for 10/23/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/23/2018. (KSS)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018, Terminated: 7/27/2018 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for New Trial by David Lynn Roberson as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, David Lynn Roberson. (Asbill, Henry)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Steven George McKinney; Plaintiff USA's Oral Motion to Dismiss Indictment as to Dft Steven McKinney is GRANTED. The indictment against dft Steve McKinney is dismissed with prejudice.. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/23/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 253 Filed: 7/21/2018, Entered: 7/21/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 12, # (2) Exhibit 13, # (3) Exhibit 20, # (4) Exhibit 21, # (5) Exhibit 23, # (6) Exhibit 24, # (7) Exhibit 26, # (8) Exhibit 40, # (9) Exhibit 41, # (10) Exhibit 44, # (11) Exhibit 50, # (12) Exhibit 52, # (13) Exhibit 59, # (14) Exhibit 61, # (15) Exhibit 62, # (16) Exhibit 64, # (17) Exhibit 65, # (18) Exhibit 66, # (19) Exhibit 68)(KSS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2018: # (20) Exhibit 69, # (21) Exhibit 70, # (22) Exhibit 71, # (23) Exhibit 72, # (24) Exhibit 73, # (25) Exhibit 74, # (26) Exhibit 75, # (27) Exhibit 76, # (28) Exhibit 77, # (29) Exhibit 79, # (30) Exhibit 80, # (31) Exhibit 84, # (32) Exhibit 85, # (33) Exhibit 86, # (34) Exhibit 87, # (35) Exhibit 88) (KSS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2018: # (36) Exhibit 89, # (37) Exhibit 90, # (38) Exhibit 91, # (39) Exhibit 92, # (40) Exhibit 100, # (41) Exhibit 124) (KSS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2018: # (42) Exhibit 127, # (43) Exhibit 128, # (44) Exhibit 131, # (45) Exhibit 132, # (46) Exhibit 133, # (47) Exhibit 134, # (48) Exhibit 135, # (49) Exhibit 136, # (50) Exhibit 137, # (51) Exhibit 138, # (52) Exhibit 139, # (53) Exhibit 140, # (54) Exhibit 141, # (55) Exhibit 142, # (56) Exhibit 143, # (57) Exhibit 145, # (58) Exhibit 146, # (59) Exhibit 147, # (60) Exhibit 148, # (61) Exhibit 149, # (62) Exhibit 150, # (63) Exhibit 151, # (64) Exhibit 153, # (65) Exhibit 154, # (66) Exhibit 156, # (67) Exhibit 157) (KSS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2018: # (68) Exhibit 158, # (69) Exhibit 159, # (70) Exhibit 160, # (71) Exhibit 161, # (72) Exhibit 162, # (73) Exhibit 163, # (74) Exhibit 164, # (75) Exhibit 165, # (76) Exhibit 166, # (77) Exhibit 167, # (78) Exhibit 168, # (79) Exhibit 169, # (80) Exhibit 170, # (81) Exhibit 171, # (82) Exhibit 172, # (83) Exhibit 173, # (84) Exhibit 174, # (85) Exhibit 175, # (86) Exhibit 176, # (87) Exhibit 177, # (88) Exhibit 178, # (89) Exhibit 179, # (90) Exhibit 180, # (91) Exhibit 181) (KSS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2018: # (92) Exhibit 183, # (93) Exhibit 185, # (94) Exhibit 186, # (95) Exhibit 187, # (96) Exhibit 188, # (97) Exhibit 189, # (98) Exhibit 190) (KSS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2018: # (99) Exhibit 191, # (100) Exhibit 192, # (101) Exhibit 197, # (102) Exhibit 198, # (103) Exhibit 200, # (104) Exhibit 201, # (105) Exhibit 202, # (106) Exhibit 203, # (107) Exhibit 204, # (108) Exhibit 205, # (109) Exhibit 206, # (110) Exhibit 207, # (111) Exhibit 208, # (112) Exhibit 209, # (113) Exhibit 212, # (114) Exhibit 213, # (115) Exhibit 215, # (116) Exhibit 218, # (117) Exhibit 224, # (118) Exhibit 225) (KSS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2018: # (119) Exhibit 226, # (120) Exhibit 229, # (121) Exhibit 230, # (122) Exhibit 232, # (123) Exhibit 233, # (124) Exhibit 234, # (125) Exhibit 235, # (126) Exhibit 236, # (127) Exhibit 237, # (128) Exhibit 240, # (129) Exhibit 244, # (130) Exhibit 247, # (131) Exhibit 249, # (132) Exhibit 255, # (133) Exhibit 256, # (134) Exhibit 257, # (135) Exhibit 258, # (136) Exhibit 259, # (137) Exhibit 260, # (138) Exhibit 262, # (139) Exhibit 264) (KSS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2018: # (140) Exhibit 269, # (141) Exhibit 283, # (142) Exhibit 284, # (143) Exhibit 289, # (144) Exhibit 292) (KSS, ).
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/21/2018 jury verdict
                                                                                                                                        JURY VERDICT as to David Lynn Roberson (3) Guilty on Counts 1,2,3-5,6. (KSS)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/21/2018 jury verdict
                                                                                                                                          JURY VERDICT as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1) Guilty on Counts 1,2,3-5,6. (KSS)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/21/2018 Jury Notes
                                                                                                                                            Jury Questions (1 and 2) as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, David Lynn Roberson, with handwritten response by the court. (KSS)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  Jury Trial - Continuing
                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon:JURY TRIAL CONTINUED as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/20/2018. Jury deliberations resumed. Verdict rendered and published to court. Jury polled and released with full thanks to the court. JURY TRIAL COMPLETED as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, David Lynn Roberson completed on 7/20/2018. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Jury Trial - Continuing
                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon:JURY TRIAL CONTINUED as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/19/2018. Closing arguments resumed. Alternate juror excused. Jury deliberations begun. Daily adj. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018 jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                  Jury Instructions (presented to jury) as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, David Lynn Roberson. (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018 jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                    Jury Instructions (redlined version draft 2) as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, David Lynn Roberson. (KSS) (KSS, ).
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018 jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                      Jury Instructions (draft 2) as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, David Lynn Roberson. (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018 jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                        Jury Instructions (draft 1) as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, David Lynn Roberson. (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Jury Trial - Continuing
                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon:JURY TRIAL CONTINUED as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/18/2018. Charge conference. Charge the jury. Dft Gilberts Oral Renewed Motion to Dismiss Indictment filed in open court. Closing arguments begin. Daily adj. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Jury Trial - Continuing
                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon:JURY TRIAL CONTINUED as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/17/2018. Defendants testimony resumed. In Camera hearing out of jury presents. Granting Govt's Sealed Motion. Roberson testimony begin. Dft Roberson and Gilberts Oral Renewed Rule 29 Motions filed in open court out of jury presents-motions are orally DENIED as stated on the record. Dft Robersons Oral Motion to Take Judicial Notice is DENIED for reasons as stated on the record in open court. Charge conference. Daily adj. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 243 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018, Terminated: 8/6/2018 ~~SEALED Motion
                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 242 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER granting [240] Motion for Leave to File Under Seal as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 7/16/2018. (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018, Terminated: 7/23/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Amend Court's Draft Jury Instructions by David Lynn Roberson as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Asbill, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Jury Trial - Continuing
                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon:JURY TRIAL CONTINUED as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/16/2018. Dfts' testimony begin. Hearing outside of jury presents. Daily adj. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 7/15/2018, Entered: 7/15/2018, Terminated: 7/16/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Joel Iverson Gilbert as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Sharman, Jackson)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 239 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018, Terminated: 7/23/2018 ~~SEALED Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION (KBB)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 238 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT-Supplement to Sealed Motion [237] (SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 237 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018, Terminated: 7/17/2018 ~~SEALED Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1)(SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 236 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER granting [231] Motion for Permission to File Document Under Seal as to David Lynn Roberson (3). Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 7/13/2018. (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 235 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER granting [230] Motion for Permission to File Document Under Seal as to David Lynn Roberson (3). Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 7/13/2018. (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 234 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER granting [228] Motion for Permission to File Document Under Seal as to David Lynn Roberson (3). Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 7/13/2018. (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Submission in Support of Motion for Judgment of Acquittal by Joel Iverson Gilbert (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Sharman, Jackson)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Jury Trial - Continuing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon:Jury Trial as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/13/2018; Oral argument from both sides on Motion for Acquittal, Dft objects to pltf arguments; The Court Denies Rule 29 Motion in open Court; Court Adj. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis.) (JLC)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018, Terminated: 7/23/2018 Motion for Acquittal
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Acquittal as to All Counts by Steven George McKinney. (McKnight, Stewart)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018, Terminated: 7/13/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File to File Document Under Seal by David Lynn Roberson. (Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018, Terminated: 7/13/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File to File Document Under Seal by David Lynn Roberson. (Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Jury Trial - Continuing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon:JURY TRIAL CONTINUED as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/12/2018. Pla's testimony resumed. Gov't rest; Juror's given weekend off. Oral Motions to Dismiss by Roberson and Gilbert and McKinney files Paper Motion for Acquittal as to All Counts into the record. Gov't objects to all 3 motions. Court gives everyone time to come back tomorrow with oral arguments on each. Court Adj. 7/12/2018 (Court Sabrina Lewis.) (JLC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018, Terminated: 8/6/2018 Motion for Declaration of Mistrial
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Declaration of Mistrial Due to Bruton Violation by David Lynn Roberson. (Asbill, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Jury Trial - Continuing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon:JURY TRIAL CONTINUED as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/11/2018. Pla's testimony resumed. Defendant Oral Motion for a Mistrial as to David Lynn Roberson filed in open court. Hearing out of jury present. Daily adj. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018, Terminated: 7/13/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal by David Lynn Roberson as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Jury Trial - Continuing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon:JURY TRIAL CONTINUED as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/10/2018. Pla's testimony resumed. Daily adj. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 227 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: 7/9/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT/RESPONSE to Sealed Motion [222]. (SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 226 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: 7/9/2018 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER granting [225] Motion to Seal Document as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2), David Lynn Roberson (3). Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/9/18. (SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: 7/9/2018, Terminated: 7/9/2018 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Document in Response to Doc. 222 by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Ward, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Jury Trial - Continuing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon:JURY TRIAL CONTINUED as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/9/2018. Pla's testimony resumed. In camera hearing. Daily adj. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 proposed jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson (Ward, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 proposed jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Jury Instructions by David Lynn Roberson as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson (Asbill, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 222 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018, Terminated: 7/18/2018 ~~SEALED Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 221 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER granting [218] Motion for Leave to File as to David Lynn Roberson (3). Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/6/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 220 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER granting [219] Motion to Seal Document to seal doc [217] as to David Lynn Roberson (3). Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/6/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018, Terminated: 7/6/2018 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Document Motion to Seal Document 217 and Attached Exhibit by David Lynn Roberson. (Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018, Terminated: 7/6/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal by David Lynn Roberson. (Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018, Terminated: 8/6/2018 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Exclude Exhibit No. 13 by David Lynn Roberson as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Jury Trial - Continuing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon:JURY TRIAL CONTINUED as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/6/2018. Pla's testimony resumed. Stipulation presented to jury. Daily adj. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Jury Trial - Continuing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon:JURY TRIAL CONTNUED as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/5/2018. Pla's testimony resumed. Daily adj. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Jury Trial - Continuing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon:JURY TRIAL CONTINUED as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/3/2018. Pla's testimony resumed. Daily adj. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Jury Trial - Continuing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon:JURY TRIAL CONTINUED as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 7/2/2018. Pla's testimony resumed. Daily adj. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 7/2/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBIT LIST-Exhibit Offered and Admitted by David Lynn Roberson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 3217)(KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT LIST-Exhibits Offered and Admitted on June 29, 2018 by USA (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 124, # (2) Exhibit 237, # (3) Exhibit 241, # (4) Exhibit 245, # (5) Exhibit 250, # (6) Exhibit 251, # (7) Exhibit 252, # (8) Exhibit 265, # (9) Exhibit 277, # (10) Exhibit 278)(KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 214 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Order on Motion To QuashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER consistent with agreement at hearing, finding as moot [197] City of Birmingham's Motion to Quash as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 6/29/2018. (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 213 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBIT LIST-Exhibits Offered and Admitted on June 27 and June 28, 2018 by Joel Iverson Gilbert (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 735, # (2) Exhibit 840, June 28, 2018: (3) Exhibit 551, # (4) Exhibit 552, # (5) Exhibit 553, # (6) Exhibit 1138)(KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBIT LIST-Exhibit Offered and Admitted on June 28, 2018 by David Lynn Roberson: (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 3207 part 1, # (2) Exhibit 3207 part 2, # (3) Exhibit 3207 part 3, # (4) Exhibit 3207 part 4, # (5) Exhibit 3207 part 5, # (6) Exhibit 3207 part 6, # (7) Exhibit 3207 part 7)(KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBIT LIST-Exhibits Offered and Admitted on June 27 and June 28, 2018 by USA: June 27, 2018 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 10, # (10) Exhibit 11, # (11) Exhibit 14, # (12) Exhibit 15, # (13) Exhibit 16, # (14) Exhibit 17, # (15) Exhibit 18, # (16) Exhibit 22, # (17) Exhibit 25, # (18) Exhibit 27, # (19) Exhibit 28, # (20) Exhibit 29, # (21) Exhibit 30, # (22) Exhibit 31, # (23) Exhibit 32, # (24) Exhibit 33, # (25) Exhibit 34, # (26) Exhibit 35, # (27) Exhibit 36, # (28) Exhibit 37, # (29) Exhibit 38, # (30) Exhibit 39, # (31) Exhibit 42, # (32) Exhibit 43) # (33) Exhibit 45, # (34) Exhibit 47, # (35) Exhibit 48, # (36) Exhibit 51, # (37) Exhibit 58, # (38) Exhibit 60, # (39) Exhibit 81, # (40) Exhibit 82, # (41) Exhibit 83, # (42) Exhibit 93, # (43) Exhibit 94, # (44) Exhibit 95) (KSS, ) # (45) Exhibit 96, # (46) Exhibit 97, # (47) Exhibit 98, # (48) Exhibit 99, # (49) Exhibit 101, # (50) Exhibit 102, # (51) Exhibit 103, # (52) Exhibit 104, # (53) Exhibit 105, # (54) Exhibit 106) # (55) Exhibit 106, # (56) Exhibit 107, # (57) Exhibit 108, # (58) Exhibit 109, # (59) Exhibit 110, # (60) Exhibit 111, # (61) Exhibit 112) # (62) Exhibit 113, # (63) Exhibit 114, # (64) Exhibit 115, # (65) Exhibit 116, # (66) Exhibit 117, # (67) Exhibit 118, # (68) Exhibit 119, # (69) Exhibit 120, # (70) Exhibit 121, # (71) Exhibit 122, # (72) Exhibit 123, # (73) Exhibit 130, # (74) Exhibit 158, # (75) Exhibit 188, # (76) Exhibit 230, # (77) Exhibit 232, # (78) Exhibit 233, # (79) Exhibit 234, # (80) Exhibit 235, # (81) Exhibit 236, # (82) Exhibit 239, # (83) Exhibit 263) June 28, 2018: # (84) Exhibit 9, # (85) Exhibit 46, # (86) Exhibit 53, # (87) Exhibit 54, # (88) Exhibit 55, # (89) Exhibit 242-sealed pursuant to personal identifier info, # (90) Exhibit 243, # (91) Exhibit 270, # (92) Exhibit 271, # (93) Exhibit 272, # (94) Exhibit 273, # (95) Exhibit 274, # (96) Exhibit 275, # (97) Exhibit 276, # (98) Exhibit 266) (KSS) # (99) Exhibit 57, # (100) Exhibit 238) (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING [206],[207],[208] Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Miscellaneous Party, Balch & Bingham as to Attorneys, Evan T. Shea, Geoffrey Garinther and Nicolas Mongelluzzo re: Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2), David Lynn Roberson (3);. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 6/29/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Jury Trial - Continuing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon:JURY TRIAL CONTINUED as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 6/29/2018. Pla's testimony resumed. Daily adj. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Limited Notice of Appearance as to Misc Party, Balch Bingham re: Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson (Clark, William) Modified on 6/28/2018 to show the party who Mr. Clark is representing (HBB, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018, Terminated: 6/29/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Balch and Bingham as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Clark, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018, Terminated: 6/29/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Balch and Bingham as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Clark, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018, Terminated: 6/29/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Balch and Bingham as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Clark, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Jury Trial - Continuing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon:JURY TRIAL CONTINUED as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 6/28/2018. Pla's testimony resumed. Daily adj. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  PHV Fee Paid
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3120091 (Shaw, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  PHV Fee Paid
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3120081 (Shaw, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  PHV Fee Paid
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3120049 (Shaw, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulation of the Parties. (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: 6/27/2018, Terminated: 6/27/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Opposition to misc party Balch & Bingham's "Privilege Assertion Protocol" filed by dft David Lynn Roberson. (Asbill, Henry) [7/11/2018 corrected docketing error, document is not a Motion per SH; Motion termed, modified docket text (DWC, )] .
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Jury Trial - Continuing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon:JURY TRIAL CONTINUED as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 6/27/2018. Stipulations of the Parties filed in open court. Pla's testimony begun. Daily adj 5:30 (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 203 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: 6/26/2018 Jury Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Jury Strikes of Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 202 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: 6/26/2018 Jury Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Jury Strikes of USA. (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: 6/26/2018 Order on Motion To QuashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [198] Motion to Quash as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), except to the limited extent the subpoena seeks information about GASPs hiring of, contracting with, and use of consultants and contractors to assist its public advocacy of the expansion of the 35th Avenue Superfund site to include Tarrant and Inglenook, or its addition to the National Priorities List, during the years 2014 through 2016. GASP ORDERED to produce an individual to testify on its behalf and to bring to court documents reflecting or relating to GASPs hiring of, contracting with, and use of such consultants and contractors in 2014 through 2016. Likewise, to the extent that GASP has any documents or information concerning any communications with Oliver Robinson or any person(s) representing the Oliver Robinson Foundation during 2014, 2015, or 2016, such documents and information must be produced. Such documents required to be produced by this Order shall be gathered and produced to the Clerk of Court as soon as is reasonably practicable, but not later than Monday, July 2, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 6/26/18. (SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Jury Trial - Continuing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon:JURY TRIAL CONTINUED as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 6/26/2018. Voir Dire continued. Preliminary instructions presented to jury. Opening statements. Daily adj 6:30. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Jury Trial - Begin
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon:JURY TRIAL BEGUN as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 6/25/2018. Jury Organization. Preliminary matters re: Roberson. Voir Dire begun. Daily adj. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018, Terminated: 11/1/2018 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum by Oliver Robinson as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam:Motion Hearing as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 6/22/2018: re [198] First MOTION to Quash Subpoena for Documents and to Testify at Trial or in the Alternative to Limit Scope of Subpoena filed by GASP, [197] MOTION to Quash filed by City of Birmingham; argument by counsel; court's remarks; court holds in abeyance City of B'ham motion until Thursday 6/28 as stated on the record; court takes under submission GASP's motion; order to be entered; hrg adj (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson) (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon:Telephone Conference as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 6/22/2018. (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 199 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: 6/21/2018 Notice of hearing on motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION in case as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson: [197] MOTION to Quash, [198] First MOTION to Quash Subpoena for Documents and to Testify at Trial or in the Alternative to Limit Scope of Subpoena: Motion Hearing set for Friday, 6/22/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3B, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: 6/20/2018, Terminated: 6/26/2018 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First MOTION to Quash Subpoena for Documents and to Testify at Trial or in the Alternative to Limit Scope of Subpoena by GASP as to Joel Iverson Gilbert. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B)(Lewis, Haley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: 6/19/2018, Terminated: 6/29/2018 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Quash by City of Birmingham as to Joel Iverson Gilbert. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Subpoena)(Love, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 196 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER Defendant Roberson's Motion to Adopt His Co-Defendants' Motion To Exclude Evidence of the Alabama State Ethics Law, doc. [141], is GRANTED.. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 6/18/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re [140] SEALED MOTION; It is ordered in the conclusion of this order that certain motions are granted and denied as set out.. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 6/18/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Order on Sealed Motion +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [139] Sealed Motion- Governments Motion to Exclude Defense Experts.as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2), David Lynn Roberson (3). Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 6/18/18. (SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as set out GRANTING [135] Motion in Limine as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2), David Lynn Roberson (3); It is ORDERED that nonparty witnesses are precluded from consulting with counsel during breaks and recesses in their testimony.. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 6/18/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Order on Sealed Motion +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as set out granting in part and denying in part [137] Sealed Motion as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2), David Lynn Roberson (3); The Defendants' motion [137] is GRANTED IN PART. Specifically, the Government is ORDERED to disclose the IRS' calculation of Oliver Robinson's tax deficiency and any supporting documents in that regard, including the IRS' characterizations of various expenses and other items. In all other respects, the Dfts' motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 6/18/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [132] Defendants motion to exclude evidence concerning whether Oliver Robinson acted in his official capacity during the course of the alleged conspiracy as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2), David Lynn Roberson (3): However, to prevent confusion at trial, with the parties assistance, the court will provide the jury a detailed instruction as to the distinction between official acts and acts taken in an official capacity. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 6/18/18. (SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 190 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 SEALED OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER granting in part and denying in part [136] SEALED MOTION Defendants Joint Motion In Limine to Admit Evidence Regarding Statements by Balch & Bingham and its Attorneys About the Propriety of the Oliver Robinson Foundation Contract. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 6/18/18. cm all parties. (SMH2, ) Modified on 6/18/2018 UNSEALED at the direction of Judge (SMH2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER with reasons set out DENYING [128] Motion in Limine to Introduce into Evidence Various Government Admissions as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2), David Lynn Roberson (3). Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 6/18/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [122] Defendants motion in limine to exclude evidence supporting the Governments retainer theory of bribery as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2), David Lynn Roberson (3). Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 6/18/18. (SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as set out GRANTING [125] Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of the Alabama State Ethics Laws as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2); GRANTING [133] Joint Motion in Limine and Memorandum in Support Thereof to Exclude Expert Testimony, Evidence and Argument about Alabama State Ethics Laws as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2), David Lynn Roberson (3); GRANTING [140] Sealed Motion as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2), David Lynn Roberson (3) Both parties are ORDERED to refrain from making any reference to the Dfts' purported compliance, or lack thereof, with Alabama ethics laws. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 6/18/2018. (HBB, ) Modified on 6/18/2018 (HBB, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [124] Defendants motion to prevent the Government from making any reference or argument relating to allegations made at the press conference announcing the indictment as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2), David Lynn Roberson (3). Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 6/18/18. (SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [134] Defendants Motion In Limine to Admit Certain Evidence Regarding the Environmental Issues Charged in the Indictment as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2), David Lynn Roberson (3). Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 6/18/18. (SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER provisionally granting [131] Defendants Joint Motion In Limine To Exclude Evidence of CampaignContributions, as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2), David Lynn Roberson (3). The court will revisit the issue again, if necessary, to the extent the Government informs the court that its plans have changed. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 6/18/18. (SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [127] Motion in Limine to exclude evidence relating to their compensation as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2). Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 6/18/18. (SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying without prejudice [123] Defendants Joint Motion for Leave to File Additional Motions In Limine After the Deadline in the Scheduling Order as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2), David Lynn Roberson (3). Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 6/18/18. (SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon:Pretrial Conference as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 6/18/2018. Defendant McKinney and Gilbert are to produced documents listed on exhibits list electronically or physical by end of day June 20, 2018 to the Government. (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/11/2018 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re [179] Defendants' Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions (Ward, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/11/2018 proposed jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson (Ward, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018 proposed jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Jury Instructions by David Lynn Roberson as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson (Asbill, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018, Terminated: 7/23/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Preliminary Instruction Relating to Defendants Defenses After Deadline by Steven George McKinney. (McKnight, Stewart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018 Response In OppositionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition by Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re [67] SEALED MOTION Joint Objections to Order of United States Magistrate Judge Denying Defendants Joint Motion to Compel Production of Unredacted FBI Interview Reports (McKnight, Stewart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 176 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 175 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by David Lynn Roberson as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re [162] Response to Motion,,,,,, [132] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Concerning "Official Capacity", [125] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of the Alabama State Ethics Laws, [124] Joint MOTION in Limine to Exclude Press Conference Topics, [134] MOTION in Limine to Admit Certain Evidence Regarding Environmental Issues Charged in the Indictment, [128] Joint MOTION in Limine to Introduce into Evidence Various Government Admissions and Memorandum in Support Thereof, [135] MOTION in Limine to Prevent Oliver Robinson from Consulting with Counsel during Breaks in his Testimony, [123] Joint MOTION for Leave to File Additional Motions in Limine After the Deadline in the Scheduling Order, [122] Joint MOTION in Limine and Memorandum in Support Thereof Regarding the "Retainer Theory" of Bribery, [133] Joint MOTION in Limine and Memorandum in Support Thereof to Exclude Expert Testimony, Evidence, and Argument About Alabama State Ethics Laws, [127] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Balch Compensation (Asbill, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 173 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document re: [170] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 172 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER granting [170] Motion to Seal Document filed by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2), David Lynn Roberson (3). Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 6/1/2018. (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Steven George McKinney as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re [162] Response to Motion,,,,,, [130] Joint MOTION to Permit Jurors to Take Notes and Ask Questions at Trial and Memorandum in Support Thereof (McKnight, Stewart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018, Terminated: 6/1/2018 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Document by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Ward, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 169 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER granting [167] Motion for Permission to File a Document Under Seal as to David Lynn Roberson (3). Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 6/1/2018. (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 168 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER granting [166] Motion for Permission to File a Document Under Seal as to David Lynn Roberson (3). Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 6/1/2018. (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018, Terminated: 6/1/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal by David Lynn Roberson. (Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018, Terminated: 6/1/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal by David Lynn Roberson. (Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to dft David Lynn Roberson, By Order dated May 4, 2018, [115], the court required the government to submit to the undersigned magistrate judge the grand jury testimony of codefendants for an in camera review; The Clerk is DIRECTED to maintain under seal the binder of grand jury testimony and FBI-302 submitted for in camera review for purposes of appellate review. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 06/01/2018. (KBB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 164 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6)(DWC, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 163 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(DWC, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re [132] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Concerning "Official Capacity", [125] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of the Alabama State Ethics Laws, [124] Joint MOTION in Limine to Exclude Press Conference Topics, [130] Joint MOTION to Permit Jurors to Take Notes and Ask Questions at Trial and Memorandum in Support Thereof , [134] MOTION in Limine to Admit Certain Evidence Regarding Environmental Issues Charged in the Indictment, [128] Joint MOTION in Limine to Introduce into Evidence Various Government Admissions and Memorandum in Support Thereof, [135] MOTION in Limine to Prevent Oliver Robinson from Consulting with Counsel during Breaks in his Testimony, [123] Joint MOTION for Leave to File Additional Motions in Limine After the Deadline in the Scheduling Order, [122] Joint MOTION in Limine and Memorandum in Support Thereof Regarding the "Retainer Theory" of Bribery, [133] Joint MOTION in Limine and Memorandum in Support Thereof to Exclude Expert Testimony, Evidence, and Argument About Alabama State Ethics Laws, [131] Joint MOTION in Limine and Memorandum in Support Thereof to Exclude Evidence of Campaign Contributions, [127] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Balch Compensation (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Ward, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 161 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(KBB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 160 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document (KBB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to by Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson to Government's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Bobby Segall (Sharman, Jackson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to by Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson to Government's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Othni Latham (Sharman, Jackson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 157 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER granting [152] Motion to Seal as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2), David Lynn Roberson (3) filed by USA. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/25/2018. (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 156 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [151] Motion for Leave to File as to David Lynn Roberson (3). Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/25/2018. (Putnam, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 155 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [153] Motion for Leave to File as to David Lynn Roberson (3). Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/25/2018. (Putnam, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to David Lynn Roberson re Ex Parte Motion for Issuance of subpoena duces tecum (doc. #142): The motion is GRANTED, subject, however, to the defendant submitting to the Clerk for signing and issuance an appropriate subpoena in the form and substance as that attached to the motion, except it shall contain the instruction for the responsive documents to be delivered to the Clerk of Court, rather than counsel, as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/25/18. (SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018, Terminated: 5/25/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal by David Lynn Roberson. (Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018, Terminated: 5/25/2018 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Two Documents by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Martin, George)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018, Terminated: 5/25/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal by David Lynn Roberson. (Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re [67] Dfts' Joint Motion to Compel Production of Unredacted FBI Interview Reports [68] Dft's Joint Motion for Preservation, In Camera Inspection and Discovery of Rough Interview Notes: For the reasons explained, the defendants are not entitled to production of either the unredacted FBI-302s of the Robinson interviews in February and March 2017 or the rough notes of the agents conducting the interviews. There is no exculpatory Brady or impeaching Giglio material found in either the redactions in the FBI-302s or the rough notes. Motions to compel additional production are DENIED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to preserve under seal (not for review by the public or the parties) for appellate review purposes the binder of documents submitted by the government for in camera review. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/25/18. (SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: 5/24/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Barbara Mack Harding appearing for David Lynn Roberson (Harding, Barbara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  In Camera Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: EX PARTE SEALED Hearing held on 5/24/2018 (Court Reporter Leah Turner) (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING Attorney Barbara M. Harding's [144] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David Lynn Roberson (3). Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 5/18/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018, Terminated: 11/1/2018 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct [135] MOTION in Limine to Prevent Oliver Robinson from Consulting with Counsel during Breaks in his Testimony filed by Joel Iverson Gilbert, David Lynn Roberson, Steven George McKinney, [134] MOTION in Limine to Admit Certain Evidence Regarding Environmental Issues Charged in the Indictment filed by Joel Iverson Gilbert, David Lynn Roberson, Steven George McKinney filed by Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Sharman, Jackson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018, Terminated: 5/18/2018 Motion to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: Barbara Mack Harding. by David Lynn Roberson. (Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon:Telephone Conference as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 5/17/2018. Court trial Logistics discussed. Parties are relieved from the 6/8/2018 proposed jury charge due date. The proposed jury charges are due 7/6/2018. Court decline to use jury questionnaire. Court to begin and end at 9:00 am to 6:00 pm June 25-29, 2018; July 2, 2018 forward 9:00 am to 6:00 pm, except Fridays 9:00 am to 1:00 pm. (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  PHV Fee Paid
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3090144 (Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION To Adopt His Co-Defendants' Motion To Exclude Evidence of the Alabama State Ethics Laws (Doc. 125) by David Lynn Roberson. (Asbill, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 140 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 ~~SEALED Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 139 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 ~~SEALED Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 138 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER granting [126] Motion to Seal Document as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2), David Lynn Roberson (3). Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 5/11/18. (SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 137 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 ~~SEALED Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION re [121] (Attachments: # (1) sealed attachment)(SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 136 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 ~~SEALED Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION re [120]. (SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Prevent Oliver Robinson from Consulting with Counsel during Breaks in his Testimony by Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Sharman, Jackson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Admit Certain Evidence Regarding Environmental Issues Charged in the Indictment by Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Sharman, Jackson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION in Limine and Memorandum in Support Thereof to Exclude Expert Testimony, Evidence, and Argument About Alabama State Ethics Laws by David Lynn Roberson as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Asbill, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Concerning "Official Capacity" by Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Sharman, Jackson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION in Limine and Memorandum in Support Thereof to Exclude Evidence of Campaign Contributions by David Lynn Roberson as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Asbill, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 7/23/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Permit Jurors to Take Notes and Ask Questions at Trial and Memorandum in Support Thereof by David Lynn Roberson as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Asbill, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 129 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER granting [121] Motion for Leave to File as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2), David Lynn Roberson (3); granting [120] Motion for Leave to File as to David Lynn Roberson (3). Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 5/11/18. (SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION in Limine to Introduce into Evidence Various Government Admissions and Memorandum in Support Thereof by David Lynn Roberson as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Asbill, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Balch Compensation by Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney. (Sharman, Jackson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 5/11/2018 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Document by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Ward, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of the Alabama State Ethics Laws by Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Gilbert sample form, # (2) Exhibit Roberson sample form)(Sharman, Jackson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 124 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION in Limine to Exclude Press Conference Topics by Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- Transcript of Press Conference)(Sharman, Jackson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Leave to File Additional Motions in Limine After the Deadline in the Scheduling Order by David Lynn Roberson as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Asbill, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION in Limine and Memorandum in Support Thereof Regarding the "Retainer Theory" of Bribery by David Lynn Roberson as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Asbill, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 5/11/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Motion Under Seal by David Lynn Roberson as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 5/11/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Motion Under Seal by David Lynn Roberson. (Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4A of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. The Parties should be prepared to discuss any aspect of the trial of this cause, including jury voir dire, necessary stipulations, evidence and limine isssues, and jury and other legal instructions. (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson Telephone Conference set for 5/17/2018 at 03:00 PM before Judge Abdul K Kallon. The parties shall dial 888-557-8511 and enter access code 4541204, five minutes prior to the designated call time. (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Order on Sealed Motion +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re:[68] Dft's Joint Motion for Preservation, In Camera Inspection and Discovery of Rough Interview Notes as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2), David Lynn Roberson (3) is MOOT. The Government is ORDERED to provide the rough notes from interviews with Oliver Robinson to Judge T. Michael Putnam by May 11, 2018 for in camera review.. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 5/4/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Order on Sealed Motion +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as set out granting [67] Dfts' Joint Motion to Compel Production of Unredacted FBI Interview Reports as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2), David Lynn Roberson (3); The Government is DIRECTED to provide unredacted copies of the 302 reports from the February and March 2017 interviews with Oliver Robinson to Judge T. Michael Putnam by May 11, 2018 for in camera review.. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 5/4/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson, For reasons explained in this order, the Defendants' motions doc [65],[66] are DENIED. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 5/4/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson, The Defendants are not entitled "to compel the government to offer a detailed exposition of its evidence or to explain the legal theories upon which it intends to rely at trial, the motion for a pretrial James hearing [60] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 5/4/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as set out as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson, Roberson's motion doc [59] is DENIED. The Government is ORDERED to produce to Judge T. Michael Putnam the redacted statements for in camera review by May 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 5/4/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as set out [58] Motion Requesting that The Indictment Not be Read to Jurors or Sent Back With Jurors as to David Lynn Roberson (3) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 5/4/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 113 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 112 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER: The Joint Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, doc. [107], is GRANTED. as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2), David Lynn Roberson (3). Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 5/4/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 111 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 order on motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as set out re:[57] Motion to Strike as to David Lynn Roberson (3); The court DENIES Roberson's motion [57] without prejudice to refile if the Government fails to establish the relevance of the purportedly surplus language at trial or if that evidence proves unduly prejudicial to the Defendants at that time.. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 5/4/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 110 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson, Consistent with this opinion, The Motions for Bill of Particulars, docs [56],[62] and the Motion to Compel Identification of the Specific Documents which the Government Intends to Use at its Case-In-Chief at Trial doc [63] are DENIED. The Court hereby ORDERS the Government to immediately file a bill of particulars disclosing identities as set out in this order.. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 5/4/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 109 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as set out as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson, re [55] MOTION to Dismiss The Indictment and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Joel Iverson Gilbert, David Lynn Roberson, Steven George McKinney; Consistent with this opinion, the motion to dismiss the Indictment doc [55] on any of the constitutional grounds raised is DENIED.. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 5/4/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING to adopt and conform motions [61],[64],[69],[70],[71] as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney and David Lynn Roberson. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 5/4/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018, Terminated: 5/4/2018 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Seal Document by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Mark, Robin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by David Lynn Roberson (Asbill, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Dft McKinney's Reply to Government's Response to Motion to Dismiss the Indictment for Prosecutorial Misconduct. (HBB, ) Modified on 4/25/2018 Unsealed at the Direction of the Court (SMH2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Dft David Lynn Roberson's Reply in Support of Motion for Severance of Trials. (HBB, ) Modified on 4/25/2018 Unsealed at the Direction of the Court (SMH2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Dft's Joint Reply to the Government's Response to Dft's Joint Motion for Preservation, In Camera Inspection, and Discovery of Rough Interview Notes. re[68][78] (HBB, ) Modified on 4/25/2018 Unsealed at the Direction of the Court (SMH2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply in Support of the Motion to Dismiss for Prosecutorial Misconduct before the Grand Jury as to dft Joel Gilbert re:[66] (HBB, ) Modified on 4/25/2018 Unsealed at the Direction of the Court (SMH2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Steven George McKinney as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re [72] Response in Opposition, [63] MOTION to Compel Identification of the Specific Documents Which the Government Expects to Introduce in its Case-in-Chief at Trial (McKnight, Stewart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Lawanda N. Hodges'[87] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Steven George McKinney (2). Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 4/13/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re [81] Response to Motion, [67] SEALED MOTION (Sharman, Jackson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Steven George McKinney as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re [75] Response in Opposition, [62] MOTION for Bill of Particulars (McKnight, Stewart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by David Lynn Roberson re [77] Response in Opposition, [57] MOTION to Strike Surplusage from the Indictment and Memorandum in Support Thereof (Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by David Lynn Roberson re [74] Response in Opposition, [58] MOTION Requesting That The Indictment Not Be Read To Jurors Or Sent Back With Jurors And Memorandum In Support Thereof (Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by David Lynn Roberson re [76] Response in Opposition, [56] MOTION for Bill of Particulars and Memorandum in Support Thereof (Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by David Lynn Roberson re [82] Response in Opposition, [60] MOTION for Hearing (Pretrial James Hearing) And Memorandum In Support Thereof (Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by David Lynn Roberson as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re [83] Response in Opposition, [55] MOTION to Dismiss The Indictment and Memorandum in Support Thereof (Asbill, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER with deadlines, procedures and instructions set out as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson GRANTING [89] MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal filed by David Lynn Roberson, and GRANTING [90] MOTION to Seal Document filed by Steven George McKinney, These motions are GRANTED subject to procedures set out in the court's earlier Order regarding the filing of grand jury materials doc# [54]. If Dft Gilbert wishes to file a reply brief containing grand jury materials, this same procedure shall be Used and he is GRANTED leave to file such a brief and materials under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 4/13/2018. (HBB, ) Modified on 4/13/2018 (HBB, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Steven George McKinney as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re [82] Response in Opposition, [60] MOTION for Hearing (Pretrial James Hearing) And Memorandum In Support Thereof (McKnight, Stewart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018, Terminated: 4/13/2018 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Document by Steven George McKinney. (McKnight, Stewart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018, Terminated: 4/13/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by David Lynn Roberson. (Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Praveen Krishna appearing for USA. (Krishna, Praveen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018, Terminated: 4/13/2018 Motion to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: Lawanda N. Hodges. by Steven George McKinney. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(McKnight, Stewart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  PHV Fee Paid
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PHV Fee paid: $50, receipt number B4601088186 by attorney Lawanda N. Hodges re [87] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 86 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 85 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER granting [84] Motion to Seal Document as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2), David Lynn Roberson (3);. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 4/3/2018. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: 4/2/2018, Terminated: 4/3/2018 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal , MOTION to Seal Document by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Martin, George)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 83 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re [55] MOTION to Dismiss The Indictment and Memorandum in Support Thereof (Ward, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re [60] MOTION for Hearing (Pretrial James Hearing) And Memorandum In Support Thereof (Ward, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re [67] SEALED MOTION (Martin, George)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re [65] SEALED MOTION (Martin, George)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re [66] SEALED MOTION (Martin, George)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re [68] SEALED MOTION (Martin, George)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re [57] MOTION to Strike Surplusage from the Indictment and Memorandum in Support Thereof (Martin, George)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re [56] MOTION for Bill of Particulars and Memorandum in Support Thereof (Mark, Robin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re [62] MOTION for Bill of Particulars (Mark, Robin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re [58] MOTION Requesting That The Indictment Not Be Read To Jurors Or Sent Back With Jurors And Memorandum In Support Thereof (Mark, Robin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to David Lynn Roberson re [59] MOTION to Sever Defendant and Memorandum in Support Thereof (Mark, Robin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re [63] MOTION to Compel Identification of the Specific Documents Which the Government Expects to Introduce in its Case-in-Chief at Trial (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Mark, Robin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018, Terminated: 5/4/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Adopt and Conform Co-Defendants' Motions by Steven George McKinney. (McKnight, Stewart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018, Terminated: 5/4/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION To Adopt Several Motions Filed By Co-Defendants On February 16, 2018 by David Lynn Roberson. (Asbill, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018, Terminated: 5/4/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Adopt and Conform Co-Defendants' Motions by Joel Iverson Gilbert. (Sharman, Jackson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018, Terminated: 5/4/2018 ~~SEALED Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Dft's Joint Motion for Preservation, In Camera Inspection and Discovery of Rough Interview Notes (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(HBB, ) Modified on 3/1/2018 to Unseal at the direction of the Court (HBB, ). Modified on 3/1/2018 (HBB, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018, Terminated: 5/4/2018 ~~SEALED Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dft's Joint Motion to Compel Production of Unredacted FBI Interview Reports (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(HBB, ) Modified on 3/1/2018 to Unseal at the direction of the court(HBB, ). Modified on 3/1/2018 (HBB, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018, Terminated: 5/4/2018 ~~SEALED Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Dismiss for Prosecutorial Misconduct before the Grand Jury (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(HBB, ) Modified on 3/1/2018 to Unseal at the direction of the court (HBB, ). Modified on 3/1/2018 (HBB, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018, Terminated: 5/4/2018 ~~SEALED Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Dft McKinney's Motion to Dismiss the Indictment for Prosecutorial Misconduct and for disclosure of Grand Jury Evidence (HBB, ) Modified on 3/1/2018 to unseal at the direction of the court(HBB, ). Modified on 3/1/2018 (HBB, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018, Terminated: 5/4/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Adopting and Conforming Co-Defendants' Motions by Steven George McKinney. (McKnight, Stewart) Modified on 2/16/2018 to edit entry (HBB, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018, Terminated: 5/4/2018 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Identification of the Specific Documents Which the Government Expects to Introduce in its Case-in-Chief at Trial by Steven George McKinney. (McKnight, Stewart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018, Terminated: 5/4/2018 Motion for Bill of Particulars
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Bill of Particulars by Steven George McKinney. (McKnight, Stewart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018, Terminated: 5/4/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Adopt and Conform Co-Defendants' Motions by David Lynn Roberson. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bloomston, Brett) Modified on 2/16/2018 to correct entry to read only as to Dft #3 David Roberson (HBB, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018, Terminated: 2/16/2018 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Hearing (Pretrial James Hearing) And Memorandum In Support Thereof by David Lynn Roberson. (Bloomston, Brett) Modified on 2/16/2018 to correct entry to read only as to Dft #3 David Roberson (HBB, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018, Terminated: 5/4/2018 motion to sever defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Sever Defendant and Memorandum in Support Thereof by David Lynn Roberson (Bloomston, Brett) Modified on 2/16/2018 to correct entry to read only as to Dft #3 David Roberson (HBB, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018, Terminated: 2/16/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Requesting That The Indictment Not Be Read To Jurors Or Sent Back With Jurors And Memorandum In Support Thereof by David Lynn Roberson (Bloomston, Brett) Modified on 2/16/2018 to correct entry to read only as to Dft #3 David Roberson (HBB, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018, Terminated: 5/4/2018 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike Surplusage from the Indictment and Memorandum in Support Thereof by David Lynn Roberson (Bloomston, Brett) Modified on 2/16/2018 to correct entry to read only as to Dft #3 David Roberson (HBB, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018, Terminated: 2/16/2018 Motion for Bill of Particulars
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Bill of Particulars and Memorandum in Support Thereof by David Lynn Roberson (Bloomston, Brett) Modified on 2/16/2018 to correct entry to read only as to Dft #3 David Roberson (HBB, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018, Terminated: 5/4/2018 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss The Indictment and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A, # (2) Appendix B, # (3) Appendix C, # (4) Appendix D)(Asbill, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re the filing of motions that contain quotations or paraphrasing of grand jury testimony in this case. Motions and any accompanying briefs due to be filed on February 16, 2018, that contain quotations or detailed paraphrasing of grand jury testimony must be filed under SEAL. Leave is hereby GRANTED for counsel to file under seal such motions and briefs containing grand jury material, as further set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 2/15/18. (SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam:Telephone Conference as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 2/15/2018 (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER granting [50] & [51] Motions to Withdraw as Attorney; J Alan Baty and Henry I Frohsin withdrawn from case as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 2/14/2018. (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson: Telephone Conference set for Thursday, 2/15/2018 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam; parties are directed to call 888-636-3807 and use access code 3676046 to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 2/12/2018. (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018, Terminated: 2/14/2018 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Joel Iverson Gilbert by Henry I Frohsin. by Joel Iverson Gilbert. (Frohsin, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 50 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018, Terminated: 2/14/2018 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Joel Iverson Gilbert by J. Alan Baty. by Joel Iverson Gilbert. (Baty, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson: Jury Trial set for 6/25/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Abdul K Kallon. The time between December 19, 2017, and June 25, 2018, is hereby EXCLUDED for purposes of calculation of the speedy-trial deadline. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 1/2/18. (SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  scheduling conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam:Scheduling Conference as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held in chambers on 12/19/2017 (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson) (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FINDINGS AND ORDER as set out as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson re [42] SEALED MOTION; The Court concludes that McKnight shall not be disqualified from his representation of McKinney. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 11/17/2017. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 47 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: 11/9/2017 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: 11/9/2017 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER granting [45] Motion to Seal Document as to Steven George McKinney (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 11/9/2017. (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: 11/9/2017, Terminated: 11/9/2017 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Document by Steven George McKinney as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (McKnight, Stewart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  In Chambers Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for SEALED PROCEEDINGS held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held on 11/9/2017 (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson) (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson: re [43] Text Order scheduling In Chambers Conference for Thursday, 11/9/2017 at 01:00 PM, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam; Counsel for defendants and counsel for government shall be present; If Out of Town Counsel would like to participate by telephone, they are directed to contact the courtroom deputy for call-in instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 11/1/2017. (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson; In Chambers Conference regarding Sealed Motion [42] set for Thursday, 11/9/2017 at 01:00 PM Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam; Counsel for defendants and counsel for government shall be present. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 11/1/2017. (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 42 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: 10/30/2017, Terminated: 11/17/2017 ~~SEALED Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION (SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: 10/30/2017 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER granting [39] Motion to Seal Document as to Steven George McKinney (2). Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 10/30/17. (SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: 10/18/2017 Waiver of Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER of Speedy Trial by Joel Iverson Gilbert (Sharman, Jackson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: 10/17/2017, Terminated: 10/30/2017 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal Document by USA as to Steven George McKinney. (Martin, George)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: 10/17/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [29] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Craig A. Gillen as to Steven George McKinney (2). Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 10/17/2017. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Receipt for Passport
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Receipt for Surrender of Passport as to David Lynn Roberson (passport placed in criminal vault) (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 37 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER for Ends of Justice Continuance of Trial Setting as set out as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson; The time period between this Order and 12/19/2017, is hereby excluded from the Speedy Trial Act deadline to meet the ends of justice. Status Conference set for Tuesday, 12/19/2017 01:00 PM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam.. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/16/2017. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson: Status Conference set for Tuesday, 12/19/2017 at 01:00 PM in Chambers, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/16/2017. (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 Waiver of Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER of Speedy Trial by Steven George McKinney (McKnight, Stewart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 Waiver of Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER of Speedy Trial by David Lynn Roberson (Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unsecured Bond Entered as to David Lynn Roberson in amount of $ 5,000, with special conditions (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unsecured Bond Entered as to Steven George McKinney in amount of $ 5,000, with special conditions (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unsecured Bond Entered as to Joel Iverson Gilbert in amount of $ 5,000, with special conditions (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 Order on Motion for protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROTECTIVE ORDER granting [20] Motion for Protective Order as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1), Steven George McKinney (2), David Lynn Roberson (3). Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/16/17. (SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017, Terminated: 10/17/2017 Motion to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: Craig A. Gillen. by Steven George McKinney. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(McKnight, Stewart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 Scheduling Order and NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER and NOTICE that certain deadlines and instructions apply as set out as to David Lynn Roberson. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/16/2017. (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 Standing Discovery OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER with instructions and deadlines set out as to David Lynn Roberson. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/16/2017. (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 Scheduling Order and NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER and NOTICE that certain deadlines and instructions apply as set out as to Steven George McKinney. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/16/2017. (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 Standing Discovery OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER with instructions and deadlines set out as to Steven George McKinney. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/16/2017. (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 Scheduling Order and NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER and NOTICE that certain deadlines and instructions apply as set out as to Joel Iverson Gilbert. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/16/2017. (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 Standing Discovery OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER with instructions and deadlines set out as to Joel Iverson Gilbert. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/16/2017. (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  PHV Fee Paid
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PHV Fee paid: $50, receipt number B4601083910 as to Attorney, Craig A. Gillen regarding Defendant, Steven G. McKinney (HBB, ) (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam:Status Conference as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson held in chambers on 10/16/2017 (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Receipt for Passport
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Receipt for Surrender of Passport as to Steven George McKinney (passport placed in vault) (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  initial appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam:Initial Appearance & Arraignment as to David Lynn Roberson (3) Count 1,2,3-5,6 held on 10/16/2017; deft present with retained counsel Brett M. Bloomston, David Bouchard, & Henry W. Asbill; AUSA Martin & USPO Shepherd also present; rights & charges explained; deft served, waived reading, not guilty plea entered; deft released on $5,000 u/s bond with special conditions (Court Reporter Leah Turner) (ASL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  initial appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam:Initial Appearance & Arraignment as to Steven George McKinney (2) Count 1,2,3-5,6 held on 10/16/2017; deft present with retained counsel Stewart Davidson McKnight, III & Craig A. Gillen; AUSA Martin & USPO Shepherd also present; rights & charges explained; deft served, waived reading, not guilty plea entered; deft released on $5,000 u/s bond with special conditions (Court Reporter Leah Turner) (ASL, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  initial appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam:Initial Appearance & Arraignment as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1) Count 1,2,3-5,6 held on 10/16/2017; deft present with retained counsel David Penn Burns, Jackson R. Sharman, III, and Jeffrey P. Doss; AUSA Martin & USPO Shepherd also present; rights & charges explained; deft served, waived reading, not guilty plea entered; deft released on $5,000 u/s bond with special conditions (Court Reporter Leah Turner) (ASL) Modified on 10/16/2017 (ASL).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stewart Davidson McKnight, III appearing for Steven George McKinney (McKnight, Stewart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [17] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1). Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 10/13/17. (SMH2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017, Terminated: 10/16/2017 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Protective Order by USA as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, George)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Henry I Frohsin appearing for Joel Iverson Gilbert (Frohsin, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: J Alan Baty appearing for Joel Iverson Gilbert (Baty, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: 10/3/2017, Terminated: 10/13/2017 Motion to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice Attorney: David P. Burns. by Joel Iverson Gilbert. (Sharman, Jackson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: 10/3/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brandon Keith Essig appearing for Joel Iverson Gilbert (Essig, Brandon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: 10/3/2017 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING as to dft Steven George McKinney, Arraignment reset for Monday, 10/16/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3B, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. (DWC, ) cm dft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: 10/3/2017 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING as to dfts Joel Iverson Gilbert, David Lynn Roberson, Arraignment reset for Monday, 10/16/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3B, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. (DWC, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  PHV Fee Paid
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-2944590 (Sharman, Jackson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case as to dfts Joel Iverson Gilbert, Steven George McKinney, David Lynn Roberson Reassigned to Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (DWC, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: 9/29/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David Bouchard appearing for David Lynn Roberson (Bouchard, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: 9/29/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Henry W Asbill appearing for David Lynn Roberson (Asbill, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: 9/29/2017 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORRECTED NOTICE OF HEARING as to Steven George McKinney Arraignment set for 10/12/2017 09:30 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson Jr. (DWC, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [6], [7] Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David Lynn Roberson (3); regarding Attorneys, Henry W. Asbill and David H. Bouchard.. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 9/28/2017. (HBB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey P Doss appearing for Joel Iverson Gilbert (Doss, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jackson R Sharman, III appearing for Joel Iverson Gilbert (Sharman, Jackson)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017, Terminated: 9/28/2017 Motion to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: David Holmes Bouchard. by David Lynn Roberson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017, Terminated: 9/28/2017 Motion to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: Henry W. Asbill. by David Lynn Roberson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brett M Bloomston appearing for David Lynn Roberson (Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING as to David Lynn Roberson, Arraignment set for 10/12/2017 09:30 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson Jr. (DWC, ) cm dft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING as to Steven George McKinney, Arraignment set for 10/12/2017 09:30 AM in Federal Courthouse, Huntsville, AL before Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson Jr. (DWC, ) cm dft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING as to Joel Iverson Gilbert, Arraignment set for 10/12/2017 09:30 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson Jr. (DWC, ) cm dft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  PHV Fee Paid
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-2940716 (Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  PHV Fee Paid
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-2940710 (Bloomston, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        INDICTMENT Please file all subsequent documents using the criminal case number assigned to this indictment. as to Joel Iverson Gilbert (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-5, 6, Steven George McKinney (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3-5, 6, David Lynn Roberson (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3-5, 6. (Attachments: # (1) Signed Indictment (SEALED)) (DWC, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 19 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?