Gordon, PC v. Arends
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 6:06-cv-06021-AA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 14, 2018 at 11:45 PM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Other Personal Property Damage
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: Stipulated Judgment of Dismissal. Signed on September 6, 2006 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (cp)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 10 is Denied. Signed on June 28, 2006 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (cp, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 2 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?