FSA GROUP, INC. v. AMERADA HESS CORPORATION
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:05-cv-00809-GEKP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 9:48 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Real Property: Torts to Land
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOCKET NO. 23). SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT IS GRANTED AS TO COUNTS II, III AND IV. SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED AS TO COUNT I. SIGNED BY JUDGE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 06/27/2007. 06/28/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(rab)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MEMORANDUM AND OPINION DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL BY JURY (DOCKET NO. 16). SIGNED BY JUDGE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 04/26/2006. 04/26/2006 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(rab)
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 3 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?