MESBAH v. POMPEO
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02631

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 20, 2019 at 10:29 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DAVOOD MESBAH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nimer Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer E Nimer +1 614 451 3232 +1 614 451 3222 jnimer@cair.com
v.
No Logo CARL RISCH, Defendant
No Logo ERIN EUSSEN, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOES 1-10, Defendant
No Logo KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, Defendant
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "MIKE POMPEO"
Citation Section 08 U.S.C. § 1329
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: 11/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                      SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to ERIN EUSSEN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, MIKE POMPEO, CARL RISCH, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: 11/15/2018 Unknown Document Type
                        PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS AND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5792882) filed by DAVOOD MESBAH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DS-160 confirmation, # 2 Exhibit Employment Authorization Document, # 3 Exhibit I-20, # 4 Exhibit Offer Letter from OPT Employer, # 5 Exhibit 221(g) Refusal, # 6 Exhibit Email from Embassy Confirming Receipt of Plaintiff Response to Request, # 7 Exhibit Email from Non-Immigrant Visa Unit of US Embassy Yerevan, Armenia, # 8 Exhibit CEAC online case status, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons US Attorney DC, # 11 Summons US Attorney General, # 12 Summons Sec of State, # 13 Summons Assistant Sec of State for Consular Affairs, # 14 Summons Sec of Homeland Security, # 15 Summons Consular Chief US Embassy Yerevan, Armenia, # 16 Summons Consular Officers Doe)(Nimer, Jennifer)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zrdj)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 9 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?