Crites v. Fox News Network, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-00489

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 2, 2019 at 3:44 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Order Setting Settlement Conference.
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion To Substitute Attorney
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER granting ECF No. 47 Withdrawal of Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 0 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?