Washington v. DaimlerChrysler Financial Services America LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:08-cv-00698-JRT-JJK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 15, 2018 at 4:34 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1692
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 46 Report and Recommendation, 22 Motion to Compel filed by Nathan Washington. Plaintiffs Complaint [Docket No. 1] is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and Plaintiffs motion to compel discovery responses from defendant Shakopee Dodge, Inc. [Docket No. 22] is DENIED AS MOOT(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on January 1, 2009. (HAM)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint should be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and 22 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Shakopee Dodge, Inc. should be DENIED AS MOOT. Objections to R&R due by 12/16/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 12/2/08. (akl)
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 0 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?