Alan Utz v. East Coast, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-02978-AMD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alan Utz & Associates, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by hardlaw.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George C Davis +1 410 727 0828 +1 410 727 5893 george@hardlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by KATOR, PARKS & WEISER, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Kator +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 mkator@katorparks.com
v.
No Logo East Coast Industries, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by proctorlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Margaret M McKee +1 410 823 2258 +1 410 823 2268 mmckee@proctorlaw.com
Space K Donald Proctor +1 410 823 2258 +1 410 823 2268 kdproctor@proctorlaw.com
No Logo The North River Insurance Company, Defendant
Office Baltimore
Filed 8/31/1998
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County 88888
Terminated 1/6/2000
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 6:98CV247[USDC TX E. (Tyler)]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (79) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 71 Filed: 4/27/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER of DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 4/27/00) (c/i 4/27/00 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Legal Document 70 Filed: 1/6/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER "DISMISSING" Civil Action with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause within 30 days to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 1/6/00) (c/m & microfilmed 1/7/00 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Terminated Case
      Case closed (mms, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 69 Filed: 12/15/1999, Entered: 12/16/1999 Response in Opposition
        RESPONSE by Alan Utz in opposition to [65-1] Defendant's Objection to Plaintiff's Proposed use of certain deposition testimony. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 68 Filed: 12/15/1999, Entered: 12/16/1999 Response to Motion
          RESPONSE by Alan Utz to [64-1] motion to Amend [6-1] answer by East Coast, [63-1] motion in Limine RE: To exclude testimony of Lowell B. Cook by East Coast. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Legal Document 67 Filed: 12/3/1999, Entered: 12/6/1999 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER GRANTING [62-1] Joint Motion of Alan Utz & Associates, Inc. and North River to Sever the claims against North River from the claims against East Coast. ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 12/3/99 ) (c/m 12/6/99 ) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 66 Filed: 12/2/1999, Entered: 12/3/1999 Stipulation of DismissalCourt Filing
              STIPULATION of dismissal and APPROVAL (signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 12/2/99) (c/m 12/3/99 jl) (MICROFILMED 12/3/99) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 65 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Response
                RESPONSE (Objections) by East Coast to plaintiff's proposed use of certain deposition testimony and Attachments 1-2 (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 64 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion to Amend/Correct
                  MOTION by East Coast to Amend [6-1] answer by East Coast and proposed amended answer (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 63 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion in Limine
                    MOTION by East Coast in Limine RE: To exclude testimony of Lowell B. Cook and Attachments 1-2 (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 62 Filed: 11/24/1999, Entered: 11/29/1999, Terminated: 12/3/1999 ~Motion to Sever
                      JOINT MOTION by Alan Utz, North River to Sever . (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 61 Filed: 11/19/1999, Entered: 11/19/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of attorney appearance for East Coast by Margaret M. McKee. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 60 Filed: 11/2/1999, Entered: 11/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [59-1] motion of North River to Extend Time to file any dispositive pre-trial motions to 11/5/99 ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 11/2/99 ) (c/i 11/2/99) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 59 Filed: 11/1/1999, Entered: 11/2/1999, Terminated: 11/2/1999 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                            MOTION by North River to Extend Time to file any dispositive pre-trial motions . (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 58 Filed: 10/28/1999, Entered: 10/28/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [57-1] motion to Extend Time of pretrial dispositive motions is extended to 11/2/99. ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 10/28/99) (c/m 10/28/99) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 57 Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: 10/26/1999, Terminated: 10/28/1999 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                UNOPPOSED MOTION by North River to Extend Time of pretrial dispositive motions (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/22/1999, Entered: 10/25/1999, Terminated: 10/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [56-1] motion for Kieran E. Fox to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Kieran E. Fox for East Coast ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 10/22/99 ) (c/i 10/25/99) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document 56 Filed: 10/22/1999, Entered: 10/25/1999, Terminated: 10/22/1999 Motion to Withdraw
                                    MOTION by East Coast, East Coast for Kieran E. Fox to Withdraw as Attorney (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 55 Filed: 9/27/1999, Entered: 9/27/1999 Status Report
                                      STATUS REPORT by STV Incorporated (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/21/1999, Entered: 7/21/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                        MARGINAL ORDER denying without Prejudice [54-1] motion of Plaintiff for Continuance (signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 7/21/99) (c/m 7/21/99 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document 54 Filed: 7/20/1999, Entered: 7/21/1999, Terminated: 7/21/1999 Motion to Continue
                                          UNOPPOSED REQUEST/MOTION by Alan Utz for Continuance with Exhibit A (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 53 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/21/1999 Local Rule
                                            Local Rule 103.3 Certification by Groundwater and Environmental (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 52 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/21/1999 Answer to Third-Party Complaint
                                              ANSWER by Groundwater and (Attorney Ronald A. Baradel, Susan Turner Ford) to [39-1] third-party complaint by East Coast (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 51 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/2/1999 Order
                                                ORDER granting [50-1] motion to Amend Misnomer with Respect to Crum & Forster Insurance Company to Substitute North River Insurance Company for Crum & Forster (signed by Andre M. Davis 6/1/99) (c/m 6/2/99 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/2/1999, Terminated: 6/1/1999 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                  MOTION by Crum & Forster to Amend Misnomer with Respect to Crum & Forster Insurance Company to Substitute North River Insurance Company for Crum & Forster (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [47-1] motion to Amend [17-1] Scheduling order and CANCELLING Pretrial Conference for 8/26/99 and SUBSTITUTING New Trial Schedule. (signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 6/1/99) (c/m 6/2/99 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/2/1999 Order
                                                      MARGINAL ORDER granting [48-1] motion of Defendant to Substitute Attorney Kieran E. Fox for Jeffrey W. Cottle terminated attorney Jeffrey W. Cottle for East Coast Added Kieran E. Fox (signed by Andre M. Davis 6/1/99) (c/m 6/2/99 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/2/1999, Terminated: 6/1/1999 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                        MOTION by East Coast to Substitute Attorney Kieran E. Fox for Jeffrey W. Cottle (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 5/24/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999, Terminated: 6/1/1999 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                          MOTION by STV Incorporated to Amend [17-1] Scheduling order . (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 5/24/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999, Terminated: 1/6/2000 Answer to Third-Party Complaint
                                                            ANSWER by STV Incorporated (Attorney Douglas G. Worrall, Howard Spessard Stevens) to [39-1] third-party complaint by East Coast. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 5/24/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999 Summons Returned Executed
                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to STV Incorporated, Groundwater and 5/5/99 Answer due on 5/25/99 for STV Incorporated, for Groundwater and (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 5/6/1999, Entered: 5/6/1999 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                NOTICE of voluntary dismissal of third party complaint against Exxon Corporation without prejudice and APPROVAL J. DAVIS dated 5/6/99. (c/m & microfilmed 5/6/99) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 43 Filed: 4/23/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER ALLOWING Joinder of Exxon as 3rd party defendant remains in place; and Service on 3rd party defendants should be effected forthwith. Discovery should proceed apace as settlement discussions. (signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 4/23/99) (c/m 4/26/99 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 3/30/1999, Entered: 3/30/1999 Summons Issued
                                                                    SUMMONS(ES) (20 days) issued for STV Incorporated (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 3/30/1999, Entered: 3/30/1999 Summons Issued
                                                                      Third Party SUMMONS(ES) (20 days) issued for Groundwater and Environmental Services, Inc. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/30/1999 Response in Opposition
                                                                        RESPONSE by Alan Utz in opposition to [33-1] motion for Joinder of Exxon Corporation as a Plaintiff by East Coast (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/30/1999 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                          THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by East Coast against Groundwater and Environmental Services, Inc. and STV Incorporated (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 38 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [35-1] motion of Defendant for Leave to File Third Party Complaint against STV Incorporated, granting [34-1] motion of Defendant for Leave to File Third Party Complaint against Groundwater and Environmental Services, Inc., denying [33-1] motion for Joinder of Exxon Corporation as a Plaintiff (signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 3/29/99) (c/m 3/30/99 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 3/15/1999, Entered: 3/16/1999, Terminated: 3/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [37-1] joint letter/motion to Extend Time for filing of Status Report and Response by Alan Utz be Extended to Join Exxon Corporation as Plaintiff ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 3/15/99) (c/m 3/16/99 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 3/15/1999, Entered: 3/16/1999, Terminated: 3/15/1999 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                LETTER/MOTION by Alan Utz, East Coast, Crum & Forster to Extend Time for filing of Status Report and Response by Alan Utz be Extended to Join Exxon Corporation as Plaintiff (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 3/10/1999, Entered: 3/10/1999 CorrespondenceCourt Filing
                                                                                  CORRESPONDENCE to all Counsel ADVISING of REASSIGNMENT OF CASE to Judge Davis from Judge Smalkin mailed to all interested parties. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/2/1999, Entered: 3/5/1999 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                    CASE reassigned from J. Smalkin to Judge Andre M. Davis (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 3/1/1999, Entered: 3/2/1999, Terminated: 3/29/1999 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                      MOTION by East Coast for Leave to File Third Party Complaint against STV Incorporated and proposed Third Party Complaint (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 3/1/1999, Entered: 3/2/1999 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                        MOTION by East Coast for Leave to File Third Party Complaint against Groundwater and Environmental Services, Inc. (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 3/1/1999, Entered: 3/2/1999 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                          MOTION with memorandum in support by East Coast for Joinder of Exxon Corporation as a Plaintiff and Exhibits 1-7 (MEMORANDUM OF LAW WITH EXHIBITS FILED SEPARATELY) (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999, Terminated: 2/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [32-1] motion to Extend Time For Naming 3rd Parties until 3/1/99. (signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 2/19/99) (c/m 2/19/99 skp) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999, Terminated: 2/22/1999 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                              LETTER/MOTION by Alan Utz, East Coast, Crum & Forster to Extend Time For Naming 3rd Parties (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 1/13/1999, Entered: 1/21/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                NOTICE of attorney appearance for Alan Utz by George C. Davis (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/13/1999, Entered: 1/13/1999, Terminated: 1/13/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [30-1] motion to Extend Time for Naming Third Parties until 2/22/99 and Discovery Deadline until 4/15/99; Pretrial Conference to be rescheduled until 8/26/99. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m 1/13/99 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 30 Filed: 1/13/1999, Entered: 1/13/1999, Terminated: 1/13/1999 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                    Letter MOTION by Alan Utz, East Coast, Crum & Forster to Extend Time for Naming Third Parties until 2/22/99 and Discovery Deadline until 4/15/99; Pretrial Conference to be rescheduled (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 12/23/1998, Entered: 12/23/1998, Terminated: 12/23/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting [29-1] motion to Extend Time for Naming Third Parties until 1/25/99. (signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 12/23/98) (c/m 12/23/98 chambers) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 12/23/1998, Entered: 12/23/1998, Terminated: 12/23/1998 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                        Letter MOTION by Alan Utz, East Coast, Crum & Forster to Extend Time for Naming Third Parties until 1/25/99. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998, Terminated: 12/7/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting [28-1] motion for J. Mark Mann to Withdraw as Attorney, granting [28-2] motion for J. Chad Parker to Withdraw as Attorney (signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 12/7/98) (c/m 12/7/98 skp) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998, Terminated: 12/7/1998 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                            MOTION by Alan Utz for J. Mark Mann to Withdraw as Attorney , and for J. Chad Parker to Withdraw as Attorney (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 11/30/1998, Entered: 12/2/1998, Terminated: 11/30/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [27-1] motion for Brian S. Martin & Thomas P. Bowes to Withdraw as Attorney (signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 11/30/98) (c/m 11/30/98 skp) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 11/30/1998, Entered: 12/2/1998, Terminated: 11/30/1998 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                MOTION by Crum & Forster for Brian S. Martin & Thomas P. Bowes to Withdraw as Attorney (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 11/3/1998, Entered: 11/5/1998, Terminated: 11/3/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [26-1] motion to Modify [17-1] Scheduling order "APPROVED as noted." ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 11/3/98) (c/m skp 11/3/98) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 11/3/1998, Entered: 11/5/1998, Terminated: 11/3/1998 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                    Letter MOTION by East Coast to Modify [17-1] Scheduling order (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 11/2/1998, Entered: 11/3/1998, Terminated: 11/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [25-1] motion for David B. Mantor to Withdraw as Attorney (signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 11/2/98) (c/m by chambers) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 11/2/1998, Entered: 11/3/1998, Terminated: 11/2/1998 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                        MOTION by East Coast for David B. Mantor to Withdraw as Attorney (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 11/2/1998, Entered: 11/3/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of attorney appearance for Alan Utz by Michael J. Kator. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 10/30/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of attorney appearance for Crum & Forster by E. Charles Dann, Jr. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 10/29/1998, Entered: 10/30/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of attorney appearance for Crum & Forster by Everett Charles Dann Jr. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 9/18/1998, Entered: 9/23/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER "ADVISING" counsel to submit a suggested new schedule no later than 10/30/98 (signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 9/18/98) (c/m 9/18/98 skp) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 9/18/1998, Entered: 9/23/1998 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                  LETTER/MOTION by East Coast to Amend [17-1] Scheduling order (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 9/17/1998, Entered: 9/17/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of attorney appearance for East Coast by K. Donald Proctor, Jeffrey W. Cottle (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 9/15/1998, Entered: 9/16/1998, Terminated: 9/15/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying without prejudice [18-1] motion to Extend the Scheduling Order to allow plaintiff to obtain counsel; a further request should local counsel be employed within 30 days from today ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 9/15/98) (c/m 9/15/98 skp) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 9/15/1998, Entered: 9/16/1998, Terminated: 9/15/1998 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION by Alan Utz to Extend the Scheduling Order to allow plaintiff to obtain counsel (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: 9/4/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 9/4/98 ) (c/m by chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 9/1/1998, Entered: 9/1/1998 Correspondence
                                                                                                                                            CORRESPONDENCE/Local Rule 101 mailed re: transfer in. (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/1/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER, changing venue to the USDC for the District of Maryland All other relief request is denied (signed this 24th day of August, 1998 by Judge John Hannah Jr.) cc: all parties 8/25/98 (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/1/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by Alan Utz & Assoc to [5-1] motion to Dismiss case and Affidavit (Declaration) by Alan Utz & Assoc Re: [9-1] motion response (pleadings 9 and 10 combined). (nrm, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 09/01/1998
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/1/1998 Answer
                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to original Complaint by Crum & Forster Ins (Mailed track assignment form.) (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/1/1998 Answer
                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Original Complaint by East Coast Indust subject to motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and improper venue (Mailed track assignment form.) (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/1/1998 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by East Coast Indust to Dismiss . (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/1/1998 Request for Waiver of Service
                                                                                                                                                        Notice of lawsuit and request for waiverof service of summons by Alan Utz & Assoc (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/1/1998 Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                          DEMAND for jury trial by Alan Utz & Assoc (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/1/1998 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 601211 (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/1/1998 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                                                                                                                                                              Original file consisting of pleadings 1 through 15; certified copy of order and docket sheet received from United States District of Texas, Eastern (Tyler) (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 44 times.

                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?