SourceAmerica v. U.S. Department of Education
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00893
District Judge Thomas Selby Ellis, III, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 4, 2019 at 2:41 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SourceAmerica, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department of State Hospitals

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , John P. Cooley +1 619 531 4892 +1 619 531 6005 john.cooley@sdcounty.ca.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Kevin W Alexander +1 619 696 6700 +1 619 696 7124 kalexander@gordonrees.com
, , Allen Russell Bachman +1 202 399 1009 +1 202 800 2999 abachman@gordonrees.com
Space Joseph William Goodman +1 858 793 0070 +1 858 793 0323 jgoodman@gordonrees.com
, Matthew Paul Nugent +1 619 696 6700 +1 619 696 7124 mnugent@gordonrees.com
Space Thomas R. Watson +1 619 696 6700 +1 619 696 7124 twatson@gordonrees.com
, Julia Kim Whitelock +1 202 399 1009 +1 202 800 2999 jwhitelock@gordonrees.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of RYAN Z. WATTS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Sonia Nassehzadeh Tabriz +1 202 942 6574 +1 202 942 5999 sonia.tabriz@aporter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Melissa Cross, Arnold & Porter LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Robert Adam DeRise +1 202 942 6029 +1 202 942 5999 robert.derise@apks.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Amy P Lally +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 alally@sidley.com
, John W. Treece +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 7036 jtreece@sidley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Mason R. Winters +1 310 229 9940 +1 310 229 9901 mwinters@venable.com
DeVos, Elisabeth DeVos, Elisabeth, Defendant
Officially listed as "Betsy Devos"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Thomas D'Alessandro +1 614 469 5715 mark.dalessandro@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Lauren A. Wetzler +1 703 299 3752 +1 703 299 3983 lauren.wetzler@usdoj.gov
No Logo James Mattis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph C Dugan +1 202 514 3259 joseph.dugan@usdoj.gov
, , , Andrew Han +1 703 299 3970 andrew.han@usdoj.gov
, Kimere Jane Kimball +1 703 299 3700 kimere.kimball@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED NATHAN MICHAEL SWINTON +1 202 305 7667 +1 202 616 8470 nathan.m.swinton@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Lauren A. Wetzler +1 703 299 3752 +1 703 299 3983 lauren.wetzler@usdoj.gov
No Logo Lakeview Center, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Edward J. Beder +1 202 719 8290 ebeder@babc.com
, , , William R Purdy +1 601 592 9962 +1 601 592 1462 bpurdy@babc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Amanda Macy Lorenz +1 619 234 1700 +1 619 923 3266 alorenz@cozen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of RYAN Z. WATTS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Sonia Nassehzadeh Tabriz +1 202 942 6574 +1 202 942 5999 sonia.tabriz@aporter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Melissa Cross, Arnold & Porter LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Robert Adam DeRise +1 202 942 6029 +1 202 942 5999 robert.derise@apks.com
No Logo Ryan D. McCarthy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Evan Carmichael +1 202 514 3346 +1 202 305 2685 andrew.e.carmichael@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M. Norway +1 202 353 0527 +1 202 514 8624 Robert.M.Norway@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 06/07/2018, TERMINATED: 06/07/2018, TERMINATED: 06/07/2018, TERMINATED: 06/07/2018, TERMINATED: 06/07/2018, TERMINATED: 06/07/2018, TERMINATED: 06/07/2018 Ryan B Parker +1 202 514 4336 +1 202 616 8470 ryan.parker@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Skurnik +1 202 616 8188 +1 202 616 8470 matthew.skurnik@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Lauren A. Wetzler +1 703 299 3752 +1 703 299 3983 lauren.wetzler@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Education United States Department of Education, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowder Stewart, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth D. Crowder +1 706 434 8545 ken@crowderstewart.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Julia A. Caroff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julia A. Caroff +1 313 226 9772 +1 313 226 3800

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SEAN E MARTIN +1 503 727 1010

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space KATHLEEN LOUISE BICKERS +1 503 727 1060
Space Christopher R. Donato +1 617 748 3303 +1 617 748 3972

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cynthia J. Hyde +1 417 831 4406 +1 417 831 4511

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael James Byars +1 212 637 2793 +1 212 637 2717

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Education

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space United States department of education litigation support

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jane Elizabeth Andersen +1 410 209 4892 +1 410 962 2310 Jane.Andersen@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Katherine Tenfelde Armstrong +1 704 338 3104 Katherine.Armstrong@usdoj.gov
, , , Anjali A. Ashley +1 202 514 3368
, Annapurna Balakrishna +1 617 748 3111 annapurna.balakrishna@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jared C. Bennett +1 801 325 3259 jared.bennett@usdoj.gov
, , , , Matthew J. Berns +1 202 616 8016 +1 202 616 8470 matthew.j.berns@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Benjamin Leon Berwick +1 202 305 8573 +1 202 616 8470 benjamin.l.berwick@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , Benjamin Leon Berwick +1 202 305 8573 +1 202 616 8470 benjamin.l.berwick@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James O. Bickford +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8470 james.bickford@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James O. Bickford +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8470 james.bickford@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Karen S Bloom +1 202 514 4964 +1 202 616 8470 karen.s.bloom@usdoj.gov
Space Robert Patrick Brouillard +1 206 553 7970 +1 206 553 0114 Robert.Brouillard@usdoj.gov
, , , Michael J. Byars +1 212 225 2524 +1 212 225 3999 michael.byars@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Megan Anne Crowley +1 202 305 0754 megan.a.crowley@usdoj.gov
, Christina Fogg +1 206 553 7970 Christina.Fogg@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel J. Halainen +1 202 616 8101 daniel.j.halainen@usdoj.gov
, Jeffrey Michael Hansen +1 312 886 1325 jeffrey.hansen@usdoj.gov
, , , Ann Elizabeth Harwood +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7760 ann.harwood@usdoj.gov
, , Ameet B. Kabrawala +1 718 254 6001 +1 718 254 7489 ameet.kabrawala@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/23/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/23/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/23/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Elizabeth Lanier Kade +1 202 616 8491 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.l.kade@usdoj.gov
, Sanjay S. Karnik +1 912 201 2513 +1 912 652 4388 sanjay.karnik@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 05/31/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 05/31/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 05/31/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian G. Kennedy +1 202 514 3357 +1 202 616 8460 brian.kennedy@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , Jason Lee +1 202 514 3367 +1 202 616 8470 Jason.Lee3@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sheila Lieber +1 202 514 3259 +1 202 616 8470 sheila.lieber@usdoj.gov
Space Ellen London +1 212 637 2737 +1 212 637 2702 ellen.london@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Terrance Mebane +1 202 353 7971 terrance.a.mebane@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Charles Merritt, III +1 202 616 8098 +1 202 616 8460 robert.c.merritt@usdoj.gov
, Christine Schessler Poscablo +1 212 637 2674 +1 212 637 0033 christine.poscablo@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael P. Sady +1 617 748 3362 +1 617 748 3971 michael.sady@usdoj.gov
, , , Bahram Samie +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5788 bahram.samie@usdoj.gov
, , , Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
Space John Vagelatos +1 718 254 6182 +1 718 254 7489 john.vagelatos@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Lauren A. Wetzler +1 703 299 3752 +1 703 299 3983 lauren.wetzler@usdoj.gov
, Caroline Lewis Wolverton +1 202 965 6570 +1 202 616 8202 caroline.lewis-wolverton@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Department of the Army, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Poyner & Spruill LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Keith Harrison Johnson +1 919 783 1013 +1 919 783 1075 kjohnson@poynerspruill.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Eric B. Beckenhauer +1 202 514 3338 +1 202 616 8470 eric.beckenhauer@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Brigham John Bowen +1 202 514 6289 +1 202 616 8470 Brigham.Bowen@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gary Daniel Feldon +1 202 514 4686 +1 202 616 8460 Gary.D.Feldon@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joshua Edward Gardner +1 202 305 7583 +1 202 307 0972 joshua.e.gardner@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kimberly Lynn Herb +1 202 305 8356 +1 202 616 8470 kimberly.l.herb@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , Judson Owen Littleton +1 202 305 8714 +1 202 616 8470 Judson.O.Littleton@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , Romney Sharpe Philpott +1 202 305 0258 romney.philpott@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , C. Scott Spear +1 202 305 1593 +1 202 514 8865 scott.spear@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Ray Stone, Sr. +1 202 616 4291 +1 202 616 5200 richard.stone@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , Ruth Ann Storey +1 202 305 0493 +1 202 305 0506 ruth.ann.storey@usdoj.gov
, Leigh Aaron Wasserstrom +1 212 637 3274 +1 212 637 2686 leigh.wasserstrom@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Tyler Guy Welti +1 202 305 0481 tyler.welti@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Lauren A. Wetzler +1 703 299 3752 +1 703 299 3983 lauren.wetzler@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , Caroline Lewis Wolverton +1 202 965 6570 +1 202 616 8202 caroline.lewis-wolverton@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Department of the Defense, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Lauren A. Wetzler +1 703 299 3752 +1 703 299 3983 lauren.wetzler@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 702
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
  Entries (97) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Response to 83 NOTICE, of Recent Decision filed by Lakeview Center, Inc., SourceAmerica. (Tabriz, Sonia) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Response to 83 NOTICE, Intervenor's Response to Notice of Recent Decision filed by State of Kansas, by and through the Kansas Department for Children and Families. (Mook, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE by Betsy Devos, James Mattis, Ryan D. McCarthy, United States Department of Education, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Defense (of Recent Decision) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Memorandum in Support re 70 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Supplemental) filed by Betsy Devos, James Mattis, Ryan D. McCarthy, United States Department of Education, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Defense. (Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Brief in Support to 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment Addressing Secretary of Education Letter filed by Lakeview Center, Inc., SourceAmerica. (Tabriz, Sonia) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Response to 75 Reply to Response to Motion, Brief Addressing Letter of Secretary DeVos filed by State of Kansas, by and through the Kansas Department for Children and Families. (Mook, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 10/12/2018, before Judge T.S. Ellis, Court Reporter/Transcriber Tonia Harris, Telephone number 703-646-1438. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2019.(harris, tonia) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER accordingly, and for good cause, the Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment (docs. 66 and 70 ) are taken under advisement; the parties may, and the government must, file briefs not more than ten (10) pages in length address the Secretary DeVos's letter by close of business on Thursday, October 18, 2018. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 10/12/2018. (mpha) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III:Motion Hearing held on 10/12/2018 re: Plaintiffs' Motion 66 for Summary Judgment and Defendants' Cross Motion 70 for Summary Judgment. Sonia N. Tabriz and Craig A. Holman present on behalf of plaintiffs. Lauren A. Wetzler and James C. Luh present on behalf of defendants. Jonathan R. Mook and Peter A. Nolan present on behalf of intervenor. Matters briefed, argued, and taken under advisement. Counsel for the government (J. Luh) to submit a pleading representing to the Court that the Secretary of the Department of Education agrees w/ the position the government is now taking (that RSA does not apply). Parties given until Thursday to file further briefs re: letter (not to exceed 10 pages). Order to follow. (Court Reporter Tonia Harris)(mpha) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by State of Kansas, by and through the Kansas Department for Children and Families. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Mook, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 70 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Betsy Devos, James Mattis, Ryan D. McCarthy, United States Department of Education, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Defense. (Wetzler, Lauren) Modified to correct filers on 10/9/2018 (dvanm, ). (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment, RESPONSE in Opposition to Defendants' and Intervenor's Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Lakeview Center, Inc., SourceAmerica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-L)(Tabriz, Sonia) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Memorandum in Opposition re 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Betsy Devos, James Mattis, Ryan D. McCarthy, United States Department of Education, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Defense. (Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Notice of Hearing Date set for 10/12/18 re 70 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment, 71 Memorandum in Support, (Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Memorandum in Support re 70 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Betsy Devos, James Mattis, Ryan D. McCarthy, United States Department of Education, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Defense. (Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by Betsy Devos, James Mattis, Ryan D. McCarthy, United States Department of Education, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Defense. (Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs filed by State of Kansas, by and through the Kansas Department for Children and Families. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Proposed Order)(Mook, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Notice of Hearing Date set for October 12, 2018 re 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Tabriz, Sonia) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Memorandum in Support re 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lakeview Center, Inc., SourceAmerica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-I)(Tabriz, Sonia) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by Lakeview Center, Inc., SourceAmerica. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tabriz, Sonia) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 6/28/2018, before Judge T.S. Ellis, Court Reporter/Transcriber Tonia Harris, Telephone number 703-646-1438. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/4/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/2/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2018.(harris, tonia) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 6/28/2018, before Judge T.S. Ellis, Court Reporter/Transcriber Tonia Harris, Telephone number 703-646-1438. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 8/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/1/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2018.(harris, tonia) (Main Document 64 replaced on 8/2/2018) (dvanm, ). (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting 62 Motion new briefing schedule and extension of page limits. ORDERED that the parties shall adhere to the following schedule: a. On or before August 3, 2018, Plaintiffs shall file their motion for summary judgment (or other relief disposing of this case). b. On or before September 10, 2018, Defendants and Intervenor shall each file their own cross-motion for summary judgment (or other relief disposing of this case) and shall each file a single memorandum of law both in support of their own cross-motion and in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment. c. On or before September 24, 2018, Plaintiffs shall file a single memorandum of law containing reply arguments in support of their own motion for summary judgment and in opposition to Defendants' and Intervenor's cross-motions for summary judgment. d. On or before October 9, 2018, Defendants and Intervenor shall each file a memorandum of law containing reply arguments in support of their own cross-motions for summary judgment. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 07/16/2018. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Joint MOTION for New Briefing Schedule and Extension of Page Limits by Lakeview Center, Inc., SourceAmerica. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tabriz, Sonia) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER denying 36 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 07/05/2018. (see Order for further details) (dvanm, ) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III:Motion Hearing held on 6/28/2018 re 36 MOTION Motion to Supplement Administrative Record filed by SourceAmerica, Lakeview Center, Inc. Counsel enter their appearance and present arguments. Court takes matter under advisement. (Court Reporter T. Harris.)(awac, ) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      DOCKETED IN INCORRECT CASE Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III:Motion Hearing held on 6/28/2018 re 36 MOTION Motion to Supplement Administrative Record filed by SourceAmerica, Lakeview Center, Inc.. Counsel enter their appearances and present arguments. Court takes matter under advisement. Court is going to speak to Judge Nachmanoff regarding mediation. (Court Reporter T. Harris.)(awac, ) Modified on 7/2/2018 (awac, ). (Entered: 06/28/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 56 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robert Adam DeRise terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 06/04/2018. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 55 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 06/01/2018. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Lakeview Center, Inc., SourceAmerica. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(DeRise, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter Andrew Nolan and Certification of Local Counsel Jonathan R. Mook Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6108069. by State of Kansas, by and through the Kansas Department for Children and Families. (Mook, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Reply to Motion re 36 MOTION Motion to Supplement Administrative Record filed by Lakeview Center, Inc., SourceAmerica. (DeRise, Robert) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Waiver of re 52 MOTION to Continue Hearing Date Hearing Date by Lakeview Center, Inc., SourceAmerica (DeRise, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION to Continue Hearing Date by Lakeview Center, Inc., SourceAmerica. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(DeRise, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 45 Motion to Intervene. It is fur1her ORDERED that the requirement that Kansas formally answer the plaintiff's complaint is WAIVED. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 05/22/2018. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 45 MOTION to Intervene filed by Lakeview Center, Inc., SourceAmerica. (DeRise, Robert) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition re 36 MOTION Motion to Supplement Administrative Record filed by Betsy Devos, James Mattis, Ryan D. McCarthy, United States Department of Education, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Defense. (Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE by Betsy Devos, James Mattis, Ryan D. McCarthy, United States Department of Education, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Defense Regarding Filing of Supplement to Administrative Record (Attachments: # 1 Certification, Index, Supplement Part I, # 2 Supplement Part II, # 3 Supplement Part III)(Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Waiver of re 45 MOTION to Intervene Waiver of Oral Argument by State of Kansas, by and through the Kansas Department for Children and Families (Genti, Jayna) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Brief in Support to 45 MOTION to Intervene filed by State of Kansas, by and through the Kansas Department for Children and Families. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Genti, Jayna) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MOTION to Intervene by State of Kansas, by and through the Kansas Department for Children and Families. (Genti, Jayna) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Waiver of re 42 MOTION to Intervene Waiver of Oral Argument by State of Kansas, by and through the Kansas Department for Children and Families (Genti, Jayna) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Memorandum in Support re 42 MOTION to Intervene filed by State of Kansas, by and through the Kansas Department for Children and Families. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Genti, Jayna) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MOTION to Intervene by State of Kansas, by and through the Kansas Department for Children and Families. (Genti, Jayna) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Jayna Genti on behalf of State of Kansas, by and through the Kansas Department for Children and Families (Genti, Jayna) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 39 Motion to Stay. The April 3, 2018 briefing schedule for summary judgment is STAYED, pending briefing on and resolution of plaintiffs' motion to supplement the administrative record 36 . It is further ORDERED that following the resolution of the plaintiffs' motion to supplement the administrative record, the parties shall meet and confer to propose a new briefing schedule. The parties shall jointly file the new proposed briefing schedule for the Court's consideration no later than seven days after resolution of plaintiffs' motion. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 05/17/2018. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              MOTION to Stay re 31 Order on Motion to Vacate, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Lakeview Center, Inc., SourceAmerica. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(DeRise, Robert) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Notice of Hearing Date re 36 MOTION Motion to Supplement Administrative Record (DeRise, Robert) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support re 36 MOTION Motion to Supplement Administrative Record filed by Lakeview Center, Inc., SourceAmerica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(DeRise, Robert) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 03/23/2018. (dvanm, )
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      MOTION Motion to Supplement Administrative Record by Lakeview Center, Inc., SourceAmerica. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(DeRise, Robert) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER The matter came before the Court on defendant's motion to dismiss 13 . For the reasons stated from the bench, and for good cause shown, defendants' motion is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/08/2017. (mpha) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE by Betsy Devos, James Mattis, Ryan D. McCarthy, United States Department of Education, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Defense of Submission of Fourth Installment of Administrative Record (Attachments: # 1 AR Part 10, # 2 AR Part 11, # 3 AR Part 12)(Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III: Motion Hearing held on 12/8/2017 re: Defendants' mtoion 13 to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Sonia N. Tabriz, Robert A. DeRise, and Craig A. Holman present on behalf of plaintiffs. Lauren A. Wetzler, Julie Straus Harris, and James C. Luh present on behalf of defendants. Matters briefed, argued, and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Tonia Harris)(mpha) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE by Betsy Devos, James Mattis, Ryan D. McCarthy, United States Department of Education, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Defense of Submission of Third Installment of Administrative Record (Attachments: # 1 AR Part 7, # 2 AR Part 8, # 3 AR Part 9)(Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Adam DeRise on behalf of Lakeview Center, Inc., SourceAmerica (DeRise, Robert) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Betsy Devos, James Mattis, Ryan D. McCarthy, United States Department of Education, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Defense of Submission of Second Istallment of Administrative Record (Attachments: # 1 AR Part 4, # 2 AR Part 5, # 3 AR Part 6)(Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Response to 20 Reply filed by Betsy Devos, James Mattis, Ryan D. McCarthy, United States Department of Education, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Defense. (Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Betsy Devos, James Mattis, Ryan D. McCarthy, United States Department of Education, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Defense of Filing Administrative Record (Attachments: # 1 Certification, Index, AR Part 1, # 2 AR Part 2, # 3 AR Part 3)(Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Reply to 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Surreply filed by Lakeview Center, Inc., SourceAmerica. (Tabriz, Sonia) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 29 Motion to Vacate ; granting 30 Motion for a Revised Briefing Schedule. See Order for Revised Briefing Schedule. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 04/03/2018. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to File insofar as the surreply may address only the Block case and 1he new argument related to ?? 555(b) of the APA. Defendants may file a response to the surreply by 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, December 5, 2017. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 11/28/2017. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule by Betsy Devos, James Mattis, Ryan D. McCarthy, United States Department of Education, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Defense. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Vacate 28 Scheduling Order,, by Betsy Devos, James Mattis, Ryan D. McCarthy, United States Department of Education, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Defense. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2018 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Discovery due by 6/25/2018. Final Pretrial Conference (if no pretrial motions filed) set for 7/12/2018 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. Final Pretrial Conference (if pretrial motions filed) set for 9/6/2018 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III.Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 03/23/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form, # 2 Pretrial Notice)(mpha) Modified on 3/26/2018 (mpha, ). (Entered: 03/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. It must be GRANTED with respect to counts VI and VII. It is DENIED in all other respects.. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 03/23/2018. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Lakeview Center, Inc., SourceAmerica. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Surreply in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Notice of Hearing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Tabriz, Sonia) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Betsy Devos, James Mattis, Ryan D. McCarthy, United States Department of Education, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Defense. (Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 12/8/2017, before Judge T.S. Ellis, Court Reporter/Transcriber Tonia Harris, Telephone number 703-646-1438. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 3/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/22/2018.(harris, tonia) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lakeview Center, Inc., SourceAmerica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tabriz, Sonia) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Notice of Hearing Date re 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 14 Memorandum in Support, (Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Support re 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Betsy Devos, James Mattis, Ryan D. McCarthy, United States Department of Education, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Defense. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Betsy Devos, James Mattis, Ryan D. McCarthy, United States Department of Education, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Defense. (Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - For the reasons stated in Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED; and it is fur1her ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to the Complaint by October 30. 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 10/02/2017. (lgue, ) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Betsy Devos, James Mattis, Ryan D. McCarthy, United States Department of Education, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Defense. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren A. Wetzler on behalf of Betsy Devos, James Mattis, Ryan D. McCarthy, United States Department of Education, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Defense (Wetzler, Lauren) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 8 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 09/06/2017. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Craig Alan Holman and Certification of Local Counsel Sonia Tabriz Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5691342. by Lakeview Center, Inc., SourceAmerica. (Tabriz, Sonia) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by SourceAmerica, Lakeview Center, Inc. Betsy Devos served 08/09/2017; Ryan D. McCarthy served 08/15/2017; United States Dept. of Education served 08/09/2017; United States Dept. of the Army served 08/15/2017; U.S. Attorney General served 08/09/2017. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by SourceAmerica, Lakeview Center, Inc.. James Mattis served on 8/9/2017, answer due 10/10/2017; United States Department of the Defense served on 8/9/2017, answer due 10/10/2017. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Betsy Devos, James Mattis, Ryan D. McCarthy, United States Department of Education, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Defense, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Notice)(dvanm, ) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Summons by Lakeview Center, Inc., SourceAmerica. (Tabriz, Sonia) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Lakeview Center, Inc.. (acha, ) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by SourceAmerica. (acha, ) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Betsy Devos, James Mattis, Ryan D. McCarthy, United States Department of Education, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Defense ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-5651569.), filed by SourceAmerica, Lakeview Center, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-J, # 2 Exhibit K-N, # 3 Exhibit O-U, # 4 Exhibit V1, # 5 Exhibit V2, # 6 Exhibit W-X, # 7 Exhibit Y-BB, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(acha, ). (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            Set Deadlines as to 70 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (klau, )
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            ***Deadlines terminated: Per TSE chambers, FPTC previously set for 9/13/2018 @ 4:00PM removed from docket - and to be set after the motions for S/J on 10/12 if necessary. (mpha)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Hearings: Per TSE chambers, Final Pretrial Conference reset for 9/13/2018 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (mpha)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines as to 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Per TSE chambers, Motion Hearing 36 reset for 6/28/2018 at 01:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (mpha)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Correction re 43 Memorandum in Support, 42 MOTION to Intervene, 44 Waiver of Hearing. The signature block on the document does not match the user's login. The filing user has been notified and has been asked to either refile the document or to have the attorney whose signature block appears on the document refile the document. (dvanm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Correction re 39 MOTION to Stay re 31 Order on Motion to Vacate, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (dvanm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines as to 36 MOTION Motion to Supplement Administrative Record . Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Set Deadlines as to 18 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Per TSE chambers, Motion Hearing previously set for 12/1/2017 @ 10:00AM reset for 12/8/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (mpha)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines as to 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Case Reassigned to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III. District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema no longer assigned to the case. (rban, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 47 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?