Echostar Satellite L.L.C. v. Gresler
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-00241-WYD-PAC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 15, 2018 at 11:04 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 1201
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER finding as moot 6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; Consent Motion for Entry of Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction (filed February 1, 2006) is GRANTED. In accordance therewith, it is ORDERED that a Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction is issued separately today. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed April 22, 2005, is DENIED AS MOOT. Finally, it is ORDERED that in light of the parties' settlement and the Final Judgment issued today, this case is DISMISSED, subject to the provision in the Final Judgment that the Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/1/06. (erv, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER re: 6 Dfts MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; Plaintiffs shall file a supplement to their response to the motion to dismiss that addresses this discovery and the impact on personal jurisdiction on or before February 3, 2006. If Plain tiffs have not undertaken discovery on the issue of personal jurisdiction, Plaintiffs shall provide an explanation as to why they have not pursued such discovery. The parties shall also address whether there is any reason the Court should not rule on the motion to dismiss as currently submitted. by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/24/06. (erv, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER, Set Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2005 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan,Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan on 7/13/05. (erv, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 0 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?