PCT International Incorporated v. Holland Electronics LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-01797-JAT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 5:17 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 447 Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Review of Judgment on Taxation of Costs. The Clerk of Court shall enter $524.10 in taxable costs to Plaintiff and against Defendant. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/8/16.(LSP)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER granting 449 PCTs motion for $32,561.94 in supplemental damages. The Clerk of Court shall issue judgment in this amount in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant. (This is a supplemental judgment and does not amend or in any way impact the original judgment). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 03-30-16.(GAR)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. ORDERED AND ADJUDGED AS FOLLOWS: As found by the jury and the Court in this case, Plaintiff PCT International Incorporated prevailed on its infringement claim against Defendant Holland Electronics LLC. Accordingl y, for the reasons set forth in the Court's contemporaneously filed Order: Judgment is entered in favor of PCT International Incorporated and against Holland Electronics LLC in the amount of $576,027.53. Permanent Injunction - See Judgment for Details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/8/15. (MAP)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER AND FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW granting 396 Motion to Supplement the Record. FURTHER ORDERED that Doc. 396-1 and Doc. 396-2 are true and correct copies of the documents referenced in page 2050, lines 14-15 of the trial transc ript. FURTHER ORDERED denying 406 Motion for Entry ofJudgement [sic], Findings of Fact, and Conclusions of Law Regarding Laches andEquitable Estoppel. FURTHER ORDERED denying 408 Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding the Numbe r of Infringing Units and Amount of Damages; (2) Infringement; (3) Invalidity for Anticipation or Obviousness; (4) Invalidity for Indefiniteness, and (5) Extraterritoriality. FURTHER ORDERED granting/denying in part Motion for an Accounting for Roya lties Due Through Entry of Judgment, Prejudgment Interest, and Postjudgment Interest. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer (either inperson or telephonically) within ten days from the date of this Order to agree upon an accounting of infringing units sold by Holland for the period from February 26, 2015 through the date of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED granting 404 Motion for Permanent Injunction. See Order for Full Details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/8/15. (MAP)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER, that Defendant's Application for Attorneys' Fees Re: Sanctions Awarded in Conjunction with Defendant's Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Trial Subpoenas (Doc. 356 ) is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED awarding Holland Electronics, LLC $6,463.50 in attorneys' fees. (See document for details.) Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 07/21/2015. (ATD)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER that Defendant's 222 Motion for Sanctions is denied. Defendant's 223 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's 260 Motion for Leave to File Non-Electronic Exhibit is d enied. ORDERED the Clerk of the Court shall return to PCT the non-electronic exhibit known as "Exhibit 26." Plaintiff's 229 Motion to Exclude is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's 233 Motion to Exclude is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's 237 Motion to Exclude is denied without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/2/2015.(LFIG)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER granting/denying in part 216 PCT's Renewed Motion to Under Seal Certain Documents FURTHER ORDERED See Order for Complete List of Documents Allowed to be Filed Under Seal. FURTHER ORDERED granting /denying in part 214 Holland's R evised Motion to File Under Seal. FURTHER ORDERED that Holland may file under seal as needed the following documents that Holland has lodged under seal as exhibits to the Shaw Declaration (Doc. 214-1): (1) Exhibit 1; (2) Exhibit 2; (3) Exhibit 3; (4 ) Exhibit 5; (5) Exhibit 6; (6) Exhibit 9; and (7) Exhibit 10. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties may, on or before 12/1/14, file the following motions: (1) PCT's motion to exclude the expert opinion of David A. Haas; (2) PCT's motion to exclude the expert opinion of Daniel J. Whittle; and (3) Holland's motion for summary judgment (alternatively, for partial summary judgment and to preclude any theory of indirect infringement for lack of disclosure). Any responses are due 12/8/14. Any replies are due 12/15/14. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 11/18/14.(MAP)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER denying the 156 , 183 , 192 , 165 , 195 , 170 , 160 , 164 , 200 and 209 Motions to Seal. ORDERED striking Docs. 158 , 184 , 185 , 193 , 168 , 196 , 171 , 161 , 162 , 166 , 201 , 202 , 191 and 210 . These documen ts shall remain under seal. ORDERED denying without prejudice and striking the 157 , 169 and 175 Motions. ORDERED striking Docs. 159 , 167 , 172 , 173 , 174 , 176 , 187 , 188 , 189 , 190 , 194 , 197 , 203 , 204 , 207 , [20 8] and 211 . ORDERED denying the 163 , 186 Stipulations and the 182 , 206 Notices but the documents to which these documents refer shall remain under seal as indicated above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with the Court's procedure as set forth in this Order concerning the filing of motions to file under seal. The parties shall file their respective motions to file under seal within fourteen days from the date of this Order, with any responses due within the time period prescribed by Local Rule 7.2(c). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/23/2014.(LFIG)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting PCT's Motion to File Under Seal its Reply in Support of Motion to Modify the Protective Order (Doc. 151 ). The Clerk of the Court shall file under seal PCT's Reply in Support of Motion to Modify the Protect ive Order, currently lodged as Doc. 153 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED striking Non-Parties eGtran Corporation and EZconn Corporation's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff PCT International, Inc.'sMotion to Modify the Protective Order for Confidential Information (Doc. 143 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying PCT's Motion to Modify the Protective Order for Confidential Information (Doc. 138 ). (See document for full details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/3/14. (LAD)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER that PCT's 137 Motion to File Under Seal is denied without prejudice (Doc. 139 to remain sealed). ORDERED that the November 7, 2013 hearing transcript is unsealed except for lines 7-15 on page 46 (Doc. 135 is to remain sealed). ORDERED that Holland shall within five days file a redacted copy of the November 7, 2013 hearing transcript that redacts only lines 7-15 on page 46. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that PCT's Motion to Modify the Protective Order for Confidential Info rmation lodged at Doc. 139 is stricken but remains sealed. PCT may within five days refile its Motion if it believes that either a new redacted or sealed version is necessary for the Court's ruling. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/30/2014.(LFIG)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting Plaintiff's 125 Motion to Unseal Hearing. ORDERED that, for the limited purpose of obtaining a complete copy of the November 7, 2013 hearing transcript for Plaintiff's outside counsel, the hearing transcript is unsealed only for transcription by the court reporter. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/19/2014. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER that the claims are construed under Markman v. Westview Instruments, Inc., 517 U.S. 370 (1996) as specified in this Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/21/2014. (LFIG)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER that Plaintiff's 28 Motion to Disqualify Counsel is denied. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/7/2013.(LFIG)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 8 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?