ROMAN v. WHITAKER
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-04947

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 20, 2019 at 11:22 PM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MATTHEW ROMAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JESSE M. HARRIS +1 215 299 2864 jesseharris@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOSHUA HORN +1 215 299 2184 +1 215 299 2150 jhorn@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph A McNelis, III +1 610 397 2332 jmcnelis@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sacks & Weston, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John K. Weston +1 215 925 8200 +1 215 925 0508 jweston@sackslaw.com
v.
No Logo CHRISTOPHER WRAY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MATTHEW E.K. HOWATT +1 215 861 8335 Matthew.Howatt@usdoj.gov
No Logo MATTHEW WHITAKER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MATTHEW E.K. HOWATT +1 215 861 8335 Matthew.Howatt@usdoj.gov
No Logo THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MATTHEW E.K. HOWATT +1 215 861 8335 Matthew.Howatt@usdoj.gov
No Logo THOMAS E. BRANDON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MATTHEW E.K. HOWATT +1 215 861 8335 Matthew.Howatt@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Order Setting Answer Deadline
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: 1/3/2019 Unknown Document Type
                        AFFIDAVIT of Service by Brian P. Drach re: served Summons and Complaint upon Thomas E. Brandon by certified mail on 12/18/2018 (WESTON, JOHN)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Order
                            STIPULATED ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS NO LATER THAN 2/14/19. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE ANY OPPOSITION NO LATER THAN 3/18/19. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE ANY REPLY NO LATER THAN 4/1/19. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/20/18. 12/21/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jpd, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Order
                                ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MEMORANDUM OF LAW WXCEEDING FIFTEEN (15) PAGES IS GRATNED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/20/18. 12/21/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jpd, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                  MOTION for Leave to File Memoranda of Law Exceeding Fifteen Pages (Uncontested) filed by THOMAS E. BRANDON, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, MATTHEW WHITAKER, CHRISTOPHER WRAY.Memorandum, Certificate of Uncontested Motion and Service.(HOWATT, MATTHEW)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: 12/19/2018 Notice of appearance
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by JESSE M. HARRIS on behalf of MATTHEW ROMAN with 12/19/2018(HARRIS, JESSE)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Notice of appearance
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH A. MCNELIS, III on behalf of MATTHEW ROMAN (MCNELIS, JOSEPH)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Notice of appearance
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA HORN on behalf of MATTHEW ROMAN (HORN, JOSHUA)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: 11/16/2018 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney
                                          Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (jl, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT against THOMAS E. BRANDON, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, MATTHEW WHITAKER, CHRISTOPHER WRAY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 187986.), filed by MATTHEW ROMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Case Management Track Form, # 3 Designation Form)(jwl, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued as to USA
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Summons Issued as to THOMAS E. BRANDON, MATTHEW WHITAKER, CHRISTOPHER WRAY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Four Forwarded To: Counsel on 11/16/18, One given to AUSA (jwl, )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?