Rogers v. Montgomery County, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-02599-WMN
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Reid R. Rogers, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Attorney Grievance Commission of Maryland, Defendant
No Logo Commission on Judicial Disabilities, Defendant
No Logo Frederick County Circuit Court, Defendant
No Logo Investigative Counsel, Defendant
No Logo James Dobson, Defendant
No Logo COURTHOUSE, Defendant
Officially listed as "Montgomery County"
No Logo Rush Limbaugh, Defendant
Attributes
Office Baltimore
Filed 8/3/1998
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $50000000
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Prince George's
Terminated 8/18/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 98-2281(CaseMgr.Pamela[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
Timeline
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/2/1998, Entered: 9/4/1998 USCA Case Number
USCA Case Number Re: [8-1] appeal by Reid R. Rogers USCA NUMBER: 98-2281 (Case Mgr. Pamela Stump) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/27/1998, Entered: 8/27/1998 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
Certified and transmitted record on appeal to U.S. Court of Appeals: [8-1] appeal by Reid R. Rogers. (One Volume): (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/27/1998, Entered: 8/27/1998 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [8-1] appeal by Reid R. Rogers. (copies mailed). (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 8/24/1998, Entered: 8/27/1998 Notice of Appeal
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Reid R. Rogers. Fee Status: In forma pauperis: (See paper #7). Appeal record due on 9/23/98. (c/s). (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 8/18/1998, Entered: 8/19/1998 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [2-1] motion of plaintiff to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; "DISMISSING" this action pursuant to 28USC1915(3); "DIRECTING" Clerk to close case ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 8/18/98) (c/m 8/18/98 mjl) (MICROFILMED 8/18/98) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 8/18/1998, Entered: 8/19/1998 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 8/18/98) (c/m 8/18/98 mjl) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/18/1998, Entered: 8/19/1998 Terminated Case
Case closed (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 8/17/1998, Entered: 8/19/1998 Correspondence
CORRESPONDENCE by Reid R. Rogers RE: Location of case (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 8/10/1998, Entered: 8/19/1998 Summons Returned Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Attorney Grievance 8/5/98 (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 8/10/1998, Entered: 8/19/1998 Summons Returned Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Montgomery County, Circuit Court, Judicial Disabilitie 8/4/98 (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 8/3/1998, Entered: 8/5/1998, Terminated: 8/18/1998 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
MOTION by Reid R. Rogers to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (lad, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 8/3/1998, Entered: 8/5/1998 Complaint
Denial of Due Process of Law (lad, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 1/4/1998, Entered: 1/6/1999 USCA Mandate
JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) "AFFIRMING" the judgment of the District Court, copy of opinion attached hereto. Re: [8-1] appeal by Reid R. Rogers (c/s) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 10 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?