Pioneer Financial Llc v. Victor H. Estrada
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2004-1-CV-016463

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 16, 2018 at 11:26 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pioneer Financial LLC, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Estrada, Victor Hugo, Defendant
Case Type Other Collections Limited (09) - under 10,000
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 6/17/2017, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment issued
    Blank 16 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Notice: Renewal of Judgment
    Issued 07/02/14; Legacy Name = CV Ntc Returned/Renewal of Jgmt; Decision = M; Closed = 08/27/2014
      Blank 15 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Proof of Service
      CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 08/27/2014
        Blank 14 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Notice: Renewal of Judgment Issued
        CV Ntc:Renewal of Judgment Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 07/02/2014
          Blank 13 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Application: Renewal Judgment
          $4900.90; Legacy Name = CV Appl for Renewal of Jgmt; Decision = M; Closed = 07/02/2014
            Blank 12 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Memorandum Of Costs
            interest $2424.09; Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt; Decision = M; Closed = 07/02/2014
              Blank 11 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
              CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 07/02/2014
                Blank 10 Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment issued
                Abstract of Judgment; Decision = M; Closed = 09/14/2004
                  Blank 9 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: None Judgment Default
                  By Clerk, $2,446.81; Legacy Name = Default Jgmt; Decision = M; Closed = 08/20/2004
                    Blank 8 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: None Request Dismissal
                    as to Does 1 - 10 only, without prejudice; Legacy Name = Req: Dismissal/Partial; Decision = M; Closed = 08/20/2004
                      Blank 7 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: None Request-Enter Default
                      Entered; Legacy Name = CV Req: Entry of Default; Decision = M; Closed = 08/20/2004
                        Blank 6 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: None Declaration
                        Re Unavailability of Original Instrument; Computation of Interest;CCP 1033; cc1717; Legacy Name = Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 06/24/2004
                          Blank 5 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: None Request-Enter Default
                          Entered; Legacy Name = Request for Entry of Default; Decision = M; Closed = 06/24/2004
                            Blank 4 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                            Summons Returned No POS; Decision = M; Closed = 06/24/2004
                              Blank 3 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                              Proof of Service/Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 04/15/2004
                                Blank 2 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: None Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K
                                Complaint Filed; Summs Iss under $10k; Decision = M; Closed = 03/22/2004
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                  Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 03/22/2004

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?