Pioneer Financial Llc v. Allison R. Kirby
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2004-1-CV-016466

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 16, 2018 at 11:26 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pioneer Financial LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson & Kennard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Scott Kennard , +1 916 920 2295 +1 916 920 0682 rskennard@nelson-kennard.com
v.
No Logo Kirby, Allison R, Defendant
Case Type Other Collections Limited (09) - under 10,000
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 28 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Writ: Execution (Filed)
Sacramento. Issued: 1/26/15. Partial, Deficit: $693.08
    Blank 27 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Writ: Execution (Filed)
    Sacramento / $1384.89; Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 01/29/2015
      Blank 26 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Memorandum Of Costs
      credit: $3679.98 / interest $682.20; Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt; Decision = M; Closed = 01/29/2015
        Blank 25 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Writ: Execution (Filed)
        3-13-13; Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Retn/Unsatis; Decision = M; Closed = 01/07/2015
          Blank 24 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Writ: Execution (Filed)
          Los Angeles 3/13/13 credit: $3822.16 deficit: $4260.00; Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Retn/Partial Satis; Decision = M; Closed = 08/20/2014
            Blank 23 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None Notice: Renewal of Judgment
            CV Ntc Returned/Renewal of Jgmt; Decision = M; Closed = 07/09/2014
              Blank 22 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Notice: Renewal of Judgment Issued
              CV Ntc:Renewal of Judgment Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 06/02/2014
                Blank 21 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Application: Renewal Judgment
                $4357.67; Legacy Name = CV Appl for Renewal of Jgmt; Decision = M; Closed = 06/02/2014
                  Blank 20 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                  CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 06/02/2014
                    Blank 19 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Memorandum Of Costs
                    costs $189.50 / credit $3666.16 / interest $3881.06 / date of mailing: 5-27-14; Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt; Decision = M; Closed = 06/02/2014
                      Blank 18 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Order: Submitted MatterCourt Filing
                      Order RE: claim of exemption is DENIED (see file for details), signed Judge Elfving.; Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter; Decision = R; Closed = 05/21/2014
                        Blank 17 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Notice: Hearing on Claim of Exemption
                        atty Riley; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Hrg on Claim of Exemption; Decision = M; Closed = 04/18/2014
                          Blank 16 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None Writ: Execution (Filed)
                          Los Angeles County; Issued 7/20/12; Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Retn/Unsatis; Decision = M; Closed = 03/21/2013
                            Blank 15 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Writ: Execution (Filed)
                            Los Angeles County $7,327.76 total judgment; Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 03/13/2013
                              Blank 14 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Memorandum Of Costs
                              costs: $55.00 interest: $3,324.49 mail: 03/07/13; Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt; Decision = M; Closed = 03/13/2013
                                Blank 13 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None Writ: Execution (Filed)
                                Los Angeles County; $7,044.85; Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 07/20/2012
                                  Blank 12 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None Memorandum Of Costs
                                  Interest: $3,096.58; Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt; Decision = M; Closed = 07/20/2012
                                    Blank 11 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment issued
                                    Abstract of Judgment; Decision = M; Closed = 08/24/2004
                                      Blank 10 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: None Judgment Default
                                      by clerk; TOTAL JDGMT - $3,923.27; Legacy Name = Default Jgmt; Decision = M; Closed = 07/30/2004
                                        Blank 9 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: None Request Dismissal
                                        as to does 1 to 10 only w.o prej; (atty Kennard); Legacy Name = Req: Dismissal/Partial; Decision = M; Closed = 07/30/2004
                                          Blank 8 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: None Declaration
                                          re unavailability of orig instrument; computation of interest; ccp 1033b2 & 1717; (atty Kennard); Legacy Name = Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 07/30/2004
                                            Blank 7 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: None Request-Enter Default
                                            *** ENTERED ***; (atty Kennard); Legacy Name = Req: Entry of Default; Decision = M; Closed = 07/30/2004
                                              Blank 6 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                              Summons Returned No POS; Decision = M; Closed = 07/30/2004
                                                Blank 5 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                Proof of Service/Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 06/14/2004
                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                  Proof of Service/Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 06/09/2004
                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                    Proof of Service/Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 06/09/2004
                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: None Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K
                                                      Complaint Filed; Summs Iss under $10k; Decision = M; Closed = 03/22/2004
                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                        Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 03/22/2004

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?