Pioneer Financial Llc v. E. Telelemariam
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2004-1-CV-022588

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 17, 2018 at 1:14 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pioneer Financial LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson & Kennard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Scott Kennard , +1 916 920 2295 +1 916 920 0682 rskennard@nelson-kennard.com
v.
No Logo Telelemariam, Elizabeth, Defendant
Case Type Other Collections Limited (09) - under 10,000
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None Writ: Execution (Filed)
Santa Clara; issued 6/5/12; $4945.49 deficit; Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Retn/Unsatis; Decision = M; Closed = 09/13/2012
    Blank 21 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
    Returning check #68020291 for $388.94. The Court does not collect on writs.; Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr; Decision = M; Closed = 08/17/2012
      Blank 20 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
      Returning check #67490408 for $385.77. The Court does not collect on writs.; Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr; Decision = M; Closed = 08/15/2012
        Blank 19 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None Writ: Execution (Issued)
        $4840.72; Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Issued to SCC; Decision = M; Closed = 06/05/2012
          Blank 18 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None Memorandum Of Costs
          ttl costs: $60; interest: $2031.30; date of mailing: 5/16/12; Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt; Decision = M; Closed = 06/05/2012
            Blank 17 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None Writ: Execution (Filed)
            Sacramento County; $4,434.40; Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 01/28/2011
              Blank 16 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None Memorandum Of Costs
              Interest: $1,684.98; DOM: 1/19/2011; Atty Nelson; Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt; Decision = M; Closed = 01/28/2011
                Blank 15 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None Writ: Execution (Filed)
                CV Writ of Exec Retn/Unsatis; Decision = M; Closed = 07/31/2008
                  Blank 14 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: None Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
                  CV Change of Atty address/Firm; Decision = M; Closed = 10/26/2006
                    Blank 13 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: None Writ: Execution (Issued)
                    $3,293.44; Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Issued to SCC; Decision = M; Closed = 10/26/2006
                      Blank 12 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: None Memorandum Of Costs
                      interest $554.02; 10-19-05; Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt; Decision = M; Closed = 10/26/2006
                        Blank 11 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None Writ: Execution (Issued)
                        Total $2,748.60; Legacy Name = Writ of Exec Issued to SCC; Decision = M; Closed = 11/24/2004
                          Blank 10 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None Memorandum Of Costs
                          Costs $0; Credit $0; Accrued Interest $17.18; Legacy Name = Memorandum/Credit/Accrued Int; Decision = M; Closed = 11/24/2004
                            Blank 9 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment issued
                            Abstract of Judgment; Decision = M; Closed = 11/08/2004
                              Blank 8 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: None Judgment Default
                              By Clerk, $2,724.42; Legacy Name = Default Jgmt; Decision = M; Closed = 10/19/2004
                                Blank 7 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None Declaration
                                Re: Unavailability of original instrument; Computation of Interest; ccp 1033; cc 1717; Legacy Name = Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 10/19/2004
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None Request Dismissal
                                  as to Does 1 - 10 only, without prejudice; Legacy Name = Req:Dismissal,Partial; Decision = M; Closed = 10/19/2004
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None Request-Enter Default
                                    Entered; Legacy Name = CV Req: Entry of Default; Decision = M; Closed = 10/19/2004
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                      Summons Returned No POS; Decision = M; Closed = 10/19/2004
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                        Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 08/27/2004
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: None Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K
                                          Complaint Filed; Summs Iss under $10k; Decision = M; Closed = 07/01/2004
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                            Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 07/01/2004

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?