Cottman v. Rubin
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-04067-BEL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Earl S. Cottman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karl W. Carter, Jr. +1 202 955 1010 +1 202 955 3131 kcarter44@hotmail.com
v.
No Logo Robert E. Rubin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by griffinleahylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea M Leahy Fucheck +1 301 572 9292 +1 301 572 9220 andrea@griffinleahylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Space Mark E. Nagle +1 202 514 7566 +1 202 514 8780
Office Baltimore
Filed 12/14/1998
Jury Demand Both
Demand $300000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Howard
Terminated 2/15/2001
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 01-1545[], 98-1576[USDC/DC-WASHINGTON]
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 72 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002 USCA Mandate
JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) AFFIRMING the judgment of the District Court, copy of opinion attached hereto, Re: [66-1] appeal by Earl S. Cottman (c/s) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 71 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: 8/29/2001 Order
    ORDER of USCA "GRANTING" appellant's motion to reinstate appeal. (c/s) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 70 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/3/2001 Order
      Attested copy of the Order of the U.S. Court of Appeals, for the Fourth Circuit "DISMISSING" the appeal, pursuant to Local Rule 45. (c/s) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 69 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/3/2001 Order
        Attested copy of the Order of the U.S. Court of Appeals, for the Fourth Circuit "DISMISSING" the appeal, pursuant to Local Rule 45. (c/s) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 68 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001 Certificate of Clerk
          Certificate of Clerk certifying record as complete for appeal purposes for [66-1] appeal by Earl S. Cottman (sls, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001 USCA Case Number
            USCA Case Number Re: [66-1] appeal by Earl S. Cottman USCA NUMBER: 01-1545 (Case Manager: Jean St. John) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/19/2001 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
              Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [66-1] appeal by Earl S. Cottman (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Legal Document 67 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/16/2001 Clerk's Order Taxing Cost
                Clerk's Order taxing costs for bill of costs, in favor of Robert E. Rubin against Earl S. Cottman in the sum of $ 146.50. (Signed: Felicia C. Cannon, 4/16/01) (c/i 4/16/01 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 66 Filed: 4/11/2001, Entered: 4/12/2001 Notice of Appeal
                  NOTICE OF APPEAL by Earl S. Cottman. Fee Status: (Filing Fee Paid) (c/s) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 65 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 Bill of Costs
                    Bill of costs with Memorandum in Support by Robert E. Rubin with Exhibit 1 A-B (c/s-Staff Attorney and Chambers) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 64 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to amend the first amended complaint; granting [41-1] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 2/15/01 ) (c/i 2/15/01) (MICROFILMED 2/15/01) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 63 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                        MEMORANDUM ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 2/15/01 ) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 Terminated Case
                          Case closed (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 62 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 Exhibit
                            Court's Exhibit list with Deposition of Christopher Sheridan (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 Motion Hearing
                              Motion hearing held before (Legg, J.) re: (Court Reporter: Richardson) (mdw, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 61 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Motion for Leave to File
                                MOTION with memorandum in support by Robert E. Rubin for Leave to Re-File Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend his First Amended Complaint or in the Alternative, Proposed Answer to Second Amended Complaint, Nunc Pro Tunc (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 60 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER RESCHEDULING Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and DENIES Defendant's Request to Strike Affidavits. Defendant may take the deposition of Epps, Sheridan and Kennan at a mutually convenient time during the month of January. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 12/6/00) (c/i 12/14/00 ms) (c/m) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 59 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [57-1] Motion of Plaintiff to Extend Time in Which to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Strike the Affidavits (signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 11/13/00) (c/i 11/15/00 ms ) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 58 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER RESCHEDULING date for Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 11/13/00) (c/i 11/15/00 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 57 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/14/2000, Terminated: 11/14/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                        MOTION with memorandum in support by Earl S. Cottman to Extend Time in Which to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Strike the Affidavit (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 56 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER SCHEDULING date for Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 11/3/00) (c/i 11/6/00 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 55 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                            REPLY by Robert E. Rubin to Plaintiff's Opposition to his [41-1] Motion for Summary Judgment with Exhibits 1 & 2 (filed Nunc Pro Tunc to 10/23/00 - per Order of Court on 10/25/00) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 54 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [53-1] motion for Leave To File Reply Motion Nunc Pro Tunc on 10/23/00. (signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 10/25/00) (c/i 10/26/00 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 53 Filed: 10/23/2000, Entered: 10/24/2000, Terminated: 10/25/2000 Motion for Leave to File
                                                MOTION by Robert E. Rubin for Leave To File Reply Motion Nunc Pro Tunc with Proposed Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Strike Affidavits Nunc Pro Tunc (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 52 Filed: 10/3/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER EXTENDING the time for defendant to file a response to plaintiff's opposition to his motion for summary judgment until 10/19/00 ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 10/2/00) (c/i 10/3/00) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 10/3/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000, Terminated: 10/3/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                    MOTION by Robert E. Rubin to Extend Time to reply to plaintiff's opposition to his motion for summary judgment (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 50 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [49-1] motion of Robert Rubin to Extend Time for defendant to reply to plaintiff's opposition to the defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment to 9/27/00 ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 9/25/00 ) (c/i 9/27/00) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 09/27/2000
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000, Terminated: 9/26/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                        MOTION by Robert E. Rubin to Extend Time for defendant to reply to plaintiff's opposition to the defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 48 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [47-1] motion to Extend Time to Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 9/8/00) (c/i 9/8/00 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000, Terminated: 9/8/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                            MOTION by Robert E. Rubin to Extend Time to Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 46 Filed: 8/29/2000, Entered: 8/29/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [45-1] motion to Extend Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 8/29/00) (c/i 8/29/00 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 8/29/2000, Entered: 8/29/2000, Terminated: 8/29/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                MOTION with memorandum in support by Earl S. Cottman to Extend Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 8/28/2000, Terminated: 2/15/2001 Response in Opposition
                                                                  RESPONSE by Earl S. Cottman in opposition to [41-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Robert E. Rubin with Statement of Material Facts to Which There is No Genuine Facts and Attachments (ATTACHMENTS FILED SEPARATELY ONLY) (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: 7/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting [41-1] Consent Motion to Extend Time for Plaintiff to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 7/14/00) (c/i 7/17/00 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/28/2000
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 42 Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: 7/17/2000, Terminated: 7/17/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                      CONSENT MOTION by Robert E. Rubin, Earl S. Cottman to Extend Time in Which to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment (mms, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/28/2000
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: 8/28/2000, Terminated: 7/17/2000 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                        MOTION with memorandum in support by Robert E. Rubin for Summary Judgment and Exhibits 1-16 (EXHIBITS ONLY FILED SEPARATELY) (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 40 Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: 6/15/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [37-1] motion of Defendant for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment Nunc Pro Tunc ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 6/13/00) (c/m 6/15/00 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 39 Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: 6/14/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [38-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment to 7/15/00 ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 6/14/00) (c/i 6/14/00) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/14/2000, Terminated: 6/14/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                              MOTION by Earl S. Cottman to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 6/6/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000, Terminated: 6/14/2000 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                MOTION by Robert E. Rubin for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment Nunc Pro Tunc and proposed motion for summary judgment (c/s) (ENTIRE PLEADING FILED SEPARATELY) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 36 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting [35-1] motion to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions (signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 6/1/00 ) (c/i 6/2/00 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/2/2000, Terminated: 6/1/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                    MOTION by Robert E. Rubin to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: 5/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [33-1] motion of Defendant to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions for fourteen (14) days. (signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 5/17/00) (c/m 5/17/00 chambers) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 5/15/2000, Entered: 5/17/2000, Terminated: 5/17/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                        MOTION by Robert E. Rubin to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 32 Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: 5/11/2000 Order
                                                                                          ORDER granting [23-1] motion of Plaintiff for Leave to File his identification of his expert witness late ( signed by Benson E. Legg 5/10/00) (c/i 5/11/00 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 31 Filed: 5/5/2000, Entered: 5/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [30-1] Letter/Motion of United States to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 5/4/00) (c/i 5/5/00 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 5/4/2000, Entered: 5/5/2000, Terminated: 5/5/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                              LETTER/MOTION by Robert E. Rubin to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Earl S. Cottman, (Answer due 3/20/00 for Robert E. Rubin ) amending [1-1] complaint (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                  MOTION with memorandum in support by Earl S. Cottman for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 27 Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: 3/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [26-1] Consent Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline until 4/15/00. All other Scheduling Order dates extended proportionately. (signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 3/3/00) (c/m 3/7/00 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: 3/7/2000, Terminated: 3/6/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                      CONSENT MOTION by Earl S. Cottman to Extend Discovery Deadline (mms, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 03/07/2000
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 2/29/2000, Entered: 3/1/2000 Correspondence
                                                                                                        CORRESPONDENCE by Court returning Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend his First Amended Complaint mailed to AUSA Fucheck. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 2/29/2000, Entered: 3/1/2000 Correspondence
                                                                                                          CORRESPONDENCE by Court returning Plaintiff's Motion to Amend his First Amended Complaint mailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 12/30/1999, Entered: 12/30/1999, Terminated: 5/10/2000 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                            MOTION by Earl S. Cottman for Leave to File his identification of his expert witness late and proposed witness list. (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/27/1999, Entered: 10/27/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 10/21/99) (c/m 10/27/99 jl) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 10/14/1999, Entered: 10/15/1999 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                ANSWER by Robert E. Rubin (Lawrence H. Summers, Department of the Treasury) (Attorney Andrea Leahy-Fucheck) to amended complaint. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 10/8/1999, Entered: 10/11/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [19-1] motion of Rubin to Extend Time to respond to amended complaint to 10 days from 10/4/99; set Answer deadline to 10/14/99 for Robert E. Rubin . ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 10/8/99) (c/m 10/12/99-dl) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 10/8/1999, Entered: 10/11/1999, Terminated: 10/8/1999 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                    MOTION by Robert E. Rubin to Extend Time to respond to amended complaint . (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/11/1999
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 10/1/1999, Entered: 10/6/1999 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                      FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Earl S. Cottman , (Answer due 10/11/99 for Robert E. Rubin ) amending [9-1] amended complaint by Earl S. Cottman (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 7/8/1999, Entered: 7/9/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of attorney appearance for Robert E. Rubin by Andrea Leahy Fucheck (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 12/15/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Correspondence
                                                                                                                          CORRESPONDENCE/LOCAL RULE 101 mailed re: transfer in. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            (CERTIFIED COPY) ORDER "GRANTING" defendant's motion to transfer case to the USDC for the District of Maryland. (signed by Judge Gladys Kessler 11/28/98) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT by Earl S. Cottman, amending [1-1] complaint and jury demand. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to U.S. Attorney. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Janet Reno, U.S. Attorney General of the United States. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Robert E. Rubin. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                      DEMAND for jury trial by Earl S. Cottman (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Complaint
                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT filed. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                                                                                                                                          Original file consisting of pleadings: 1 thru 15; certified copy of order and docket sheet received from District of Columbia (Washington). (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/15/1998
                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 54 times.

                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?