Gordon, et al v. Wiggins
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-04082-FNS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Christine Gordon, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent L Moran +1 215 423 3900 +1 215 423 3901
No Logo Scott, Gordon, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent L Moran +1 215 423 3900 +1 215 423 3901
v.
No Logo Grady O'Brian Wiggins, Defendant

Represented by hardlaw.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George C Davis +1 410 727 0828 +1 410 727 5893 george@hardlaw.net
Office Baltimore
Filed 12/14/1998
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Harford
Terminated 3/27/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 98-cv-5117[USDC PA Philadelphia]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 3/27/2000, Entered: 3/27/2000 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice and APPROVAL J. SMALKIN dated 3/27/00. (c/m & microfilmed 3/27/00) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2000, Entered: 3/27/2000 Terminated Case
    Case closed (slf, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 26 Filed: 2/15/2000, Entered: 2/15/2000 Status Report
      STATUS REPORT by Grady O'Brian Wiggins and APPROVAL J. SMALKIN dated 2/11/00. Please give me another update if case is not closed by 3/31/00. (c/m skp) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 25 Filed: 12/22/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [20-1] motion to Dismiss as to defendant Iroin Specialty d/b/a the Fire and Casualty Insurance Co. of Connecticut, no timely opposition having been filed. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 12/22/99) (c/m skp) (microfilmed 12/22/99) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 24 Filed: 12/22/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [21-1] motion of defendant to Compel Discovery; and that plaintiff shall file answer to interrogatories and a complete response to documents within 10 days from the date of this order. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 12/22/99) (c/m skp) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 23 Filed: 11/22/1999, Entered: 11/22/1999 Status Report
            STATUS REPORT by Grady O'Brian Wiggins (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 22 Filed: 11/22/1999, Entered: 11/22/1999 Status Report
              STATUS REPORT by Orion Specialty (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 21 Filed: 11/19/1999, Entered: 11/19/1999, Terminated: 12/22/1999 Motion to Compel
                MOTION by Grady O'Brian Wiggins to Compel Discovery L.R. 104.7. (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 20 Filed: 11/19/1999, Entered: 11/19/1999, Terminated: 12/22/1999 Motion to Dismiss
                  MOTION with memorandum in support by Orion Specialty to Dismiss , and for Summary Judgment (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 19 Filed: 9/9/1999, Entered: 9/9/1999, Terminated: 3/27/2000 Answer
                    ANSWER to Complaint by Orion Specialty (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 18 Filed: 9/9/1999, Entered: 9/9/1999 MemorandumCourt Filing
                      MEMORANDUM TO COUNSEL; In light of the recent intervention of Orion Specialty, I have extended the current scheduling order by 60 days. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 9/9/99) (c/m skp) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 17 Filed: 9/9/1999, Entered: 9/9/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Intervene by Orion Specialty and Intervener's answer is to be docketed. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 9/9/99) (c/m skp) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 16 Filed: 9/8/1999, Entered: 9/8/1999, Terminated: 9/9/1999 Motion to Intervene
                          MOTION to Intervene by Orion Specialty and proposed answer. (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 15 Filed: 7/7/1999, Entered: 7/7/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER, that the milestone scheduling order date is extended by 60 days. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 7/7/9) (c/m skp) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 14 Filed: 7/7/1999, Entered: 7/7/1999 Status Report
                              STATUS REPORT by Grady O'Brian Wiggins, Christine Gordon (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 13 Filed: 7/7/1999, Entered: 7/7/1999 Status Report
                                STATUS REPORT by Grady O'Brian Wiggins (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 12 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: 1/19/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Amend [10-1] Scheduling order; Discovery and Status due 7/6/99; Motions due 8/4/99 and pretrial conference on 10/6/99 at 9:30 a.m. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 1/19/99) (c/m 1/19/99) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 11 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: 1/19/1999, Terminated: 1/19/1999 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                    Letter MOTION by Scott Gordon, Christine Gordon to Amend [10-1] Scheduling order (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 10 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: 1/5/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                      SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 1/4/99) (c/m skp) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 9 Filed: 12/30/1998, Entered: 12/31/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of attorney appearance for Grady O'Brian Wiggins by George c. Davis, Esq. (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 8 Filed: 12/30/1998, Entered: 12/31/1998 Answer
                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Grady O'Brian Wiggins (Attorney George C. Davis), (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 7 Filed: 12/15/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Correspondence/Local Rule 101
                                            Correspondence/Local Rule 101 mailed re: transfer in (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 6 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER denying defendant's [3-1] motion to Dismiss Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 12 and granting plaintiffs [4-1] motion to Transfer Case to The District of Maryland (signed by Judge J. Curtis Joyner of Pennsylvaina) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 5 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Response in Opposition
                                                RESPONSE and Memorandum by plaintiffs in opposition to defendant's [3-1] motion to Dismiss Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 12 (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Motion to Transfer Case
                                                  MOTION by plaintiff to Transfer Case to The District of Maryland (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998, Terminated: 12/14/1998 Motion to Dismiss
                                                    MOTION with memorandum in support by defendant, Grady O'Brian Wiggins to Dismiss Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 12 with Exhibits A and B (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Jury Demand
                                                      DEMAND for jury trial by defendant (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                        NOTICE of attorney appearance for defendant, Grady O'Brian Wiggins (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Complaint
                                                          COMPLAINT filed; (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Summons Issued
                                                            SUMMONS(ES) issued for defendant, Grady O'Brian Wiggins (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                                                              Original file consisting of pleadings: one to six; copy of order and certified docket sheet received from USDC for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 33 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?