Bailey v. Apfel
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-03706-CCB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Harry R. Bailey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Elkind and Shea

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen F Shea +1 301 495 6665 +1 301 565 5111 sfshea@elkindshea.com
v.
No Logo Kenneth S. Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Space Nadira Clarke +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 nadira.clarke@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 11/4/1998
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 864 - Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition District Court Affirmed Decision in its Entirety
County Baltimore City
Terminated 12/2/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 00-1066[]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MAG-A
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: 9/15/2000 Order
ORDER of USCA "AWARDING" appellee costs in the amount of $48.00. (c/s) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 30 Filed: 9/14/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 USCA Mandate
    JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) "AFFIRMING" the judgment of the District Court Re: [28-1] appeal by Harry R. Bailey, copy of the opinion attached hereto. (c/s) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/27/2000, Entered: 2/9/2000 USCA Appeal Fees
      USCA appeal fees received $ 105.00 (Receipt #1163661) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 1/28/2000 USCA Case Number
        USCA Case Number Re: [28-1] appeal by Harry R. Bailey USCA NUMBER: 00-1066 (Case Manager: Yevone Jeffreys) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 29 Filed: 1/13/2000, Entered: 1/13/2000 Certificate of Clerk
          Certificate of Clerk certifying record as complete for appeal purposes for [28-1] appeal by Harry R. Bailey (sls, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 1/13/2000, Entered: 1/12/2000 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
            Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [28-1] appeal by Harry R. Bailey (sls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 01/13/2000
              LREF
              Blank 28 Filed: 1/7/2000, Entered: 1/12/2000 Notice of Appeal
              NOTICE OF APPEAL by Harry R. Bailey . Fee Status: (Filing Received Receipt #1163661) Appeal record due on 2/6/00 (c/s)(sls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/09/2000
                LREF
                Blank 27 Filed: 12/2/1999, Entered: 12/3/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [19-1] amended motion of Apfel for Summary Judgment, denying [13-1] motion of Bailey for Summary Judgment; AFFIRMING the decision of the SSA; CLOSING case. ( signed by Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar 12/2/99) (c/m 12/2/99-cw) (microfilmed 12/3/99) (das, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 26 Filed: 12/2/1999, Entered: 12/3/1999 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                  MEMORANDUM ( signed by Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar 12/2/99 ) (c/m 12/2/99-cw) (das, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 12/2/1999, Entered: 12/6/1999 Terminated Case
                    Case closed (das, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 25 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                      REPLY by Kenneth S. Apfel to response of Plaintiff to [19-1] cross-motion for Summary Judgment by Kenneth S. Apfel and to [17-1] amended cross motion for Summary Judgment by Kenneth S. Apfel. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 24 Filed: 10/27/1999, Entered: 10/28/1999 Response to Motion
                        RESPONSE by Harry R. Bailey to [19-1] amended motion of Apfel for Summary Judgment and to [17-1] motion of Apfel for Summary Judgment, and Exhibit A. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 23 Filed: 10/27/1999, Entered: 10/28/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [22-1] motion of Plaintiff to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion for summary judgment to on or before 10/27/99. ( signed by Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar 10/26/99) (c/m 10/27/99-cw ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 22 Filed: 10/27/1999, Entered: 10/28/1999, Terminated: 10/27/1999 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                            MOTION by Harry R. Bailey to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion for summary judgment . (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 21 Filed: 10/21/1999, Entered: 10/22/1999 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar for all further proceedings. (signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 10/12/99) (c/m 10/20/99-pf) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 20 Filed: 10/7/1999, Entered: 10/7/1999 Rule
                                Rule 12/56 letter mailed to parties/counsel. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 19 Filed: 10/6/1999, Entered: 10/7/1999, Terminated: 12/2/1999 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                  AMENDED CROSS-MOTION with memorandum in support by Kenneth S. Apfel for Summary Judgment and exhibits 1 and 2. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 19 Filed: 10/6/1999, Entered: 10/7/1999, Terminated: 12/2/1999 Response in Opposition
                                    AMENDED RESPONSE by Harry R. Bailey in opposition to [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Harry R. Bailey and exhibits 1 and 2. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 18 Filed: 10/6/1999, Entered: 10/6/1999 Rule
                                      Rule 12/56 letter mailed to counsel/parties. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 17 Filed: 10/5/1999, Entered: 10/6/1999 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                        CROSS-MOTION with memorandum in support by Kenneth S. Apfel for Summary Judgment . (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 17 Filed: 10/5/1999, Entered: 10/6/1999 Response in Opposition
                                          RESPONSE by Kenneth S. Apfel in opposition to [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Harry R. Bailey. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 16 Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: 9/21/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [14-1] motion of Defendant to Extend Time to file motion for summary judgment to on or before 10/5/99 and EXTENDING time for Plaintiff's response to on or before 10/19/99. ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 9/21/99 ) (c/m 9/21/99) (c/m) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 15 Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: 9/21/1999 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                              MEMORANDUM to counsel DIRECTING counsel let Judge know by 10/5/99 whether there is unanimous consent to have tis case heard by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 9/21/99) (c/m 9/21/99) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 14 Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: 9/21/1999, Terminated: 9/21/1999 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                MOTION by Kenneth S. Apfel to Extend Time to file motion for summary judgment . (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 8/5/1999, Entered: 8/6/1999 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                  MOTION with memorandum in support by Harry R. Bailey for Summary Judgment and attachments. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 6/28/1999, Entered: 6/28/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                    REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 6/28/99) (c/m 6/28/99) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 6/28/1999, Entered: 6/28/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [10-1] motion of plaintiff to Extend Time to file plaintiff's motion for summary judgment to on or before 8/5/99; DIRECTING defendant's motion for summary judgment is due on or before 9/19/99. ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 6/28/99) (c/m 6/28/99) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 6/28/1999, Entered: 6/28/1999, Terminated: 6/28/1999 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                        MOTION by Harry R. Bailey to Extend Time to file plaintiff's motion for summary judgment . (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999 Transcript
                                                          Supplemental Transcript of proceedings held before HHS. (FILED SEPARATELY) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 5/25/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 5/25/99) (c/m 5/25/99-bc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 7/22/1999 Transcript
                                                              Transcript of proceedings held before HHS. (FILED SEPARATELY) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 5/21/1999 Answer
                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by Kenneth S. Apfel and transcript of proceedings before HHS. (c/s) (TRANSCRIPT FILED SEPARATELY) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [5-1] motion of Apfel to Extend Time to answer complaint; set Answer deadline to 5/20/99 for Kenneth S. Apfel . ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 4/26/99) (c/m 4/26/99-bc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 4/16/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999, Terminated: 4/26/1999 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                    MOTION by Kenneth S. Apfel to Extend Time to answer complaint . (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 2/26/1999, Entered: 2/26/1999 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Kenneth S. Apfel, AG, & U.S. Attorney 2/19/99; Answer due on 4/19/99 for Kenneth S. Apfel. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 11/9/1998, Entered: 11/9/1998 Rule
                                                                        Rule 4 letter mailed to plaintiff. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 11/9/1998, Entered: 11/9/1998 Summons Issued
                                                                          SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for Kenneth S. Apfel (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/9/1998 Complaint
                                                                            COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # B153541 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 34 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?